Acevero v. United Food and Commercial Workers International Union - Local 1994 MCGEO
Plaintiff: Gabriel Acevero
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers international Union - Local 1994 MCGEO
Case Number: 8:2021cv00612
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice; directing the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/7/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Gabriel Acevero(Ruff, Malcolm)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gabriel Acevero. United Food and Commercial Workers international Union - Local 1994 MCGEO waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021.(Ruff, Malcolm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to United Food and Commercial Workers international Union - Local 1994 MCGEO.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9150045.), filed by Gabriel Acevero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Ruff, Malcolm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevero v. United Food and Commercial Workers International Union - Local 1994 MCGEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Acevero
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers international Union - Local 1994 MCGEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?