Ahmad v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Maria Ahmad
Defendant: .. United States Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan, Antony Blinken, Donald Blome and United States Department of State
Case Number: 8:2022cv02236
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Immigration: Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/2/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Antony Blinken, Donald Blome, U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan, United States Department of State or counsel for Antony Blinken, Donald Blome, U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan, United States Department of State are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/15/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/1/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Antony Blinken, Donald Blome, U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan, United States Department of State (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldmeier, Melissa)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/23/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Maria Ahmad to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Maria Ahmad files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/22/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/7/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Maria Ahmad or counsel for Maria Ahmad are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/21/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Antony Blinken, Donald Blome, U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antony Blinken, Donald Blome, U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan, United States Department of State ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10137999.), filed by Maria Ahmad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DOS, #3 Summons Embassy, #4 Summons SOS, #5 Summons Ambassador, #6 Summons US Att., #7 Summons Att. Gral.)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmad v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ahmad
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .. United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan
Represented By: Melissa E Goldmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Melissa E Goldmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Blome
Represented By: Melissa E Goldmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Melissa E Goldmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?