Bank of America N.A. v. Banerjee
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Defendant: Mithun Banerjee
Case Number: 8:2021cv01359
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 Sealed Document(c/m 7/19/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 -SEALED- MOTION for Extension of Time by Mithun Banerjee(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 14 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/25/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/23/2021. (c/m 6/23/2021 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/7/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m to Defendant & Robert M. Wilansky 6.7.2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Mithun Banerjee or counsel for Mithun Banerjee are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case.(Forms mailed to Defendant > Robert M. Wilansky 6.7.2021) Magistrate Election Form due by 6/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Correspondence to Robert M. Wilansky. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6.2.2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Mithun Banerjee. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mithun Banerjee(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Mithun Banerjee (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County Maryland, case number 485620V., filed by Mithun Banerjee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY MARYLAND. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America N.A. v. Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mithun Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?