InterSolutions, LLC et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: InterSolutions, LLC and Kares Management, Inc.
Defendant: Henry Walker, Apartment Consulting and Training Partners doing business as ACT Partners, Katharine Wylie and Gail Robinson
Case Number: 8:2022cv03016
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Claims in Arbitration or Another Court by InterSolutions, LLC, Kares Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hwang, Joon)
January 5, 2023 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Apartment Consulting and Training Partners, Gail Robinson, Henry Walker, Katharine Wylie(Goldberg, William)
January 4, 2023 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC as to Gail Robinson.(Hwang, Joon)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORAL ORDER denying #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction for the reasons stated on the record in open court; Joint Status Report to be filed by January 6th, 2023. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/21/2022. (bus, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2022 Filing 24 Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2022 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC before Judge Paula Xinis.(Court Reporter: Patricia Klepp - 2C) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint . Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/15/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2022 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Apartment Consulting and Training Partners, Gail Robinson, Henry Walker, Katharine Wylie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Goldberg, William)
December 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander P Berg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berg, Alexander)
December 6, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC. Katharine Wylie served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022.(Hwang, Joon)
December 6, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC. Henry Walker served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022.(Hwang, Joon)
December 6, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC. Apartment Consulting and Training Partners served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022.(Hwang, Joon)
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by InterSolutions, LLC, Kares Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit O, #9 Exhibit P, #10 Exhibit Q, #11 Exhibit R)(Hwang, Joon)
December 5, 2022 Filing 16 Witness and Exhibit List by InterSolutions, LLC, Kares Management, Inc.. (Hwang, Joon) Modified on 12/6/2022 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 Witness List by Apartment Consulting and Training Partners, Gail Robinson, Henry Walker, Katharine Wylie. (Goldberg, William)
November 30, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Apartment Consulting and Training Partners, Gail Robinson, Henry Walker, Katharine Wylie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Declaration of H. Walker and ACT Partners, #4 Exhibit Declaration of K. Wylie, #5 Exhibit Declaration of G. Robinson, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Pls.' Mot for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Goldberg, William)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alexander Goldberg on behalf of All Defendants (Goldberg, William)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Apartment Consulting and Training Partners, Katharine Wylie, Henry Walker, Gail Robinson was filed incorrectly. **The appearance of William A. Goldberg has not been entered. Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login credentials. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Culhane Grant on behalf of All Defendants (Grant, Caitlin)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER scheduling hearing and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/22/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 Telephone Conference held on 11/22/2022 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR - Ulander - 2C.) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to Apartment Consulting and Training Partners, Gail Robinson, Henry Walker, Katharine Wylie. (Attachments: #1 Summons ACT, #2 Summons Wylie, #3 Summons Robinson) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by InterSolutions, LLC, Kares Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Hwang, Joon)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC was filed missing information. **Please file a civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link the civil cover sheet to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 Memorandum re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by InterSolutions, LLC, Kares Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Hwang, Joon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by InterSolutions, LLC, Kares Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hwang, Joon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kares Management, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate InterSolutions, LLC, Other Affiliate National Property Management Group, LLC for Kares Management, Inc..(Hwang, Joon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by InterSolutions, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Kares Management, Inc., Other Affiliate National Property Management Group, LLC for InterSolutions, LLC.(Hwang, Joon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10281603.), filed by Kares Management, Inc., InterSolutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons Henry Walker, #8 Summons ACT, #9 Summons Katharine Wylie, #10 Summons Gail Robinson)(Hwang, Joon)
November 21, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InterSolutions, LLC et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterSolutions, LLC
Represented By: Joon Hwang
Represented By: Tiffany din Fagel Tse
Represented By: Alexander P Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kares Management, Inc.
Represented By: Joon Hwang
Represented By: Tiffany din Fagel Tse
Represented By: Alexander P Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Walker
Represented By: Caitlin Culhane Grant
Represented By: William Alexander Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apartment Consulting and Training Partners doing business as ACT Partners
Represented By: Caitlin Culhane Grant
Represented By: William Alexander Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katharine Wylie
Represented By: Caitlin Culhane Grant
Represented By: William Alexander Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Robinson
Represented By: William Alexander Goldberg
Represented By: Caitlin Culhane Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?