Asabre v. Retail Services & Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eva Asabre
Defendant: Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More and Retail Services & Systems, Inc. doing business as Total Wine & More
Case Number: 8:2022cv00148
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opposition to Motion to Remand (ECF No. 19) by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Combined Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A. Supplemental Declaration of Bart Thornburg, #3 Exhibit B. Declaration of John Connolly)(Connolly, John)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER regarding briefing schedule for Motions to Remand and Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/16/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2022 Filing 27 Correspondence re: Pre-Filing Procedure for Substantive Motions (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint) (Connolly, John)
February 9, 2022 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Retail Services & Systems, Inc., filed by Eva Asabre. (Attachments: #1 Redlined First Amended Complaint)(Toppe, Jeffrey)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER ORDER re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Retail Services & Systems, Inc., #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Eva Asabre. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/2/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2022 Filing 24 Correspondence re: Pre-Filing Procedure for Substantive Motions (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Connolly, John)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/31/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, William)
January 24, 2022 Filing 21 Proposed Order by Eva Asabre re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Trojanowski, David) Modified on 1/24/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #19 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Eva Asabre was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #19 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eva Asabre(Trojanowski, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Eva Asabre (Trojanowski, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Trojanowski on behalf of Eva Asabre (Trojanowski, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. re #7 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (Defendant's Statement Under Standing Order 2021-13) (Murphy, William)
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR) (Murphy, William) Modified on 1/21/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 1/21/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 21, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate TFWS, Inc., Other Affiliate Retail Services & Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Alexandria Wines, Inc., Other Affiliate Arizona Fine Wine and Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Brentwood Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate California Fine Wine & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Cary Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Charleston Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Charlotte Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Cherry Hill Wine & Spirits, Inc., Other Affiliate Chesapeake Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Colorado Fine Wines & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Connecticut Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Corridor Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Delaware Spirits & Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate DRT Wine & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate DT Georgia Fine Wines & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate DT Georgia Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate DT Virginia Fine Wines, LLC, Other Affiliate Durham Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate E. G. Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Eatontown Fine Wine & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Fine Wines & Spirits of North Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate Florida Fine Wine and Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Fredericksburg Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Georgia Fine Wine, LLC, Other Affiliate Greensboro Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Greensboro West Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Greenville Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate H & N Enterprise, Inc., Other Affiliate Huntersville Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Illinois Fine Wine & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Indiana Fine Wine & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Kentucky Fine Wines & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Louisiana Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Manassas Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Massachusetts Fine Wines & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Matthews Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate McLean Wines, Inc., Other Affiliate MCT New York Fine Wines & Spirits, Other Affiliate Michigan Fine Wine and Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Milltown Spirits & Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Minnesota Fine Wines & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Mount Pleasant Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Myrtle Beach Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Nevada Fine Wine & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate New Jersey Fine Wines & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate New York Fine Wines & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Norfolk Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate North Hills Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Pickett Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Potomac Yard Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Richmond Wines, Inc., Other Affiliate RSSI Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Sterling Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Taste of New York Beer & Grocery LLC, Other Affiliate Tennessee Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate Total Beverage G. B., Inc., Other Affiliate Totowa Fine Wine & Spirits LLC, Other Affiliate Triangle Plaza Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate University Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Virginia Beach Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Virginia Fine Wines, Inc., Other Affiliate Washington Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate West Raleigh Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate West Richmond Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Wilmington Fine Wine Inc, Other Affiliate Winston Salem Fine Wine, Inc., Other Affiliate Wisconsin Fine Wines & Spirits, LLC, Other Affiliate GFWS Holdings, Inc. for Retail Services & Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, William)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Leigh Shelton on behalf of Retail Services & Systems, Inc. (Shelton, Alicia)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Connolly on behalf of Retail Services & Systems, Inc. (Connolly, John)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 1/20/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Retail Services & Systems, Inc. or counsel for Retail Services & Systems, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/3/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Eva Asabre or counsel for Eva Asabre are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/3/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 State Court COMPLAINT against Retail Services & Systems, Inc., filed by Eva Asabre.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. Court staff has entered the appearance of only the attorneys who have signed the document. All other attorneys must enter their own entries of appearance. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #3 Notice (Other) filed by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More was filed incorrectly. **Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement was filed incorrectly. Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Murphy, William) Modified on 1/20/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Murphy, William)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Eva Asabre v. Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More) from Circuit Court for Montgomery County Maryland, case number C-15-21-000459. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9707411), filed by Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bart Thornburg, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, Summons, and papers served on Defendant)(Murphy, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asabre v. Retail Services & Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Asabre
Represented By: David Matthew Trojanowski
Represented By: Jeffrey Christopher Toppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Services & Systems, Inc. d/b/a Total Wine & More
Represented By: Alicia Leigh Shelton
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: William J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Services & Systems, Inc. doing business as Total Wine & More
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: William J Murphy
Represented By: Alicia Leigh Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?