Johnson v. Stop Franchising, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Geoff Johnson
Defendant: Stop Franchising, Inc. and Stop Restoration of Winston-Salem
Case Number: 8:2021cv02246
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving notice of Dismissal, case is Dismissed; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/4/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geoff Johnson (Sanders, Craig)
September 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoff Johnson. Stop Franchising, Inc. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021.(Sanders, Craig)
September 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoff Johnson. Stop Restoration of Winston-Salem served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021.(Sanders, Craig)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copy Right. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/2/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Stop Franchising, Inc., Stop Restoration of Winston-Salem.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stop Franchising, Inc., Stop Restoration of Winston-Salem ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9469693.), filed by Geoff Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Stop Franchising, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Johnson
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stop Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stop Restoration of Winston-Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?