Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund et al v. Power Foundations, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund and Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan
Defendant: Power Foundations, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01231
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER regarding the filing of Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/12/2021. (mg3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/24/2021.. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/12/2021. (mg3, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Power Foundations, Inc. (Hackbarth, Margaret)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Power Foundations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 103.3 disclosure)(Hackbarth, Margaret)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Power Foundations, Inc.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund (Hawkins, Jennifer)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan (Hawkins, Jennifer)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Power Foundations, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9284995.), filed by Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hawkins, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund et al v. Power Foundations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Jennifer Bush Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan
Represented By: Jennifer Bush Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Foundations, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret A Hackbarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?