Orellana v. Don Pollo of Bethesda, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LILIAN ORELLANA
Defendant: Farzin Sharghi Namin and DON POLLO OF BETHESDA, INC. doing business as DON POLLO
Case Number: 8:2020cv02795
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 5:7123
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER that the Court has scheduled a Telephone Conference Call on November 12, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/21/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/6/2021. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/21/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Don Pollo of Bethesda, Inc..(Steinhorn, Allan)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/29/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Don Pollo of Bethesda, Inc., Farzin Sharghi Namin.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8882003.), filed by LILIAN ORELLANA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (2))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orellana v. Don Pollo of Bethesda, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farzin Sharghi Namin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON POLLO OF BETHESDA, INC. doing business as DON POLLO
Represented By: Allan W Steinhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILIAN ORELLANA
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?