Straubmuller v. BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.
Plaintiff: MATTHEW STRAUBMULLER
Defendant: BJS WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. and BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv00470
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. Withdrawal of Attorney (Baird, Justin)
June 27, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alicia White, in Support of BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration)(Lang, Emily)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, . Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/21/2023. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lang, Emily)
June 5, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Matthew Straubmuller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven M. Nathan, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Straubmuller, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nathan, Steven)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to #23 Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration is EXTENDED to June 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/25/2023. (tb2s, Chambers)
April 24, 2023 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Matthew Straubmuller (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pizzirusso, James)
April 21, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BJ's Membership Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Terms of Use Dec 20 2022, #3 Exhibit C - Privacy Policy Dec 2022)(Lang, Emily)
April 21, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.(Lang, Emily)
April 21, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Baird on behalf of BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (Baird, Justin)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer or otherwise Response to the Complaint is EXTENDED to April 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/13/2023. (tb2s, Chambers)
March 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jagher on behalf of Matthew Straubmuller (Jagher, Jonathan)
March 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Nathan on behalf of Matthew Straubmuller (Nathan, Steven)
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Justin Baird. Directing attorney Justin Baird to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. re #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order (Varon, Jay)
March 22, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Justin Baird (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10501201.) by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.(Varon, Jay)
March 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Reck on behalf of BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (Reck, Kevin)
March 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Lang on behalf of BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (Lang, Emily)
March 20, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.(Varon, Jay)
March 20, 2023 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BJ's Wholesale Club Holdings, Inc. for BJ's Wholesale Club Inc..(Varon, Jay)
March 14, 2023 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Lang. Directing attorney Emily Lang to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2023 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kevin A Reck. Directing attorney Kevin A Reck to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emily Lang (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10486126.) by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.(Varon, Jay)
March 14, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Reck (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10486089.) by BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.(Varon, Jay)
March 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay N Varon on behalf of BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. (Varon, Jay)
March 9, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Straubmuller. BJ's Wholesale Club Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023.(Pizzirusso, James)
February 23, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to BJ's Wholesale Club Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/21/2023. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Matthew Straubmuller or counsel for Matthew Straubmuller are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/7/2023. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2023 Jury Trial Demand by Matthew Straubmuller(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BJS WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10445206.), filed by MATTHEW STRAUBMULLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Pizzirusso, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straubmuller v. BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW STRAUBMULLER
Represented By: James J Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven M Nathan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJS WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Wholesale Club Inc.
Represented By: Jay N Varon
Represented By: Kevin A Reck
Represented By: Emily Lang
Represented By: Justin Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?