Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V. et al v. Moonshot Missions Inc.
Petitioner: Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V.
Respondent: Moonshot Missions Inc. and George Hawkins
Case Number: 8:2022mc00508
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Blair E. Trahan. Directing attorney Blair E. Trahan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2022 Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. Benjamin Elron. Directing attorney E. Benjamin Elron to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Blair E. Trahan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10284159.) by Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V.(Lerner, Scott)
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for E. Benjamin Elron (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10284119.) by Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V.(Lerner, Scott)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Ex Parte Application for an order under 28 U.SC. 1782 to Obtain Discovery from Moonshot Missions Inc. and George Hawkins for use in an International Proceeding (Filing fee $ 49 receipt number 540). by Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 RULE 7.1, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2022: #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Subpoena, #14 Subpoena, #15 Subpoena, #16 Exhibit D, #17 Exhibit E) (kb3s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2022: #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
November 15, 2022 Filing fee: $ 49, receipt number 540 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V. et al v. Moonshot Missions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miya Water Projects Netherlands B.V.
Represented By: Scott Lerner
Represented By: Tara M Lee
Represented By: Blair E. Trahan
Represented By: E. Benjamin Elron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Moonshot Missions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?