MAXISIQ, LLC v. Hurysh
Plaintiff: MAXISIQ, LLC formerly known as IOMAXIS, LLC doing business as IOMAXIS and IOMAXIS, LLC
Defendant: Nicholas Hurysh, Jr.
3Rd Party Defendant: Brad C Buhr
Counter Defendant: MAXISIQ, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00314
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Brad C Buhr, COUNTERCLAIM against MAXISIQ, LLC by Nicholas Hurysh, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Errata Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Exhibit Y)(Nichols, Aaron)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/29/2022. (jmhs, Chambers)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION Re: Answer by Nicholas Hurysh, Jr(Tiller, Steven)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #14 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/8/2022. (jmhs, Chambers)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION by Nicholas Hurysh, Jr(Tiller, Steven)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by MAXISIQ, LLC re #11 Redacted Document,, (Proposed Order on Motion for Summary Judgment) (Lynch, John)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (unredacted), #2 Exhibit B (unredacted), #3 Exhibit C (unredacted), #4 Exhibit E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit G (unredacted), #6 Exhibit K (unredacted), #7 Exhibit N (unredacted), #8 Exhibit O (unredacted), #9 Exhibit P (unredacted), #10 Exhibit Q (unredacted), #11 Exhibit R (unredacted), #12 Exhibit S (unredacted), #13 Exhibit T (unredacted), #14 Exhibit V (unredacted), #15 Exhibit X (unredacted), #16 Exhibit AA (unredacted), #17 Exhibit BB (unredacted), #18 Exhibit EE (unredacted), #19 Exhibit FF (unredacted))(Lynch, John)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REDACTED DOCUMENT (Motion for Summary Judgment, Supporting Memorandum, and Exhibits A-FF) by MAXISIQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Errata D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF)(Lynch, John)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/22/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to Complaint by MAXISIQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H (redacted), #2 Exhibit I (redacted), #3 Exhibit N (redacted))(Lynch, John)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mackenzie Lee Willow Johnson. Directing attorney Mackenzie Lee Willow Johnson to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of M. Kelly Tillery. Directing attorney M. Kelly Tillery to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mackenzie Lee Willow-Johnson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9740195.) by MAXISIQ, LLC(Lynch, John)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for M. Kelly Tillery (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9740191.) by MAXISIQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Lynch, John)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Nicholas Hurysh, Jr.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #1 Complaint,, (Exhibit A to Complaint) by MAXISIQ, LLC, f/k/a IOMAXIS, LLC, d/b/a IOMAXIS(Lynch, John)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MAXISIQ, LLC, f/k/a IOMAXIS, LLC, d/b/a IOMAXIS identifying Corporate Parent MAXISIQ, LLC, f/k/a IOMAXIS, LLC, d/b/a IOMAXIS for MAXISIQ, LLC, f/k/a IOMAXIS, LLC, d/b/a IOMAXIS.(Lynch, John)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicholas Hurysh, Jr ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9738156.), filed by MAXISIQ, LLC, f/k/a IOMAXIS, LLC, d/b/a IOMAXIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 UNREDACTED Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Summons)(Lynch, John) Modified on 2/7/2022 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge George Jarrod Hazel no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAXISIQ, LLC v. Hurysh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXISIQ, LLC formerly known as IOMAXIS, LLC doing business as IOMAXIS
Represented By: John Curtis Lynch
Represented By: Mackenzie Lee Willow Johnson
Represented By: Michael Kelly Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOMAXIS, LLC
Represented By: John Curtis Lynch
Represented By: Mackenzie Lee Willow Johnson
Represented By: Michael Kelly Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Hurysh, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Edward Tiller
Represented By: Aaron Andrew Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brad C Buhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MAXISIQ, LLC
Represented By: Mackenzie Lee Willow Johnson
Represented By: Michael Kelly Tillery
Represented By: John Curtis Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?