Goins v. Civility Management Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Goins
Defendant: Civility Management Solutions, LLC and Laurie Sayles
Case Number: 8:2021cv02557
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Goins. Laurie Sayles served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021.(Zipin, Philip)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/25/2021. (mg3, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 [FILED IN ERROR] Consent to Magistrate Judge (Zipin, Philip) Modified on 10/22/2021 (mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Sandra Goins to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/19/2021 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Sandra Goins files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/21/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Goins. Civility Management Solutions, LLC served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021.(Zipin, Philip)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/6/2021. (mg3, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Sandra Goins or counsel for Sandra Goins are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/20/2021. (mg3, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Civility Management Solutions, LLC, Laurie Sayles. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mg3, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9532827.), filed by Sandra Goins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons-Civility Management Solutions, LLC, #3 Summons Summons-Sandra Sayles)(Zipin, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Civility Management Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Goins
Represented By: Philip B Zipin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civility Management Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Sayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?