Moberg v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Gert Arthur Moberg
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Connie Nolan
Case Number: 8:2022cv01242
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/15/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gert Arthur Moberg (Bord, Eric)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Gert Arthur Moberg to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/24/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Gert Arthur Moberg files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/8/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/24/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Gert Arthur Moberg or counsel for Gert Arthur Moberg are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/7/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Connie Nolan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BMDDC-9951221.), filed by Gert Arthur Moberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Maryland, #3 Summons USCIS, #4 Summons Connie Nolan, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Bord, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moberg v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gert Arthur Moberg
Represented By: Eric Samuel Bord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?