Erie Insurance Exchange v. Meridian Security Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Exchange
Defendant: Meridian Security Insurance Company, John Aks and Randall Tillim
Case Number: 8:2021cv01995
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Correspondence to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County regarding remand of case (c/m 9/3/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 NOTICE - Agreed Remand Order; remanding this case to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/3/2021. (c/m 9/3/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/17/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Aks, Meridian Security Insurance Company, Randall Tillim, filed by Erie Insurance Exchange.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Meridian Security Insurance Company Agreed Remand Order (Awkward, George)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Meridian Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company for Meridian Security Insurance Company.(Awkward, George)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number 486376-V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9422264), filed by Meridian Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Writ of Summons, #2 Exhibit Montgomery Notice of New Case Number, #3 Exhibit Scheduling Notice & Order of Court, #4 Exhibit Administrative Notice, #5 Exhibit Montgomery Circ. Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Montgomery Circ. Ct. Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Attachment Certificate of Notice to All Adverse Parties, #9 Attachment Rule 103.5 Certificate)(Awkward, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Exchange v. Meridian Security Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Lindsay Lankford Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Security Insurance Company
Represented By: George Calvin Awkward, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Aks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Tillim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?