Harden Manufacturing Corporation v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee, ALICE HAIRFIELD, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Benjamin Jonathan Crone, Aetna, Inc., Assurant Plaintiffs, Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, P.C., Product Liability Plaintiffs Liason Counsel, Coordinated Plaintiffs, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Leslie Neilson, Gerald Smith, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company doing business as BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana, Bauda VL Sutton and Shirley Levin
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc., Melissa Hamill, Parke-Davis, D.O. James P. Hall, Denise Seastrunk, Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lodewijk J.R. DeVink and Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Linda B. Shearer, Donna Sims, Joshua M. Martinez, AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY, Melissa Johnson, Joy N. Boyer, Lori L. Mocci, Autherine Middleton, Jeffrey Wilkin, Sydney L. Williams, Katherine Farris, Janet Hargett, Algina Sizemore, Elizabeth Marie Knight, Merrie E. Beavers, David D. Weatherford, Jennifer Mecija, Julie K. Bakle, Barbara T. Payne, Joan Craft, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Dawn M. Libby, Scott Bennett, Judy White, Lestine Rogers, Lester C. Carr, James Hope, Daniel Newberry, Carlene Thomas, Eastguard Insurance Company, Dexter Williams, John Dees, JoAnna O'Sullivan, Dan Huffman, Linda Richey, Keith Edwards, Tammylee Willoz, Donald L. Lockhart, Sue Beckum, Monica S. Gann, William Webb, Kathleen Wilson, Coleen M. Craig, Maria Aranda, Louisa Smith, Adam Sumait, Frank Vercillo, Jr., Harry Lewis, Marie A. Barber, Karen M. Chancellor, Keith Coleman, April Davis, Ronald Bulger, Sr., Midwest Health Plan, Inc., Jennifer De La Garza, Mary K. Perry, Leonard Olsen, Kristina Wilson, Debra Espey, Susan Johnson, Judith J. Browne, Kathaleen B. Smalls, Timothy L. Jackson, Patricia Ann White, Fred Reiss, Kenneth C. Smith, Theodore Populis, Edgar J. Watson, Trustmark Insurance Company, Damon Carter, Jennifer Funderburg, Elmenia Johnson, Claudia Lang, Sean Hogge, Stacey Douglas, Timothy Bridges, Carolyn Hollaway, Tosha R. Best, Kamaliha Brewster, John W. Scurlock, Monica Smith, Arthur Reilly, Susan Mathey, Sharon K. Emmons, Drew Gordon, Sherry K. Ligon, Jose Artemio Fonseca, Lovell Jones-Coleman, Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund of Philadelphia and Vicinity, Linda A. Whitehouse, Sharon Burke, Lore J. Cailor, Sandra D. McMahon-Lough, Cathy Strickland, Harold Sprinkle, Andrew Smith, Vathana S. Chhiv, Jacqueline K. Manning, Amy S. James, Tuwanda V. Shakoor, Charlotte Jenkins, Vivian S. Meeks, Corrine M. Falk, James H. Whitehouse, Sr., Kevin W. Clark, Louis M. Weger, Joanna Bentley, Marilyn Lewis, Sandra Leiendecker, Kevin Keegan, Donnie L. Statom, Re'Shedia Young, Joseph Cascio, Mary Pittman, Jennifer Flanders, Kelly Strickland, Jason Morrow, Dexter P. Wigfall, Michelle L. Moats, Carolyn C. Taylor, Jack C. Reeves, Jr., Lesa Carpenter, Bular D. Taylor, David Huff, Jennifer Napoli-Branson, Rebecca A. Prince, Betty L. Stiltman, Assurant Health, Inc., Melissa L. Vice, Robert J. Moses, Carol A Vorholt, Gerald Demers, Monica L. Saenz, Carole Werner, Rachel A. Hash, Hilda Bonner, Eliza Sumait, Bernard Strickland, Teresa Drinkwine, David W. Pettit, Edward C. Thibodeau, Odessa Grissom, Debra R. Smith, Alfred Morabito, Eva Potts, Allison D. Dukes, Curtis Durden, Jr., Sandra Gaudio, Stephen Brook, Carefirst, Inc., Taylor Sloan, Isiah E. Mitchell, Sr., Dale Wayne Henderson, Bettie A. Newsom, Larry A. Shelley, Debra Mull, Ernie Brooks, Freddie B. Lytle, Patricia L. Hunter, Linda Phipps, Elroy L. Johnson, Shanan Feyer, Connie B. Cook, Donald A. Hildebrand, Jr., Nicole Y Campbell, Dorothy E. Smith, Christine M. Dozier, Gary L. Lyman, Lorraine Kopa, Michele C. Grayson, Maggie Dorty, Barbara M. Pfaff-Melani, Maria Guadalupe Fonseca, Gloria Telles, WESTGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY, Linda Barker, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Andy Wampole, Donna M. Pierce, Robert Peterson, Chad Bennett, Robin Bundoff, Tracy Lewis, Shelly M. Tarvan, Anne D. Bruce, Melvin Harris, Carmen L. Bolton, Shirley Populis, Deidre R. Rodriguez, Craig G. Reaves, Randall J. Veys, Paul Marzolo, Frank Smith, Jr., Dallas Mae Lutz, David W. Faught, Mitzi Pursey, Dexter K. Lee, Emma