Rise for Animals et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Rise for Animals and Animal Legal Defense Fund
Defendant: Tom Vilsack and Elizabeth Goldentyer
Case Number: 8:2022cv00810
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedures Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rise for Animals. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Affidavit of Service filed by Rise for Animals was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used.. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" located under "Service of Process". (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Defendants on 4/11/22, filed by Rise for Animals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Katherine) Modified on 4/25/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to Elizabeth Goldentyer, Tom Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Rise for Animals re 5 QC Notice - Miscellaneous Corrected Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Meyer, Katherine)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Notice (Other) filed by Rise for Animals was filed incorrectly. **Summons are incomplete. File seems to be corrupt. Please scan filled summons and attach. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rise for Animals re #2 Notice (Other) Corrected Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Meyer, Katherine)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Notice (Other) filed by Rise for Animals was filed incorrectly. **The following is incorrect - Summons are incomplete. To correct this problem, file filled out Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #2 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Rise for Animals re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Meyer, Katherine)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BMDDC-9858103.), filed by Rise for Animals.(Meyer, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rise for Animals et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rise for Animals
Represented By: Katherine A Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Katherine A Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Goldentyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?