Pullman et al v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Plaintiff: Laurita Pullman, Alexandra Steele and Tricia Steele
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Case Number: 8:2022cv01304
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions statement regarding removal filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Phucas, Nicholas)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Laurita Pullman (Zambri, Salvatore)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Laurita Pullman, Tricia Steele, Alexandra Steele.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #4 State Court Complaint by WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan) Modified on 6/1/2022 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WMATA (Chandonnet, Brendan)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number CAL22-14640. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9963930), filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandonnet, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullman et al v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurita Pullman
Represented By: Salvatore Joseph Zambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Steele
Represented By: Salvatore Joseph Zambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Steele
Represented By: Salvatore Joseph Zambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Represented By: Nicholas L Phucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?