B. Christina, Debora L. Isaacs, Joy Dodson, John W. Wilhelm, Glinda Jean Ford, Darlene Owens, Deborah K. Fish, Sidney Brown, Nicole Justine James, John Jarosz, Richard W. Dodd, Dellapino Ballard, Elizabeth Peterson, Patricia Peters, Richard A. Crosby, Jr., Municipal Workers Compensation Fund, Inc., Rita Brooks, Bonnie A. Volek, Kenneth L. Bramlett, Monica Almeida, Carson Bunch, Sonya Lewis, Pamela Calvert, Angelo Gambardello, Betty Dees, Manuel Sumait, Jr., Tonya R. Riddle, Fazila Mustafa, Haron Y. Floyd, Diane M. Valentino, Kenneth M. Knauff, Wellchoice, Inc. a Delaware Corp. and it wholly-owned subsidiary Empire Healthchoice Assurance, Inc. a New York Corp., d/b/a Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield and Empire Blue Cross, and its wholly-owned subsidiaries et. al., Robert G. Devore, Sylvia G. Hyman, Ramona Sumait, Pamela Woolum, Krystie Dane, Jodie Young, Doris Sloan, Gerard Gaudio, Jerry Lowe, Catherine L. Brown, Brent D. Young, Donald Walker, Carlos Fonseca, Laura Coach Brown, Albert Action, Barbara M. Strawitz, Christine Gambardello, Janie Smith, Erik Newberry, Wanda F. Nichols, James Morrow, Jr., Jimmie K. Williams, Thomas Vorholt, William Montgomery, Felisha Carpenter, Sulema Salinas, Mark Turner, Johnnie Hargrove, Nicholas Clark, Jeffrey Mecija, Leslie Luttrell, Mary J. Kestner, Shirley Mowdy, Dorothy Kern, Jerrell M. Bearden, Jo Helen Boler, Mary Armbruster, Amy Wendorf, Group Health Services of Oklahoma, Inc. an Oklahoma Corp. and its wholly-owned subsidiary Group Health Maintenance Organization, Inc. doing business as BlueClinics HMO, an Oklahoma Corp. d/b/a/ Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oklahoma, Steven Alexander, Karen J. Greer, Russell T. Cephas, Kelly A. Tilley, William S. Moore, Steven Michielsen, Dorothy Beckworth, Ryan White, Teresa E. Teater, Anne Ellis, Betty Carter, Dorothy Lott, Maralyn Montgomery, Larry W. Dauernheim, Deborah Valentine, Joe N. Blake, Jarvis L. Richberg, Mercelino Sumait, Zola M. Hatfield, Mary Ann Minervino, Sonya M. Galloway, Sandra Lynn Messer, Kenneth Gross, Donna M. Pitzer, Latonya A. Jeffers, Mehmet Kilie, Barbara McAnnally, Frieda Burroughs, Annie Gatewood, Christopher L. Hall, Earnestine Parker, Holly Newberry, Barbara A. Knowlton, Kelly Deleon, Mary Cooper, Vincent W. Ludacka, Marsha Holloway, Haywood Broomfield, James Michael Burleson, Mark Minisquero, Kimm J. Davis, Patricia Ann Rhodes, Martin Fonseca, Robert F. Wilson, Lolita Myers, Gregory Suber, Charles K. Smith, Marlene K. McIntyre, Teina M. Shaffer, Michael J. Moscato, Doris J. Smith, Michael James Belongie, Jason Stadler, Ezell Summers, Donald H. Scheidt, Cliff Champagne, Charles White, Stephen Brodsky, Linda Rizzo, Garry P. Clemons, Anthony Charles Manfredi, Alysia Ashley, Thelma Juanita Mosley, Sandra M. Logan, Willie R. Thames, Ethel M. Hall, Gulf Distributing Holdings, LLC, Christy Poe Spears, Louise C. Wilson, Edward Reott, Martha Accettullo, Herman C. Segle, Susan Brook, Jonanne Keegan, Ramal Williams, Jacqueline Poole, Jana Stephens, Mary P. Dorsey, Howard Ellis, Denise McLendon, Susan L. Brazell, Troy Chappell, Joy M. Shaw, Robert Beckworth, Sharon L. Coburn, Clennon C. Hall, Joyce Reach, Gregory Retzer, Patricia L. Brockman, Steven Kail, Daniel Johnson, John James, Jr., Melissa Amato, Leisa Eaddy, Rosalia Sumait, John Owens, Ann E. Larkin, Robert L. Small, Scott Alan Watson, Shelia Agee, Zina R. McCue, Lynette Kay George, Roy Carrol, Rodney E. Plant, Jeffrey Taggart, Joseph P. Graham, Jeffrey Farris, Shirley Drennan, Sean McMinn, Lois Adams, Alan M. Huberman, James Hunter, Kelly R. Strickland, Shanna G. Ericsson-Harkness, Patti Long, Kimberly D. McKenzie, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Charles D. Girard, Sr., Gwenna J. Byrum-Hill, Ruth Smith and Shirley Torry Martin
Not Classified By Court: Judge Judith G. Dein, Carol Janney and Darren Mancuso
Consolidated Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Dainippon Pharmaceuticals USA Corporation, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Hertz Corporation, Janssen Ortho LLC, Elan Corporation, PLC, Finkelstein & Partners, LLP, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Andrew W. Wallace, G.D. Searle, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Elan Corporation, Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, David Reynolds Longmire, Cline, Davis & Mann, Inc., Mary Katriadakis and Purepac Pharmaceutical Co.
