Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Gunning et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund and Trustees of the International Training Fund
Defendant: Shawn Gunning doing business as Standard Fire Protection, Standard Fire Protection and Shawn Gunning
Case Number: 8:2021cv00304
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal ; directing the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/19/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund (Gilligan, Charles)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/8/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Shawn Gunning, Standard Fire Protection.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund (Gilligan, Charles)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHAWN GUNNING, SHAWN GUNNING D/B/A STANDARD FIRE PROTECTION, STANDARD FIRE PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9097940.), filed by Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Shawn Gunning d/b/a Standard Fire Protection, #3 Summons for Standard Fire Protection, #4 Summons for Shawn Gunning, #5 Exhibit A)(Gilligan, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2021: #7 CORRECTED COMPLAINT) (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Gunning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Gunning doing business as Standard Fire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Gunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Training Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?