Leonard v. US Fertility, LLC
Plaintiff: Shelly A. Leonard
Defendant: US Fertility LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv01783
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1986
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUMORDER directing the clerk to consolidate this case with case 21-cv-299-PJM. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/28/2021. (c/m 7/28/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2021 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (21-cv-00299-PJM). (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 8:21-cv-00299-PJM. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 Transfer Notification Letter (c/m 7/22/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00835. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - AND NOW this 16th day of July 2021, pursuant to the agreement of counsel for Plaintiff Shelly A. Leonard and counsel for Defendant US Fertility, LLC, at the hearing held on July 13, 2021, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/16/2021. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Order Transferring Case by US Fertility, LLC (Haggerty, Richard)
July 16, 2021 Case transferred to District of Maryland. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 7/13/2021. Counsel for Plaintiff: Patrick Almonrode. Counsel for Defendant: Claudia McCarron, Richard Haggerty. Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Parties to file a proposed order re transfer of case to USDC-MD by 7/16/2021. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #13 : The Motion of Claudia D. McCarron for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/12/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Claudia D. McCarron Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14643145. by US Fertility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (McCarron, Claudia)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will address the letter at ECF No. #10 during the conference on July 13, 2021. If Plaintiff wishes to respond in writing, any response shall be filed on ECF by July 9, 2021.Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/7/2021. (Simmons, James)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for July 21, 2021 at 12:00 pm by telephone before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the conference call. The parties are directed to dial (888) 684-8852 prior to the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 7625765. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/30/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Sidney Almonrode on behalf of Shelly A. Leonard (aty to be noticed) (Almonrode, Patrick)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Brown, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference regarding Proposed Motion to Transfer and/or Stay by US Fertility, LLC (Haggerty, Richard)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by June 29, 2021. Se the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Form) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A Pre Motion conference is set for 7/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Joan M. Azrack. Counsel shall dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 4785432 at the prompt. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/19/2021. (Posillico, Lauren)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Fertility, LLC identifying Corporate Parent US Fertility Holdings, LLC for US Fertility, LLC. (Haggerty, Richard)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 Letter in Response to Defendant's Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Shelly A. Leonard (Brown, Jason)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Haggerty on behalf of US Fertility, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Haggerty, Richard)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Proposed Motion to Dismiss by US Fertility, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Haggerty, Richard) Modified on 4/29/2021 to change event type to motion (Coleman, Laurie).
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to US Fertility, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
February 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14151579, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Shelly A. Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A) (Brown, Jason) Modified on 2/17/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. US Fertility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly A. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Fertility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?