Intervenor: Rhonda Gayle Goodridge and Mark Dudley
In Re: Neurontin Marketing Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation
Interested Party: Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2004cv10981
Filed: May 14, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Filing 4359 MANDATE of USCA as to #3446 Notice of Appeal filed by Jessie Allen, Leroy Anderson, Mary Cooper. Appeal #3446 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
January 9, 2017 Filing 4358 USCA Judgment as to #3446 Notice of Appeal filed by Jessie Allen, Leroy Anderson, Mary Cooper (Paine, Matthew)
October 28, 2015 Filing 4357 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 28, 2015 Filing 4356 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 29, 2012, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Catherine Handel at hhcatherine2@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 11/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 1, 2015 Filing 4355 Withdrawal of motion: #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation filed by Bernstein Liebhard LLP pursuant to #4354 Notice of Withdrawal filed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 25, 2015 Filing 4354 NOTICE by Bernstein Liebhard LLP of Withdrawal of Motion to Reallocate Attorneys Fees (Good, Andrew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 4353 ELECTRONIC REPORT OF ADR PROVIDER. Magistrate Judge Dein: On August 20, 2015, I conducted a mediation in this case. All parties were represented by counsel, and were present in person, by telephone or by authorized corporate officer. The matter was settled. The parties will withdraw the motion for reallocation of attorneys fees within thirty (30) days. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 12, 2015 Filing 4352 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING ADR CONFERENCE: Mediation before Magistrate Judge Dein set for Thursday, August 20, 2015, at 10:00AM in Courtroom #15 on the 5th Floor. Counsel are directed to be present with their clients or representatives thereof with full settlement authority. No later than three business days before the conference, each party shall submit (by mail or hand delivery addressed to Judge Dein, or by email to Jolyne_Dambrosio@mad.uscourts.gov) a brief memorandum marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" addressing the party's position on the merits of the case and on settlement. If you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, please notify opposing counsel and the court as soon as possible. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 12, 2015 Filing 4351 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Judith G. Dein appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
June 8, 2015 Filing 4350 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 22, 2015 Filing 4349 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation filed by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Greene, Thomas)
May 22, 2015 Filing 4348 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #4343 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #4346 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #4345 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this documents, Attn: Clary Geraldino-Karasek/ Clerk's Office by Wednesday, 5/27/2015 - 5PM. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 22, 2015 Filing 4347 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4344 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 21, 2015 Filing 4346 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation of Michael Tabb filed by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tabb, Michael)
May 21, 2015 Filing 4345 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation of Don Barrett filed by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Greene, Thomas)
May 21, 2015 Filing 4344 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of 20 Pages by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum of Opposition)(Greene, Thomas)
May 21, 2015 Filing 4343 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation of Thomas Sobol filed by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Greene, Thomas) Modified docket text on 5/22/2015 to correct filing party . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
May 7, 2015 Filing 4342 DECLARATION re #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation by Bernstein Liebhard LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I to Declaration of Sandy Liebhard)(Good, Andrew)
May 7, 2015 Filing 4341 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation filed by Bernstein Liebhard LLP. (Good, Andrew)
May 7, 2015 Filing 4340 MOTION to Reallocate Attorneys' Fees & for Discovery in Support of Reallocation by Bernstein Liebhard LLP.(Good, Andrew)
May 7, 2015 Filing 4339 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Good on behalf of Bernstein Liebhard LLP (Good, Andrew)
February 11, 2015 Filing 4338 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
February 9, 2015 Filing 4337 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
January 29, 2015 Filing 4336 Appeal Record Returned: #3562 Notice of Appeal #3634 Notice of Appeal (Sealed Documents) (Paine, Matthew)
December 30, 2014 Filing 4335 NOTICE of Conditional Remand Order from the mdl panel. (Jones, Sherry)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4333 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4332 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4331 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4330 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4329 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4328 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4327 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4326 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4325 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4324 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4323 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4322 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4321 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4320 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4319 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4318 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4317 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4316 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4315 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4314 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4313 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4312 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4311 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4310 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4309 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4308 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 12, 2014 Filing 4307 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 3, 2014 Filing 4334 Request/Denial of Change of Venue from Janet Hargett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 26, 2014 Filing 4306 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED #4305 Motion to Remand - Eastern District of Pennsylvania as to Case 06-11023- PBS. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 25, 2014 Filing 4305 MOTION to Remand by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Cheffo, Mark)
November 13, 2014 Filing 4304 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 1629 Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-10981-PBS et al.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 10, 2014 Filing 4303 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. The Court ALLOWS the plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and compensation to class plaintiffs #4287 . Class Counsel are hereby awarded 28% of the settlement fund, inclusive of reimbursement of reasonable litigation expenses, plus interest accrued thereon, if any. In light of the factors and findings described above, the 28% fee award is within the applicable range of reasonable percentage fund awards. The Court finds this award to be fair and reasonable. The awarded fees and expenses shall be paid to Class Counselfrom the settlement fund in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. The Plaintiffs Steering Committee shall allocate the fees and expenses among Class Counsel in areasonable fashion. Class and Subclass Representatives are hereby compensated inthe following amounts for their reasonable time spent on tasksrelated to their representation of the Class and Subclass A,which shall be paid from the Settlement Fund: HardenManufacturing Corporation, $25,000; Louisiana Health ServiceIndemnity Company, d/b/a/ BlueCross/BlueShield of Louisiana,$25,000; ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, $25,000; andBlue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, $25,000. These paymentsare in recognition of the work these plaintiffs undertook inrepresenting the Class and Subclass A, which amount is in 11 addition to whatever monies these plaintiffs will receive from the settlement fund pursuant to the plan of distribution. The Court finds these awards to be fair and reasonable. The Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over the Settlement Agreement, including over any issues relating to attorneys' fees and expenses. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 7, 2014 Filing 4302 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. FINAL Order and Judgment Granting Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release and Approving Proposed Allocation of Settlement Funds re #4299 Motion. