Mogan v. Altimmune, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Mogan
Defendant: Altimmune, Inc., Vipin K. Garg, Richard I. Eisenstadt and M. Scott Harris
Case Number: 8:2024cv01315
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER ordering that the motion to appoint lead plaintiff be filed by July 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/14/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT AND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/14/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline H. Bullerjahn on behalf of Altimmune, Inc., Richard I. Eisenstadt, Vipin K. Garg, M. Scott Harris (Bullerjahn, Caroline)
June 11, 2024 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Caroline H. Bullerjahn. Directing attorney Caroline H. Bullerjahn to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Altimmune, Inc., Richard I. Eisenstadt, Vipin K. Garg, M. Scott Harris(Smith, Tierney)
June 6, 2024 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Altimmune, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altimmune, LLC, Other Affiliate Altimmune UK, Limited, Other Affiliate Spitfire Pharma, LLC, Other Affiliate Altimmune AU Pty, Limited for Altimmune, Inc..(Smith, Tierney)
June 6, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caroline H. Bullerjahn (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11303288.) by Altimmune, Inc., Richard I. Eisenstadt, Vipin K. Garg, M. Scott Harris(Smith, Tierney)
June 6, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tierney Smith on behalf of Altimmune, Inc., Richard I. Eisenstadt, Vipin K. Garg, M. Scott Harris (Smith, Tierney)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Altimmune, Inc., Richard I. Eisenstadt, Vipin K. Garg, M. Scott Harris.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by Joseph Mogan re #1 Complaint Summonses (Sommers, Daniel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11244186.), filed by Joseph Mogan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sommers, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mogan v. Altimmune, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mogan
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altimmune, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Tierney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin K. Garg
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Tierney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard I. Eisenstadt
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Tierney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Scott Harris
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Tierney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?