Hector et al v. Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Herbert Hector and Herbert Core Drill, LLC
Defendant: Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2024cv00528
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 4/18/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel M. Casto. Directing attorney Daniel M. Casto to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James P Campbell. Directing attorney James P Campbell to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. or counsel for Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/22/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Paperless ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 4/5/2024. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
April 5, 2024 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Responsive Pleadings) by Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order)(Rogan, Christopher)
April 2, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Casto, Esq. (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11180527.) by Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. (Rogan, Christopher)
April 2, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James P. Campbell, Esq. (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11180499.) by Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. (Rogan, Christopher)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Rogan on behalf of Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. (Rogan, Christopher)
March 22, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc., filed by Herbert Hector, Herbert Core Drill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint - Red Line)(Emejuru, Ikechukwu)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Herbert Hector, Herbert Core Drill, LLC (Emejuru, Ikechukwu)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 2/22/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Herbert Hector, Herbert Core Drill, LLC or counsel for Herbert Hector, Herbert Core Drill, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/7/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by Herbert Hector, Herbert Core Drill, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons)(Emejuru, Ikechukwu)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11100574.), filed by Herbert Hector, Herbert Core Drill, LLC.(Emejuru, Ikechukwu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector et al v. Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hector
Represented By: Ikechukwu K Emejuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Core Drill, LLC
Represented By: Ikechukwu K Emejuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Mechanical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L Rogan
Represented By: Daniel M. Casto
Represented By: James P Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?