R80 LLC v. Societe des Produits Nestle S.A. et al
Plaintiff: R80 LLC
Defendant: VitaminPacks, Inc., Societe des Produits Nestle S.A., Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc. and Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc. doing business as Nestle Health Science
Case Number: 8:2021cv01455
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 33 Joint Correspondence re: proposed briefing schedule for preliminary injunction motion (Hughes, Brendan)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER thanking Plaintiff for following the pre-motion procedure and granting the request to file a preliminary injunction motion as described in #27 Substantive legal issues. The parties are directed to confer and file by August 6, 2021 an agreed proposed briefing schedule for my approval. The motion memorandum shall not exceed 25 pages, exclusive of exhibits, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, and the response in opposition shall be of commensurate length. The reply should not exceed 15 pages without prior approval. Further, the parties are directed to highlight the relevant language in any exhibits so the Court can readily determine the relevant information in the exhibit. If there are more than 5 exhibits longer than 5 pages each, the parties shall also provide a courtesy copy to chambers of the exhibits in a tabbed binder, no larger than 2.5-inch rings (if more space is needed,provide additional binder(s)), with each exhibit sequentially numbered and all relevant portions highlighted. Local Rules 102.2 and 105 remain in effect other than the page limits as stated. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/28/2021. (imws, Chambers)
July 27, 2021 Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shane Rumbaugh. Directing attorney Shane Rumbaugh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/27/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/26/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2021 Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dale J Giali. Directing attorney Dale J Giali to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/26/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2021 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Societe des Produits Nestle S.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 23, 2021 Filing 27 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Hughes, Brendan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dale J. Giali (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9397873.) by Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., VitaminPacks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Giali Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 13, 2021 Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel M Rosales. Directing attorney Daniel M Rosales to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Rosales (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9376350.) by Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., VitaminPacks, Inc.(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan W Thomas. Directing attorney Jonathan W Thomas to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of A John Mancini. Directing attorney A John Mancini to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by VitaminPacks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A., Corporate Parent Societe des Produits Nestle S.A., Corporate Parent NIMCO US, Inc., Corporate Parent Nestle US Holdco. Inc., Corporate Parent Nestle Health Science US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation for VitaminPacks, Inc..(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nestle Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nestle S.A., Corporate Parent Societe des Produits Nestle S.A., Corporate Parent NIMCO US, Inc., Corporate Parent Nestle US Holdco. Inc. for Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc..(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan W. Thomas (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9366811.) by Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., VitaminPacks, Inc.(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for A. John P. Mancini (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9366773.) by Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., VitaminPacks, Inc.(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to August 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/7/2021. (imws, Chambers)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., VitaminPacks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R80 LLC. VitaminPacks, Inc. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021.(Hughes, Brendan)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R80 LLC. Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021.(Hughes, Brendan)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rebecca Givner-Forbes. Directing attorney Rebecca Givner-Forbes to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Givner-Forbes by R80 LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hughes, Brendan)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint,, filed by R80 LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Brendan)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., Societe des Produits Nestle S.A., VitaminPacks, Inc..(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by R80 LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Paul Oleksiuk. Directing attorney John Paul Oleksiuk to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER regarding the filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/11/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Deficiency Notice - R80 LLC - Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 6/18/2021 (mg3, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shane Rumbaugh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9323187.) by R80 LLC(Hughes, Brendan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Givner-Forbes (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9323171.) by R80 LLC(Hughes, Brendan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Paul Oleksiuk (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9323152.) by R80 LLC(Hughes, Brendan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by R80 LLC (Hughes, Brendan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., Societe des Produits Nestle S.A., VitaminPacks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9322989.), filed by R80 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Summons Socit des Produits Nestl S.A., #10 Summons Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., #11 Summons VitaminPacks, Inc., #12 Attachment Request to Waive Service for Socit des Produits Nestl S.A., #13 Attachment Request to Waive Service for Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc., #14 Attachment Request to Waive Service VitaminPacks, Inc.)(Hughes, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R80 LLC v. Societe des Produits Nestle S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VitaminPacks, Inc.
Represented By: Carmine Ralph Zarlenga
Represented By: Dale J Giali
Represented By: Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr.
Represented By: John Peter Mancini
Represented By: Jonathan W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe des Produits Nestle S.A.
Represented By: Carmine Ralph Zarlenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Healthcare Nutrition, Inc. doing business as Nestle Health Science
Represented By: Carmine Ralph Zarlenga
Represented By: Dale J Giali
Represented By: Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr.
Represented By: John Peter Mancini
Represented By: Jonathan W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R80 LLC
Represented By: Brendan Joseph Hughes
Represented By: John Paul Oleksiuk
Represented By: Rebecca Givner Forbes
Represented By: Shane Rumbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?