Ricks v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vicky Ricks
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv01758
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(c/em USMS 11/19/2021 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed in GJH-21-2304 against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Vicky Ricks.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Restraining Order filed in GJH-21-2159 by Vicky Ricks(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Default Judgment as to, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed in GJH 21-2159 by Vicky Ricks(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal filed in GJH-21-2159 by Vicky Ricks(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Vicky Ricks. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in GJH-21-2159 against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Vicky Ricks.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating case with GJH-21-2159 and GJH-21-2304; CLOSING GJH-21-2159 and GJH-21-2304; directing Plaintiff to file all pleadings in GJH-21-1758; granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete summons and U.S. Marshal forms. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/5/2021. (c/ w forms 11/9/2021 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Vicky Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/29/2021 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?