Hayelom v. Jaddou et al
Plaintiff: Fetwi Hayelom
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Director of ZAR Antonio Donis
Case Number: 8:2021cv03106
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Fetwi Hayelom; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 1/10/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fetwi Hayelom (Gandhi, Rina)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/6/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Fetwi Hayelom or counsel for Fetwi Hayelom are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/20/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9640511.), filed by Fetwi Hayelom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, I-589 Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit 2, I-589 Interview Notice, #3 Exhibit 3, Ombudsman's Office Response, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Gandhi, Rina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayelom v. Jaddou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fetwi Hayelom
Represented By: Rina Mahesh Gandhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of ZAR Antonio Donis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?