Johnson v. Progressive Insurance
Plaintiff: David Antone Johnson
Defendant: Progressive Insurance
Case Number: 8:2024cv01193
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing David Antone Johnson to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/26/2024 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if David Antone Johnson files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/3/2024. (c/m p 6/3/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/17/2024. (c/m p 5/17/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. David Antone Johnson or counsel for David Antone Johnson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/31/2024. (c/m p 5/17/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Progressive Insurance. (c/m p 5/17/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 -FILED IN CLERK'S ERROR- NOTICE Summons re #1 Complaint by David Antone Johnson (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/17/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by David Antone Johnson (Attachments: #1 Signed Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file completed summons by no later than 5/17/2024 and Clerk to issue and return summons once provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/26/2024. (c/m 4/26/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to David Antone Johnson. (c/m to P on 4/24/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive Insurance ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 1922.), filed by David Antone Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Progressive Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Antone Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?