Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing & Heating, LLC
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing & Heating, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv02678
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus S. Kirk on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Kirk, Thaddeus)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-02327. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #7 Stipulation to Transfer Venue, it is hereby ORDERED that the request to transfer is GRATNED. Transfer is proper under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) because the parties agree that transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland will result in greater convenience to the parties and help facilitate the administration of justice. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this matter to the District of Maryland. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/05/2021. (lcrjl3)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Terry) Modified event title on 10/5/2021 (znmw).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/28/2021. (lcrjl3)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by THOMAS N. O'CONNOR PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC.(Brault, James)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMAS N. O'CONNOR PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Goddard, Terry)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to THOMAS N. O'CONNOR PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Goddard, Terry)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS N. O'CONNOR PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8707717) filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goddard, Terry)
September 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing & Heating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Terry L Goddard, Jr
Represented By: Thaddeus S. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing & Heating, LLC
Represented By: James M Brault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?