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 4, 2014 Filing 4301 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 4, 2014 Filing 4300 Transcript of Hearing held on October 22, 2014, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 11/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 27, 2014 Filing 4299 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees as discussed in the October 22, 2014 fairness hearing by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Final Approval Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order on Attorneys' Fees, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 24, 2014 Filing 4298 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's Additonal briefs on the Attorneys' fee award and proposed order of judgment due by 10/27/2014 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 22, 2014 Filing 4297 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Hearing held on Motion for Settlement of Class Action - Final Approval hearing held on 10/22/2014....Plaintiff counsel shall file additonal briefs on the Attorneys' fee award by 10/27/14, and a proposed order of judgment, all matters taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: see transcript) (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 4296 ADDENDUM re #4283 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action (Final Approval) - Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing in Support of Final Approval of Class Settlement and Motion to Approve Alternative Proof of Claim by Sole Objector to the Settlement filed by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Rust Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - ICC Objection, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Martinez Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 1, 2014 Filing 4295 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Justin J. Wolosz (Wolosz, Justin)
September 30, 2014 Filing 4294 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling : Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. In light of #4277 Order entered Granting Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, Directing Notice to the Class, and Scheduling Fairness Hearing set for 10/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 24, 2014 Filing 4293 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered " ALLOWED " in accordance with Order #4278 entered on 8/4/2014 re #4246 AND #4262 Motion to Dismiss (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 16, 2014 Filing 4292 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald T. Giaimo on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 16, 2014 Filing 4291 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #4284 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4283 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action (Final Approval), #4285 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #4286 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #4290 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #4288 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4289 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #4287 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation to Class Plaintiffs. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by Friday, 9/19/2014. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4290 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4287 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation to Class Plaintiffs of Arthur R. Miller filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4289 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4287 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation to Class Plaintiffs of Thomas M. Greene filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4288 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4287 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation to Class Plaintiffs filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4287 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Compensation to Class Plaintiffs by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4286 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4283 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action (Final Approval) Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4285 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4283 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action (Final Approval) of Elizabeth Levine Re: Mailing and Publication of Notice to the Class filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4284 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4283 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action (Final Approval) filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 4283 MOTION for Settlement of Class Action (Final Approval) by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
August 22, 2014 Filing 4282 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Magda Jimenez Train by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC (Wolosz, Justin) Modified docket text on 8/25/2014 to correct docket entry (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
August 15, 2014 Filing 4281 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENIED #4161 Motion to Seal Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Hospital's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act and Supporting Documents. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 15, 2014 Filing 4280 NOTICE from Insurance Claims Consultants re #4277 Order and Fairness Hearing set for 10/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 4, 2014 Filing 4278 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #4262 MOTION re #4246 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Treat Motion to Dismiss as Unopposed or Otherwise Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution " The Action will be Dismissed by 9/4/2014 unless there is a Motion to Substitute Parties". Set Deadlines : Responses due by 9/4/2014 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 9/17/2014 to correct linkage to motion order being entered to . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
August 1, 2014 ***Deadlines terminated as parties settled : Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 25, 2014 Filing 4279 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #4153 Motion pursuant to #4277 ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, Directing Notice to the Class. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 25, 2014 Filing 4277 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, Directing Notice to the Class, and Scheduling Fairness Hearing entered. (Hearing set for 10/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris.)(Folan, Karen)
July 16, 2014 Filing 4276 EXHIBIT re #4275 Notice (Other) - Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, Directing Notice to the Class, and Scheduling Fairness Hearing by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Sobol, Thomas)
July 16, 2014 Filing 4275 NOTICE by Harden Manufacturing Corporation Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, Directing Notice to the Class, and Scheduling Fairness Hearing (Sobol, Thomas)
July 15, 2014 Filing 4274 DECLARATION re #4273 Memorandum in Support of Motion In Further Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Assurant Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Simmer, W.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 4273 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #4259 MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Other Relief filed by Assurant Plaintiffs. (Simmer, W.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 4272 Transcript of Settlement Conference held on July 7, 2014, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 8/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 15, 2014 Filing 4271 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 14, 2014 Filing 4270 NOTICE by Harden Manufacturing Corporation --- Corrected Class Plaintiffs' Stipulation and Notice of Partial Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of Case Management Order Establishing Common Benefit Account with Respect to Plaintiff Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama and Municipal Workers Compensation Fund (Sobol, Thomas)
July 10, 2014 Filing 4269 NOTICE by Harden Manufacturing Corporation ---CLASS PLAINTIFFS STIPULATION AND NOTICE OF PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING COMMON BENEFIT ACCOUNT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ALABAMA (Sobol, Thomas)
July 7, 2014 Filing 4268 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4259 MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Other Relief - SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF JULY 2, 2014 filed by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Sobol, Thomas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 4267 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.....Counsel shall submit a brief memo describing the theory of damages on the proposed antitrust settlement class, and the relationship to the settlement in New Jersey, if known. (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 26, 2014 Filing 4266 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating #3817 Motion for Leave to File Document (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 26, 2014 Filing 4265 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating #3339 Motion to Compel (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 19, 2014 Filing 4264 Case no longer referred to Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Abaid, Kimberly)
June 11, 2014 Filing 4263 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing..... Preliminary Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2014 04:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 3, 2014 Filing 4262 MOTION re #4246 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Treat Motion to Dismiss as Unopposed or Otherwise Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Higgins, Chad)
