Burns v. Scott
Plaintiff: Robert Burns
Defendant: Gabriel Scott
Case Number: 8:2023cv03077
Filed: November 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L Boardman
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/1/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Robert Burns to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/26/2024 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Robert Burns files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/1/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Robert Burns or counsel for Robert Burns are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/30/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/16/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Gabriel Scott.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gabriel Scott ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10922464.), filed by Robert Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Griffin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burns
Represented By: Edward Nelson Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?