Quarles v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Quarles
Defendant: Bluewater Investment Holdings, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, National Association as Trustee for the Blue Water Investment Trust 2017-1, Bunglow Series III Trust, and Cabana Series III Trust and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2020cv03200
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to RESPONSE re #12 Response filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herbst, Daniel) Modified on 12/21/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #10 RESPONSE re #7 Order to Show Cause, #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Michelle Quarles. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 Correspondence regarding counsel, Notice of Intent #9 , and Response re #10 filed by Michelle Quarles (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 Order to Show Cause, #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Herbst, Daniel)
November 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Notice of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Herbst, Daniel)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Herbst, Daniel)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 14 days as to why removal was proper. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/5/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/5/2020. (c/m 11/5/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 Removal Notification Letter to Pro Se Party (c/m 11/4/20 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/4/2020. (c/m 11/14/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 State Court AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bluewater Investment Holdings, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, National Association as Trustee for the Blue Water Investment Trust 2017-1, Bunglow Series III Trust, and Cabana Series III Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Michelle Quarles.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 State Court COMPLAINT against Bluewater Investment Holdings, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, National Association as Trustee for the Blue Water Investment Trust 2017-1, Bunglow Series III Trust, and Cabana Series III Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Michelle Quarles.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince Georges County, Maryland, case number CAL20-01106. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8946649), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Additional State Court Documents)(Herbst, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quarles v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluewater Investment Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, National Association as Trustee for the Blue Water Investment Trust 2017-1, Bunglow Series III Trust, and Cabana Series III Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Zev Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Quarles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?