Solano Bravo v. Renaud et al
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Solano Bravo
Defendant: Tracy Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas, Larry Denayer, Merrick Garland, Jean King and CHANNING PHILLIPS
Case Number: 8:2021cv02393
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MARGINAL ORDER granting #16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/4/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Juan Carlos Solano Bravo (Marks, Jay)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/5/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Larry Denayer, Merrick Garland, Jean King, Alejandro Mayorkas, CHANNING PHILLIPS, Tracy Renaud (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kimberly)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Kimberly)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2021. (c/m 9/20/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 Transfer Notification Letter (c/m 9/20/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01056. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred to the USDC for the USDC for the District of Maryland pursuant to #8 Order on Motion to Transfer Case,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the USDC for the District of Maryland. Transfer due by 9/17/2021. Defendants' #7 consent motion to transfer and extend is GRANTED. Defendants shall have until the latter of 21 days after the case is docketed in the transferee district or September 24, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 7, 2021. (lcan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maryland by LARRY DENAYER, MERRICK GARLAND, JEAN KING, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 9/2/2021 (znmw).
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to LARRY DENAYER, MERRICK GARLAND(Attorney General), JEAN KING, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztd)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JUAN CARLOS SOLANO BRAVO.(Marks, Jay)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JUAN CARLOS SOLANO BRAVO. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Marks, Jay)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that, on or before July 19, 2021, plaintiff shall refile his complaint after having corrected the errors identified in the notices issued on April 16, 2021 and April 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 2, 2021. (lcan)
April 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zsb)
April 19, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jay@marksjustice.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (zsb, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUAN CARLOS SOLANO BRAVO filed by JUAN CARLOS SOLANO BRAVO.(Marks, Jay)
April 16, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jay@marksjustice.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES ACT AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against LARRY DENAYER, MERRICK GARLAND, JEAN KING, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, CHANNING PHILLIPS, TRACY RENAUD with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8379078) filed by Juan Carlos Solano Bravo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Custody Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Marriage Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Returned I-485, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Motion to set MCH, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - I-130 Approval Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Affidavit of Jerry Rodriguez, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Marks, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano Bravo v. Renaud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Solano Bravo
Represented By: Jay Schine Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Denayer
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean King
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANNING PHILLIPS
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?