Association of Community Cancer Centers et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: National Infusion Center Association, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, Association of Community Cancer Centers and Global Colon Cancer Association
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M Azar, II, Brad Smith, Seema Verma, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation
Petitioner: Healix Infusion Therapy, LLC and Summit On-Site Solutions, LLC d/b/a Altus Biologics
Amicus Curiae: American Society of Clinical Oncology
Case Number: 8:2020cv03531
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/13/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2021 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Stay by Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael)
January 11, 2021 Filing 57 Supplemental to #53 Order filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America [SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION] (Elwood, John)
January 6, 2021 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America.(Elwood, John)
January 6, 2021 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Healix Infusion Therapy, LLC.(Amundson, Martin)
January 6, 2021 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Summit On-Site Solutions, LLC d/b/a Altus Biologics.(Amundson, Martin)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER extending the Temporary Restraining Order until January 20, 2021; directing Plaintiffs to submit additional briefing on or before January 11, 2021. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/6/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE by Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma of Supplemental Authority (Westmoreland, Rachael)
January 4, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America [NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY] (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Regeneron Opinion (Dec. 30, 2020))(Elwood, John)
January 1, 2021 Filing 50 Paperless Correspondence re: Scheduling a conference call for January 1, 2021 at 3:00PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
December 31, 2020 Filing 49 Correspondence re: Expiration of Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Elwood, John)
December 31, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2020 Filing 48 -SEALED- MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/31/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT (JOINT STATUS REPORT) by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - California Life Sciences Association Preliminary Injunction (12-28-2020))(Elwood, John)
December 23, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #26 MOTION to Seal , #30 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma.(Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER to Counsel re: temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/23/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, construed as a motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/23/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2020 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/23/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/18/2020, before Judge Catherine C. Blake. Court Reporter Christine T. Asif, Telephone number 4109624492. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021.(ca, Court Reporter)
December 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/18/2020, before Judge Catherine C. Blake. Court Reporter Christine T. Asif, Telephone number 4109624492. Total number of pages filed: 94. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021.(ca, Court Reporter)
December 18, 2020 Filing 40 Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2020 re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America before Judge Catherine C. Blake.(Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (kac2, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Filing 39 Brief in Support of #24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by American Society of Clinical Oncology as Amicus Curiae.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Unopposed Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/17/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by American Society of Clinical Oncology (Attachments: #1 Brief of American Society of Clinical Oncology as Amicus Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ference-Burke, Jonathan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Robert Ference-Burke on behalf of American Society of Clinical Oncology (Ference-Burke, Jonathan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit V, #3 Exhibit W, #4 Exhibit X)(Elwood, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Seal by Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 15, 2020 Filing 33 REDACTED DOCUMENT -Response in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma(Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 15, 2020 Filing 32 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma.(Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER confirming the results of today's conference call establishing a TRO briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/11/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Healix Infusion Therapy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Amundson, Martin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin John Amundson on behalf of Healix Infusion Therapy, LLC (Amundson, Martin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Seal Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Summit On-Site Solutions, LLC d/b/a Altus Biologics (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Amundson, Martin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin John Amundson on behalf of Summit On-Site Solutions, LLC d/b/a Altus Biologics (Amundson, Martin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal)(Elwood, John)
December 10, 2020 Filing 25 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Index of Exhibits and Exhibits A - I by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Elwood, John)
December 10, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #4 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #5 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #6 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #7 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #8 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #9 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #10 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #11 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #12 Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #13 Exhibit J Expert Declaration of Professor Amitabh Chandra, #14 Exhibit K Declaration of Christian G. Downs in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #15 Exhibit L Declaration of Andrew Spiegel in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #16 Exhibit M Declaration of Michael Seiden, #17 Exhibit N Declaration of Dr. Joshua David Katz, #18 Exhibit O Declaration of Dr. Steven Baak, #19 Exhibit P Declaration of Brian Nyquist, #20 Exhibit Q Declaration of Edwin Charles Schadewald III, #21 Exhibit R Declaration of Joshua Smith, #22 Exhibit S Declaration of Dr. Laszlo Lipot Mechtler, #23 Exhibit T Declaration of Joanna Hiatt Kim in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, #24 Exhibit U Declaration of Thomas Gallo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction)(Elwood, John)
December 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants (Westmoreland, Rachael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Diana Sterk. Directing attorney Diana Sterk to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael S Kolber. Directing attorney Michael S Kolber to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Allon Kedem. Directing attorney Allon Kedem to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John P. Elwood. Directing attorney John P. Elwood to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alethea Anne Swift. Directing attorney Alethea Anne Swift to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy Cleveland. Directing attorney Timothy Cleveland to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued 60 days as to Alex M Azar, II, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation, Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Brad Smith, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Diana Sterk (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8997441.) by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America(Jones, Robert Stanton)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael S. Kolber (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8997450.) by Global Colon Cancer Association(Zimmitti, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allon Kedem (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8997440.) by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America(Jones, Robert Stanton)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Elwood (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8997394.) by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America(Jones, Robert Stanton)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Association of Community Cancer Centers (Sartori, Michele)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alethea Anne Swift (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8997399.) by National Infusion Center Association(Carney, Benjamin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Cleveland (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8997387.) by National Infusion Center Association(Carney, Benjamin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Infusion Center Association (Carney, Benjamin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Howard Carney on behalf of National Infusion Center Association (Carney, Benjamin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Walls Sartori on behalf of Association of Community Cancer Centers (Sartori, Michele)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Global Colon Cancer Association (Zimmitti, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Zimmitti on behalf of Global Colon Cancer Association (Zimmitti, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Jones, Robert Stanton)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stanton Jones on behalf of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Jones, Robert Stanton)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-8996994.), filed by National Infusion Center Association, Global Colon Cancer Association, Association of Community Cancer Centers, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Robert Stanton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Community Cancer Centers et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Smith
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Infusion Center Association
Represented By: Timothy Cleveland
Represented By: Alethea Anne Swift
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By: Diana Sterk
Represented By: John P. Elwood
Represented By: Allon Kedem
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Community Cancer Centers
Represented By: Michele Walls Sartori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Colon Cancer Association
Represented By: Andrew Zimmitti
Represented By: Michael S Kolber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Healix Infusion Therapy, LLC
Represented By: Martin John Amundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Summit On-Site Solutions, LLC d/b/a Altus Biologics
Represented By: Martin John Amundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society of Clinical Oncology
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Ference-Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?