Rydie et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Employee A, Federal Employee, Employee B, Federal Employee, Israel Rydie and Elizabeth Fleming
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Xavier Becerra and Lloyd J. Austin III
Case Number: 8:2021cv02696
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #32 joint motion to stay. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/15/2021. (Chasanow, Deborah)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal by Lloyd J. Austin III, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeMott, Joseph)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 USCA Case Number 21-2359 for #29 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Israel Rydie. Case Manager - Ashley Brownlee (bs4, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #29 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #26 Memorandum Opinion, #27 Order on Motion for TRO by Israel Rydie. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0416-9640176.(Bolls, Jonathan)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/21, before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Klepp, Telephone number (301) 344-3228. Total number of pages filed: 55. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2022.(pk4, Court Reporter)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING #7 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/19/2021. (sat, Chambers)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/19/2021. (sat, Chambers)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 UNREDACTED COMPLAINT. (heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/18/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motions Hearing held on 11/18/2021 re #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Argued - DENIED; Plaintiff's agreed to proceed; Clerk's Office to unseal [13-1] and change the caption on the docket; #7 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and to Proceed on Pseudonyms with Memorandum of Law in Support - Argued - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court to issue a written decision for reasons stated on the record by and before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow.(Court Reporter: Patricia Klepp) (dhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Employee A, Federal Employee.(Bolls, Jonathan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal and Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Employee A, Federal Employee.(Bolls, Jonathan)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lloyd J. Austin III, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeMott, Joseph)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Seal , #14 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal and Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Lloyd J. Austin III, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Overing, Kenzie)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenzie K Overing on behalf of All Defendants (Overing, Kenzie)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Employee A, Federal Employee re #13 MOTION to Seal , #15 Notice (Other), #14 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal and Proceed Under Pseudonyms CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Bolls, Jonathan)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 QC NOTICE: The certificate of service filed at ECF No. 16 indicates that service of sealed documents, namely Plaintiffs motion to seal and proceed under pseudonyms with an unredacted copy of the complaint (ECF No. 13) and the memorandum in support of the motion to seal (ECF No. 14) was effected on defense counsel via the courts CM/ECF filing system. However, the CM/ECF system does not disseminate sealed documents. Please provide defense counsel with a copy of your documents and immediately file a corrected certificate of service(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Employee A, Federal Employee re #13 MOTION to Seal , #15 Notice (Other), #14 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal and Proceed Under Pseudonyms CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Bolls, Jonathan)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by Employee A, Federal Employee re #13 MOTION to Seal and Proceed Under Pseudonyms (Bolls, Jonathan)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum in Support to #13 Motion to Seal and Proceed Under Pseudonyms by Employee A, Federal Employee(Bolls, Jonathan) Modified on 11/10/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/10/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal by Employee A, Federal Employee (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Complaint)(Bolls, Jonathan)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER/ORDER CONFIRMING the matters discussed and the schedule set during the telephone conference. Plaintiffs immediately will file a motion to seal the unredacted complaint in accordance with Local Rule 105.11. Defendants' response to #7 motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and Plaintiffs' motion to seal and proceed anonymously is due by November 12 and Plaintiffs' replies are due by November 16, 2021. A hearing is scheduled November 18, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. in Greenbelt. The specific courtroom will be noted at www.mdd.uscourts.gov/calendar/calendar.asp. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/5/2021. (sat, Chambers)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employee A, Federal Employee. Lloyd J. Austin III served on 10/28/2021, answer due 12/27/2021.(Bolls, Jonathan)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Recorded telephone conference held on 11/5/2021 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow.(Court Reporter: Linda Marshall). (sat, Chambers)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS NOTICE SCHEDULING a recorded telephone conference with counsel on Friday, November 5, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. (sat, Chambers)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS NOTICE SCHEDULING a telephone conference with counsel today, October 29, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. Eastern Time. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. (sat, Chambers)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John DeMott on behalf of All Defendants (DeMott, Joseph)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Telephone Conference held on 10/29/2021 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (sat, Chambers)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Employee A, Federal Employee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F)(Bolls, Jonathan)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employee A, Federal Employee. Xavier Becerra served on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021.(Bolls, Jonathan)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employee A, Federal Employee. Joseph R. Biden served on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021.(Bolls, Jonathan)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service Complaint served on President Joseph R. Biden on 10/25/2021, filed by Employee A, Federal Employee.(Bolls, Jonathan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Lloyd J. Austin III, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Employee A, Federal Employee Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Requested, #2 Summons Summons Requested, #3 Summons Summons Requested, #4 Summons Summons Requested, #5 Summons Summons Requested)(Bolls, Jonathan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9559174.), filed by EMPLOYEE A, Federal Employee.(Bolls, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rydie et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employee A, Federal Employee
Represented By: Jonathan Bernard Bolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employee B, Federal Employee
Represented By: Jonathan Bernard Bolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Rydie
Represented By: Jonathan Bernard Bolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fleming
Represented By: Jonathan Bernard Bolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Represented By: Kenzie K Overing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Represented By: Kenzie K Overing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin III
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Represented By: Kenzie K Overing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?