Orbita Telecom SAC
Plaintiff: Orbita Telecom SAC
Defendant: Juvare LLC, Robert Watson and Kaleb Brown
Case Number: 8:2021cv02816
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/17/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Orbita Telecom SAC must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Orbita Telecom SAC to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/30/2021 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Orbita Telecom SAC files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 11/19/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 11/4/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Orbita Telecom SAC or counsel for Orbita Telecom SAC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/18/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Orbita Telecom SAC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 8:21-cv-2816 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9586328.), filed by Orbita Telecom SAC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh 1 - Acronyms, #3 Exhibit Exh 2 Peru Govt Org, #4 Exhibit Exh 3 MOU, #5 Exhibit Exh 4 email re service, #6 Exhibit Exh 5 GA Corp Search)(Strum, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orbita Telecom SAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbita Telecom SAC
Represented By: Jonathan D Strum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juvare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleb Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?