Raley v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Cassie A Raley
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv02836
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation d/b/a Trellis Company, Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings Inc d/b/a Trellis Ventures, Other Affiliate Great American Insurance Company for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Haussler, Helyna)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Haussler, Helyna)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cassie A Raley. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020.(Lemberg, Sergei)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Waypoint Resource Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8888059.), filed by Cassie A Raley. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raley v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie A Raley
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?