May 30, 2014 Filing 4260 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4259 MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Other Relief filed by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Settlement Agreement and Exhibits A-D, #2 Text of Proposed Order - [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval)(Sobol, Thomas)
May 30, 2014 Filing 4259 MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Other Relief by Harden Manufacturing Corporation.(Sobol, Thomas)
May 29, 2014 Filing 4261 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4258 Stipulation filed by Harden Manufacturing Corporation.(Folan, Karen)
May 23, 2014 Filing 4258 STIPULATION by Class Plaintiffs' Regarding Motion for Entry Of Case Management Order by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Sobol, Thomas)
May 15, 2014 Filing 4257 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4256 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference set for 5/23/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
May 15, 2014 Filing 4256 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to May 23, 2014 by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
April 30, 2014 Filing 4255 Reset Deadlines as to #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account . Responses due by 5/23/2014 (Danieli, Chris)
April 30, 2014 Filing 4254 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #4253 Stipulation filed by Harden Manufacturing Corporation (Danieli, Chris)
April 23, 2014 Filing 4253 STIPULATION by Class Plaintiffs Regarding Motion for Entry Of Case Management Order by Harden Manufacturing Corporation. (Sobol, Thomas)
April 21, 2014 Filing 4252 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of STATUS CONFERENCE..... Status Conference set for 5/16/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 17, 2014 Filing 4251 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #4165 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot #4242 Motion for Order; finding as moot #4244 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in light of #4250 Stipulation of Dismissal. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
April 16, 2014 Filing 4250 STIPULATION of Dismissal Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., et al. v. Pfizer, Inc., et al. (1:04-cv-10739) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
April 16, 2014 Filing 4249 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 4/16/2014. Further Status Conference set for 5/16/14 at 9:00am. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 15, 2014 Filing 4248 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Status Conference...... Status Conference set for 4/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 9, 2014 Filing 4247 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4246 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Higgins, Chad)
April 9, 2014 Filing 4246 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Higgins, Chad)
April 9, 2014 Filing 4245 Class Plaintiffs' Response To Pfizer's Post Hearing Submission Response by Harden Manufacturing Corporation . (Sobol, Thomas)
April 8, 2014 Filing 4244 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 8, 2014 to File Response/Reply as to #4242 MOTION for Order to Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weinraub, David)
April 3, 2014 Filing 4243 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4242 MOTION for Order to Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
April 3, 2014 Filing 4242 MOTION for Order to Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
April 1, 2014 Filing 4241 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #4240 Stipulation, filed by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. Set Deadlines as to #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account . Responses due by 4/23/2014. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
March 28, 2014 Filing 4240 STIPULATION - Stipulation of all Parties to Extend the Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussion and Establishing Common Benefit Account Until April 23, 2014 - by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 3, 2014 Filing 4239 POST HEARING MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark) Modified docket text and relationship on 3/4/2014 (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
February 28, 2014 Filing 4238 Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas M. Sobol, Liaison Counsel for the Proposed Class of Third Party Payers formally withdrawing (with prejudice) the Third Claim for Relief in the Fourth Amended Complaint. (Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 4237 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4230 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John H. Beisner, Jessica D. Miller, and Geoffrey M. Wyatt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 25, 2014 Filing 4236 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 25, 2014 Filing 4235 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on February 24, 2014, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 3/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 24, 2014 Filing 4234 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 24, 2014 Filing 4233 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2014 re #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate filed by Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust.....Court sets a Pretrial date of 9/26/14 at 2:30am; Jury Trial 10/6/14 at 9:00am. All matter's taken under advisement. Parties shall notify the court if they reach a settlement, court adjourned.(Atty present: see transcript for details)(Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
February 21, 2014 Filing 4232 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING #4231 Motion to Continue. "DENIED." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 21, 2014 Filing 4231 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Post-Mandate Motion for Class Certification to early April by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
February 20, 2014 Filing 4230 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John H. Beisner, Jessica D. Miller, and Geoffrey M. Wyatt Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-4871589 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Beisner, #2 Declaration of Jessica D. Miller, #3 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Wyatt)(Wolosz, Justin)
February 14, 2014 Filing 4229 Reset Deadlines as to #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account . Responses due by 3/31/2014. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 13, 2014 Filing 4228 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4224 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mary Ann Mullaney. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 13, 2014 Filing 4227 STIPULATION re #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account Stipulation of All Parties To Extend The Time To File Response To Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry Of Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussion and Establishing Common Benefit Account Until March 31, 2014 by All Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
February 11, 2014 Filing 4226 Opposition re #4216 MOTION to Unseal Document #4166 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, [ filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Nussbaum, Linda)
February 11, 2014 Filing 4225 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4216 Motion to Unseal Document #4166 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #4167 Affidavit in Support of Motion. "ALLOWED." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 6, 2014 Filing 4224 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mary Ann Mullaney Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4849204 by Assurant Health, Inc..(Simmer, W.)
February 3, 2014 Filing 4223 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4222 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account . Responses due by 2/18/2014. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 3, 2014 Filing 4222 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 18, 2014 to File Response/Reply as to #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Weinraub, David)
February 3, 2014 Filing 4221 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4218 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account ; GRANTING #4220 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 2/18/2014. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 2, 2014 Filing 4220 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 18, 2014 to File Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion For Entry of Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussion and Establishing Common Benefit Account Docket Entry No. 4211. by Aetna, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Gerald)
January 31, 2014 Filing 4219 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4218 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/18/2014 to File Response/Reply as to #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account filed by Assurant Plaintiffs. (Simmer, W.)
January 31, 2014 Filing 4218 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/18/2014 to File Response/Reply as to #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account by Assurant Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmer, W.)
January 29, 2014 Filing 4217 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4216 MOTION to Unseal Document #4166 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, [ filed by Assurant Plaintiffs. (Simmer, W.)
January 29, 2014 Filing 4216 MOTION to Unseal Document #4166 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #4167 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals by Assurant Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmer, W.)
