Hearn v. Edgy Bees Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Hearn
Defendant: Edgy Bees Inc. and Adam Kaplan
Case Number: 8:2021cv02259
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, and Motion to Quash Service by Adam Kaplan (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Adam Kaplan, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam Kaplan, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gies, Thomas)
October 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Peter Gies on behalf of Adam Kaplan (Gies, Thomas)
October 21, 2021 Filing 20 Request for Hearing re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Pasekoff, Marc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by Vincent Hearn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pasekoff, Marc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Edgy Bees Inc. must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR) (Gies, Thomas) Modified on 10/15/2021 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Hearn. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pasekoff, Marc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Edgy Bees Inc. or counsel for Edgy Bees Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Edgy Bees Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Thomas P. Gies, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Thomas P. Gies, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gies, Thomas)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Peter Gies on behalf of Edgy Bees Inc. (Gies, Thomas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Hearn. Edgy Bees Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021.(Pasekoff, Marc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Affidavit of Service, filed by Vincent Hearn was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect events used. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet for Defendant Edgy Bees Inc. served on Resident Agent on September 16, 2021, filed by Vincent Hearn.(Pasekoff, Marc) Modified on 10/5/2021 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/2/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Vincent Hearn or counsel for Vincent Hearn are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/16/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Edgy Bees Inc., Adam Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(c/em 9/2/2021 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #1 Complaint with Civil Case Sheet Attached (Pasekoff, Marc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Vincent hearn For the clerk to issue Summons (Pasekoff, Marc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Vincent hearn For the clerk to issue Summons (Pasekoff, Marc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9472427.), filed by Vincent hearn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Pasekoff, Marc)
September 2, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearn v. Edgy Bees Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Hearn
Represented By: Marc E Pasekoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgy Bees Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Gies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kaplan
Represented By: Thomas Peter Gies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?