Crowell v. Planet Home Lending, LLC.
Plaintiff: Dawn Crowell
Defendant: Planet Home Lending, LLC.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01175
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Dawn Crowell (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Dawn Crowell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Planet Home Lending, LLC., filed by Dawn Crowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/29/2021. (c/m 6/29/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dawn Crowell (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Dawn Crowell (c/m 6/14/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Planet Home Lending, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Green Planet Mortgage, LLC, Corporate Parent Planet Financial Group, LLC for Planet Home Lending, LLC..(Hurley, Timothy)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Timothy M. Hurley, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Timothy)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McDevitt Hurley on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Hurley, Timothy)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Crowell. Planet Home Lending, LLC. served on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Summons by Dawn Crowell. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Planet Home Lending, LLC.(c/m 05/21/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to take all necessary steps to issue summons and return summons to plaintiff to effectuate service. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/21/2021. (c/m 5/21/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER Regarding the filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/14/2021. (c/m 05/14/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Planet Home Lending, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 84637037335.), filed by Dawn Crowell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowell v. Planet Home Lending, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Home Lending, LLC.
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?