January 27, 2014 Filing 4215 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4214 MOTION to Continue February 10, 2014 Hearing Regarding Harden's Motion for Class Certification #4153 and Kaiser's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs #4165 . Motion Hearing RESET for 2/24/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris re #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate, #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees.(LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 24, 2014 Filing 4214 MOTION to Continue February 10, 2014 Hearing Regarding Harden's Motion for Class Certification #4153 and Kaiser's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs #4165 to February 19, 2014 or February 20, 2014 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Cheffo, Mark)
January 21, 2014 Filing 4213 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order. (Greene, Thomas)
January 21, 2014 Filing 4212 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account filed by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Greene, Thomas)
January 21, 2014 Filing 4211 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order Supervising Settlement Discussions and Establishing Common Benefit Account by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee.(Greene, Thomas)
January 13, 2014 Filing 4210 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4208 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Weinraub. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 10, 2014 Filing 4209 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Cheffo, Mark)
January 10, 2014 Filing 4208 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Weinraub Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4809366 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Weinraub)(Wolosz, Justin)
January 8, 2014 Filing 4207 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing on #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Motion Hearing on #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial set for 2/10/2014 11:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Motion Hearing on #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees set for 2/10/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 2, 2014 Filing 4206 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING #4197 Motion for Leave to File Document. "DENIED." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
December 23, 2013 Filing 4205 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4197 MOTION for Leave to File Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Pfizer's Surreply Memorandum of Law in Further Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Post-Mandate Motion for Class Certification filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4203 NOTICE by Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #4192 Suggestion of Death (Supplement to Notice of Suggestion of Death of Plaintiff Denise McLendon) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Higgins, Chad)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4202 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mark S. Cheffo . (Cheffo, Mark)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4201 Reset Deadlines as to #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial . Sur-replies due by 1/20/2014. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4200 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #4198 Proposed Document(s) submitted filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc. "However, there shall be no filings after the sur-reply." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4199 Status Conference Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas Greene to Judge Saris. (Greene, Thomas)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4198 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. Document received: STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER. (Cheffo, Mark)
December 10, 2013 Filing 4197 MOTION for Leave to File Class Plaintiffs' Reply to Pfizer's Surreply Memorandum of Law in Further Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Post-Mandate Motion for Class Certification by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Thomas)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4204 Order entered from the U.S. Supreme Court. The Petition for a Writ of Certiorari is Denied. (Paine, Matthew)
December 5, 2013 Filing 4196 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re: Individual Case: Scott v.Pfizer Inc. 06-10253 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 25, 2013 Filing 4195 DECLARATION re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #4194 Sur-Reply to Motion SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARK S. CHEFFO IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO KAISERS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U)(Cheffo, Mark)
November 25, 2013 Filing 4194 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees DEFENDANTS SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO KAISERS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
November 21, 2013 Filing 4193 REPLY to Response to #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial filed by Aetna, Inc.. (St. Phillip, Peter)
November 14, 2013 Filing 4192 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Denise McLendon by Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Higgins, Chad)
November 12, 2013 Filing 4191 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate SURREPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS POST-MANDATE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Cheffo, Mark)
November 12, 2013 Filing 4190 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : "I ADOPT the Report and Recommendation and dismiss the report." Action on motion: DENYING #4149 Motion for Reconsideration ; ADOPTING #4178 Report and Recommendations. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
November 12, 2013 Filing 4189 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING #4186 Motion to Seal. "DENIED." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
November 11, 2013 Filing 4188 AFFIDAVIT of Linda P. Nussbaum in Support of #1487 REPLY re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit W, #7 Exhibit X, #8 Exhibit Y, #9 Exhibit Z, #10 Exhibit AA, #11 Exhibit BB) (LaFlamme, Jennifer) Modified on 11/12/2013 to unseal as per 4189 Order (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
November 7, 2013 Filing 4187 REPLY to Response to #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFlamme, Jennifer) Modified on 11/12/2013 to unseal as per 4189 Order (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
November 7, 2013 Filing 4186 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Racketeer Infuenced and Corrupt Organizations Act and Supporting Documents by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.(Nussbaum, Linda)
November 7, 2013 Filing 4185 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and supporting documents (Nussbaum, Linda)
November 5, 2013 Filing 4184 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered GRANTING #4183 Motion to Dismiss: "ALLOWED as unopposed." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
November 4, 2013 Filing 4183 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Comply with Rule 25(a)(1) (Relates to: Wolosonowich v Pfizer Inc., et al., No. 06-cv-11395-PBS) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
October 31, 2013 Filing 4182 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #4181 Stipulation filed by Aetna, Inc. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
October 29, 2013 Filing 4181 STIPULATION re 4136 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Extending Deadlines for Reply and Sur-Reply Briefs by Aetna, Inc.. (St. Phillip, Peter)
October 21, 2013 Filing 4180 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING #4170 Motion for Leave to File Document : "DENIED. I have reviewed the proposed redactions (in part) and there is no good cause for sealing." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
October 21, 2013 Filing 4179 REPLY to Response to #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Thomas)
