Graham v. Kanawha County Circuit Court, State of Virginia
Petitioner: Ted Graham
Respondent: Kanawha County Circuit Court, State of Virginia
Case Number: 8:2020cv03473
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 21-6094 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Ted Graham. Case Manager - Kirsten Hancock (nus, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(nus, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case by Ted Graham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nus, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; dismissing #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/21/2020. (c/m 12/22/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ted Graham (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(nus, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ted Graham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nus, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Kanawha County Circuit Court, State of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kanawha County Circuit Court, State of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ted Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?