Innovations Surgery Center, P.C., et al v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: INNOVATIONS SURGERY CENTER, P.C.,, Center for Gyn Surgery and Innovations Surgery Center, P.C.
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and Optum Health, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv02680
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michelle S Grant. Directing attorney Michelle S Grant to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicholas J Bullard. Directing attorney Nicholas J Bullard to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Payton George. Directing attorney Payton George to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michelle S. Grant (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9659188.) by Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company(Magid, Creighton)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas J. Bullard (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9659176.) by Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company(Magid, Creighton)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Payton George (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9659162.) by Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company(Magid, Creighton)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Optum Health, LLC answer due 12/16/2021; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company answer due 12/16/2021.. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/2/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Creighton Reid Magid on behalf of All Defendants (Magid, Creighton)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovations Surgery Center, P.C., Center for Gyn Surgery. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Salvatore G Rotella, Jr. Directing attorney Salvatore G Rotella, Jr to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Blake J Delaney. Directing attorney Blake J Delaney to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Salvatore G. Rotella Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9592332.) by Center for Gyn Surgery, Innovations Surgery Center, P.C.(Grivner, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Blake J. Delaney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9592040.) by Center for Gyn Surgery, Innovations Surgery Center, P.C.(Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Optum Health, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9556882.), filed by INNOVATIONS SURGERY CENTER, P.C.,, Center for Gyn Surgery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Grivner, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovations Surgery Center, P.C., et al v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INNOVATIONS SURGERY CENTER, P.C.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Gyn Surgery
Represented By: Blake J Delaney
Represented By: Salvatore G Rotella, Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey G Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovations Surgery Center, P.C.
Represented By: Blake J Delaney
Represented By: Salvatore G Rotella, Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey G Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Creighton Reid Magid
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Nicholas J Bullard
Represented By: Payton George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Health, LLC
Represented By: Creighton Reid Magid
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Represented By: Nicholas J Bullard
Represented By: Payton George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?