Whitfield v. R&R Enterprise, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Whitfield
Defendant: R&R Enterprise, LLC, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Rajesh Singh and Rakesh Kalotra
Case Number: 8:2022cv02957
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 13 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Red Line Copy of First Amended Complaint, #2 Clean Copy of First Amended Complaint)(Stafford, Jamaal)
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. or counsel for Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/17/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court is in receipt of ECF No. 9, a Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. This case has been assigned to the undersigned as part of the Magistrate Judge Pilot Program, which first requires the consent of both parties. (See ECF No. 3). Next, the parties are required to comply with the Case Management Order's directives about the filing of motions. (ECF No. 4). The parties are directed to review ECF Nos. 3, 4 and to proceed in accordance with the same. Accordingly, consistent with the Case Management Order, the Motion, ECF No. 9, is denied as premature. The Court will notify the parties when motions can be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/22/2022. (dd3s, Chambers)
December 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum of Law (Bass, Timothy)
December 20, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darnell Whitfield. Rakesh Kalotra served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022.(Stafford, Jamaal)
December 15, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darnell Whitfield. Rajesh Singh served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022.(Stafford, Jamaal)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darnell Whitfield. Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022.(Stafford, Jamaal)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 11/17/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Darnell Whitfield or counsel for Darnell Whitfield are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/1/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Rakesh Kalotra, R&R Enterprise, LLC, Rajesh Singh.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BMDDC-10271627.), filed by Darnell Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Checkers Drive-In Restaurant-Summons, #3 Summons R&R Enterprise-Summons, #4 Summons Rajesh Singh-Summons, #5 Summons Rakesh Kaltora-Summons)(Stafford, Jamaal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. R&R Enterprise, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Whitfield
Represented By: Jamaal Stafford
Represented By: Kwabena Owusu-Koduah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajesh Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakesh Kalotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?