Rise for Animals et al v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service et al
Plaintiff: New England Anti-Vivisection Society, Animal Legal Defense Fund and Rise for Animals
Defendant: . United States Department of Agriculture, Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 8:2020cv03013
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/9/2020. (jw2s, Chambers)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Rise for Animals was filed incorrectly. **Your 103.3 Disclosure Statement must be filed as a separate entry using the event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement (Other Filings -> Other Documents -> Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement). Your document has been accepted by court staff. No action is required on your part at this time. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8915762.), filed by New England Anti-Vivisection Society. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons APHIS, #3 Summons USDA, #4 Summons AG, #5 Summons US Attorney, #6 Attachment 103.3 Statement)(Meyer, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rise for Animals et al v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Anti-Vivisection Society
Represented By: Katherine A Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Katherine A Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rise for Animals
Represented By: Katherine A Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?