Lewis v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Bernard Lewis
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv02885
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the parties shall meet and confer, and Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by December 17, 2020; plaintiff granted leave to file the proposed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/3/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for December 3, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. to discuss #8 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 12030200 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (egms, Chambers)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence re: PHH Mortgage Corporation's Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss (Kutcher, Jason)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/10/2020. (nrs, Chambers)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Tola Kutcher on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Kutcher, Jason)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Curtis Lynch on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Lynch, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/14/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to PHH Mortgage Corporation.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHH Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8898332.), filed by Bernard Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Styles, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Represented By: Jason Tola Kutcher
Represented By: John Curtis Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?