October 21, 2013 Filing 4178 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: Plaintiff Janet Hargett's Motion For Reconsideration (Docket #4149). I RECOMMEND that the Court ALLOW Plaintiff Hargett's Motion for Reconsideration as unopposed. Moreover, the seizure and medical treatment described by Hargett within her motion suffice to justify relief from the Court's Order of Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(6). See attached Report and Recommendations. Objections due by November 4, 2013. (Chernetsky, James)
October 16, 2013 Filing 4177 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4124 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sheila L. Birnbaum. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
October 16, 2013 Filing 4174 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #4173 Declaration, #4172 Declaration. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 10/17/2013. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
October 15, 2013 Filing 4176 DECLARATION of Mark Cheffo in Opposition re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q) (LaFlamme, Jennifer) Modified on 10/22/2013 to Unseal as per 4180 Electronic Order (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
October 15, 2013 Filing 4175 Opposition re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Pfizer, Inc. (LaFlamme, Jennifer) Modified on 10/22/2013 to Unseal as per 4180 Electronic Order (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
October 15, 2013 Filing 4173 DECLARATION re #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial , #4171 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #4172 Declaration,, Mark S. Cheffo by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cheffo, Mark)
October 15, 2013 Filing 4172 DECLARATION re #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial , #4171 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Cheffo, Mark)
October 15, 2013 Filing 4171 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
October 15, 2013 Filing 4170 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Supporting Documents in Opposition to Kaiser's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Redacted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Kaiser's Motion for Attorneys' Fees)(Cheffo, Mark)
October 15, 2013 Filing 4169 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC (1) Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Kaisers Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs; (2) Declaration of Mark S. Cheffo in Opposition to Kaisers Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs; (3) Exhibits A through Q to the Declaration of Mark S. Cheffo. (Cheffo, Mark)
September 30, 2013 Filing 4168 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cheffo, Mark)
September 16, 2013 Filing 4167 DECLARATION of Linda P. Nussbaum in Support re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
September 16, 2013 Filing 4166 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Part 1, #4 Exhibit C Part 2, #5 Exhibit C Part 3, #6 Exhibit C Part 4, #7 Exhibit C Part 5, #8 Exhibit C Part 6, #9 Exhibit D Part 1, #10 Exhibit D Part 2, #11 Exhibit D Part 3, #12 Exhibit D Part 4, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I Part 1, #18 Exhibit I Part 2, #19 Exhibit I Part 3, #20 Exhibit J, #21 Exhibit K, #22 Exhibit L, #23 Exhibit M, #24 Exhibit N, #25 Exhibit O, #26 Exhibit P, #27 Exhibit Q)(LaFlamme, Jennifer)
September 16, 2013 Filing 4165 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (LaFlamme, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
September 13, 2013 Filing 4164 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Notice of Filing of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Hospital's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act and Supporting Documents Under Seal (Nussbaum, Linda)
September 13, 2013 Filing 4163 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial filed by Aetna, Inc.. (St. Phillip, Peter)
September 13, 2013 Filing 4162 MOTION Preclude Relitigation of Issues and Facts Determined by the Kaiser Triers of Fact at Trial by Aetna, Inc..(St. Phillip, Peter)
September 13, 2013 Filing 4161 MOTION to Seal Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Hospital's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act and Supporting Documents by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.(Nussbaum, Linda)
September 13, 2013 Filing 4160 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; This motion is ALLOWED. If the parties request further time in a future motion, they shall attach a chart to any subsequent motions listing each case in the settlement process and the step(s) remaining until completion of the settlement.granting #4158 Motion for Extension of Time (Simeone, Maria)
September 11, 2013 Filing 4159 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; The two pending motions for Attorney Fees, docket #s 4091 and 4096, each of which is unopposed, are ALLOWED. re #4091 Motion for Attorney Fees; re #4096 Motion (Simeone, Maria)
September 11, 2013 Filing 4158 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/11/13 to to extend the deadline inposed in this Court's settlement order of dismissal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 10, 2013 Filing 4157 Case Appealed to Supreme Court of the United States, Case Number 13-289. (Paine, Matthew)
September 10, 2013 Filing 4156 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Certified Copy of #4150 Notice of Conditional Remand Order entered on 7/29/2013. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
September 4, 2013 Filing 4155 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendants shall respond to the motion for reconsideration appearing in docket #4149 within fourteen days. re #4149 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4128 Order Dismissing Case, filed by Janet Hargett (Simeone, Maria)
September 3, 2013 Filing 4154 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate filed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Greene, Thomas)
September 3, 2013 Filing 4153 MOTION to Certify Class Post-Mandate by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
September 3, 2013 Filing 4152 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING MOTION #4149 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4128 Order Dismissing Case, filed by Janet Hargett to Chief Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (LaFlamme, Jennifer) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin.
August 2, 2013 Filing 4151 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Dennis Wolosonowich (No. 1:06-cv-11395-PBS) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Death Certificate)(Wolosz, Justin)
July 29, 2013 Filing 4150 NOTICE of Conditional Remand Order issued by the mdl panel. (Jones, Sherry)
July 23, 2013 Filing 4149 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4128 Order Dismissing Case, by Janet Hargett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Jennifer)
July 18, 2013 Filing 4148 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: SUGGESTION OF REMAND ORDER entered re #4117 Order on Report and Recommendations. "In accordance with the Endorsed Order issued on May 29, 2013 adopting the report and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. #4117 ) and pursuant to Rule 10.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the Court issues its Suggestion of Remand Order in the cases listed in Attachment A. The Clerk is ORDERED to provide copies of this Order to the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and to the clerks of the transferor district courts." (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 18, 2013 Filing 4147 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered VACATING #4141 Order of Remand. Suggestion of Remand to be issued. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 15, 2013 Filing 4146 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #3326 Judgment, #4131 Order, #4129 Order, by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Nussbaum, Linda)
July 10, 2013 Filing 4145 STIPULATION of Dismissal (This document relates to Newberry v. Pfizer 07cv11499) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Wolosz, Justin)
