Lee, FKA Stone v. Stone
Plaintiff: Heidi Lee, FKA Stone
Defendant: Elmer William Stone
Interested Party: Office of Personnel Management
Case Number: 8:2021cv03209
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Elmer William Stone.(Liss, Marvin) Modified on 2/7/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Elmer William Stone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liss, Marvin) Modified on 2/7/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 Exhibit 1 by Office of Personnel Management re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cusson, Evelyn) Modified on 1/19/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Office of Personnel Management (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time To File State Court Papers; state court papers shall be filed on or before February 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/13/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time To File State Court Papers by Office of Personnel Management (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/30/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Office of Personnel Management (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CALVERT COUNTY, MARYLAND. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Show Cause ORDER for Finding Contempt re #4 Joint MOTION for Finding of Contempt and/or to Enforce Court Order (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Finding of Contempt and/or to Enforce Court Order by Heidi Lee, FKA Stone, Elmer William Stone(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office of Personnel Management re #2 Local Rule, #1 Notice of Removal, (Cusson, Evelyn)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Cusson, Evelyn)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Calvert County, case number 04-C-14-1350., filed by Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Cusson, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee, FKA Stone v. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Lee, FKA Stone
Represented By: Samuel C P Baldwin, Jr
Represented By: Marvin Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer William Stone
Represented By: Marvin Liss
Represented By: Samuel C P Baldwin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?