United States of America v. Briggs
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: FERNAL BRIGGS
Case Number: 8:2021cv01015
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6672
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Fernal Briggs served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021.(Saiz, Beatriz)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gokce Tugce Yurekli on behalf of United States of America (Yurekli, Gokce)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Fernal Briggs.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FERNAL BRIGGS, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saiz, Beatriz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERNAL BRIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Beatriz Teresa Saiz
Represented By: Gokce Tugce Yurekli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?