Bank of America N.A. v. Banerjee
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Defendant: Mithun Banerjee
Case Number: 8:2021cv02553
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 la
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of Acknowledgement from Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Correspondence from the Clerk to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County regarding remand of case (c/m 10/7/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER remanding this case to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/7/2021. (c/m 10/7/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 10/6/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Mithun Banerjee. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mithun Banerjee(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 485620V., filed by Mithun Banerjee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America N.A. v. Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mithun Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?