Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund v. Kramer et al
Plaintiff: Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund
Defendant: George A. Joulwan, Kathryn C Zoon, Richard S. Lindahl, Emergent BioSolutions Inc., Fuad El-Hibri, Zsolt Harsanyi, Syed T. Husain, Robert G. Kramer, Sr., Louis W. Sullivan, Ronald B Richard, Jerome M Hauer, Sue Bailey and Marvin White
Case Number: 8:2021cv01595
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/23/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily R Bishop. Directing attorney Emily R Bishop to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/2021. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2021 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shane P Sanders. Attorney Shane P Sanders will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/2021. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2021 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Craig W Smith. Attorney Craig W Smith will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/2021. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Kathryn C Zoon waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Marvin White waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Louis W. Sullivan waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Ronald B Richard waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Richard S. Lindahl waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Robert G. Kramer, Sr waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. George A. Joulwan waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Syed T. Husain waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Jerome M Hauer waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Zsolt Harsanyi waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Emergent BioSolutions Inc. waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Fuad El-Hibri waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Sue Bailey waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021.(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emily R. Bishop Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice moving admission of Emily R. Bishop (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9409819.) by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shane P. Sanders Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice moving admission of Shane P. Sanders (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9409793.) by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund(Isbister, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig W. Smith Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice moving admission of Craig W. Smith (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9409750.) by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund(Isbister, John)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNJUST ENRICHMENT against Sue Bailey, Fuad El-Hibri, Emergent BioSolutions Inc., Zsolt Harsanyi, Jerome M Hauer, Syed T. Husain, George A. Joulwan, Robert G. Kramer, Sr, Richard S. Lindahl, Ronald B Richard, Louis W. Sullivan, Marvin White, Kathryn C Zoon ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9351019.), filed by Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Sue Bailey, #4 Summons El-Hibri, #5 Summons EmergentBiosolutions, #6 Summons Harsanyi, #7 Summons Hauer, #8 Summons Husain, #9 Summons Joulwan, #10 Summons Kramer, #11 Summons Lindahl, #12 Summons Richard, #13 Summons Sullivan, #14 Summons White, #15 Summons Zoon)(Isbister, John)
June 29, 2021 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sue Bailey, Fuad El-Hibri, Emergent BioSolutions Inc., Zsolt Harsanyi, Jerome M Hauer, Syed T. Husain, George A. Joulwan, Robert G. Kramer, Sr, Richard S. Lindahl, Ronald B Richard, Louis W. Sullivan, Marvin White, Kathryn C Zoon.(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund v. Kramer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Joulwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn C Zoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Lindahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergent BioSolutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuad El-Hibri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zsolt Harsanyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed T. Husain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Kramer, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis W. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome M Hauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund
Represented By: John Bucher Isbister
Represented By: Craig W Smith
Represented By: Emily R Bishop
Represented By: Shane P Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?