Trinkhaus v. Sights and Soul Travels, LLC
Plaintiff: Nico Trinkhaus
Defendant: Sights and Soul Travels, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv02054
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal ; directing the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/10/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nico Trinkhaus (Sanders, Craig)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nico Trinkhaus. Sights and Soul Travels, LLC served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021.(Sanders, Craig)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/19/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (c/m 8/13/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sights and Soul Travels, LLC.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sights and Soul Travels, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9434563.), filed by Nico Trinkhaus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinkhaus v. Sights and Soul Travels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nico Trinkhaus
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sights and Soul Travels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?