July 9, 2013 Filing 4144 RESET Deadlines re #4142 ORDER: Class Plaintiffs' principal memorandum due by 9/3/2013. Pfizer's opposition due by 9/30/2013, Class Plaintiffs' Reply due by 10/21/2013, Pfizer's Sur-reply due by 11/12/2013. Previous deadlines entered in error. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 9, 2013 Filing 4143 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "I ADOPT Pfizer's schedule re #4140 Recommendations for Scheduling Order. Kaiser's Memorandum in Support of Attorney's Fees due by 9/13/2013. Pfizer's Opposition due by 10/15/2013, Kaiser's Replies due by 11/7/2013. Pfizer's Sur-replies due by 11/25/2013. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 9, 2013 Filing 4142 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re #4137 Class Plaintiffs' Recommendations for Scheduling Order. "I ALLOW the proposed schedule with the one month delay (see footnote 1). There is no need for class discovery, as there was an extensive opportunity for class discovery prior to the appeal." Class Memorandum in Support of Class Certification by 8/2/2013. Pfizer Opposition due by 8/30/2013, Class Replies due by 9/20/2013. Pfizer Sur-replies due by 10/11/2013. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 8, 2013 Filing 4141 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF REMAND entered re Products Liability Cases: "In accordance with the Endorsed Order issued on May 29, 2013 adopting the report and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Document No. #4117 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the following cases be and hereby are REMANDED to the Transferor Court...". (See Order for case list) (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 3, 2013 Filing 4140 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Pfizer's Proposed Briefing Schedule Regarding Kaiser's Motion for Attorney's Fees. (Cheffo, Mark)
July 3, 2013 Filing 4139 Recommendations for Scheduling Order KAISERS PROPOSAL RE: SCHEDULE FOR KAISERS FORTHCOMING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Nussbaum, Linda)
July 3, 2013 Filing 4138 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Document received: PFIZERS PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Cheffo, Mark)
July 3, 2013 Filing 4137 Recommendations for Scheduling Order for Supplemental Briefing on Class Certification. (Greene, Thomas)
July 2, 2013 Filing 4136 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING Briefing Schedule re #4135 Letter/request (non-motion). "ALLOWED." Motions/Opening brief due by 9/13/2013. Responses due by 10/15/2013, Replies due by 11/7/2013, Sur-replies due by 11/25/2013. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 1, 2013 Filing 4135 Letter/request (non-motion) from Richard W. Cohen re Briefing Schedule. (St. Phillip, Peter)
June 27, 2013 Filing 4134 Letter from Janett Hargett re: waiting to hear from Newton Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 order, #2 order)(Simeone, Maria)
June 26, 2013 Filing 4133 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 26, 2013 Filing 4132 Transcript of Status Conference held on June 13, 2013, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2013. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Main Document 4132 replaced on 6/26/2013) (Scalfani, Deborah).
June 24, 2013 Filing 4131 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED ORDER RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBJECT TO RESERVATION OF RIGHTS entered. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA)(Anderson, Jennifer)
June 21, 2013 Filing 4130 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Document received: [PROPOSED] STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED ORDER RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBJECT TO RESERVATION OF RIGHTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA to Proposed Amendment to Stipulated Order)(Cheffo, Mark)
June 19, 2013 Filing 4129 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: STIPULATED ORDER entered RE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBJECT TO RESERVATION OF RIGHTS re #4127 Stipulation filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Jennifer)
June 18, 2013 Filing 4128 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered re Products Liability Cases. "In accordance with the Endorsed Order issued on May 29, 2013 adopting the Report and Recommendation and dismissing the remaining pro-se plaintiffs who failed to file objections or certifications (Document No. #4117 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the attached cases be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE." (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 18, 2013 Filing 4127 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] STIPULATED ORDER RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBJECT TO RESERVATION OF RIGHTS by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nussbaum, Linda)
June 13, 2013 Filing 4126 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 6/13/2013. Parties shall submit a briefing schedule by 7/5/13. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: see transcript) (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 13, 2013 Filing 4125 STATUS REPORT Re Cases Remaining as of June 13, 2013 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
June 12, 2013 Filing 4124 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sheila L. Birnbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4497394 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila L. Birnbaum)(Wolosz, Justin)
June 11, 2013 Filing 4123 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4122 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/11/13 to to extend the time imposed in this Court's 2/17/11 Settlement Order of Dismissal (Doc # 3307) by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP. (Simeone, Maria)
June 7, 2013 Filing 4122 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/11/13 to to extend the time imposed in this Court's 2/17/11 Settlement Order of Dismissal (Doc # 3307) by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
June 3, 2013 Filing 4121 STATUS REPORT for June 3, 2013 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
June 3, 2013 Filing 4120 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris re Class Action (04-10981), Aetna (04-10958), and Kaiser (04-10739). (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 3, 2013 Filing 4119 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #4118 Motion for Hearing. Status Conference will be held Thursday, 6/13/2013 at 10:00 am. Notice of hearing to issue. (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 31, 2013 Filing 4118 MOTION for Hearing by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company.(Greene, Thomas)
May 29, 2013 Filing 4117 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : "The Court ADOPTS the recommendation (Doc. #4077 ). Within 15 days of this Order, counsel must confer with the Clerk's Office and produce a list of all individual products liability cases now pending in the MDL divided into two groups: those ready for remand and those that have been settled by are awaiting completion of the settlement. " (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 29, 2013 Filing 4116 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Christine M. Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Anderson, Jennifer)
May 29, 2013 Filing 4115 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Tabb on behalf of ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company (Tabb, Michael)
May 29, 2013 Filing 4113 MANDATE of USCA as to #3562 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #3634 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc.. Appeal #3562 , #3634 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
May 28, 2013 Filing 4114 MANDATE of USCA as to #3529 Notice of Appeal filed by Carolyn Hollaway, Lorraine Kopa, Gerald Smith, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 68 Welfare Fund, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust. Appeal #3529 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
May 28, 2013 Filing 4112 MANDATE of USCA as to #3476 Notice of Appeal filed by Aetna, Inc.. Appeal #3476 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
May 28, 2013 Filing 4111 Letter/request (non-motion) from Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr. . (St. Phillip, Peter)
May 16, 2013 Filing 4110 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Elroy L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Jennifer)
May 3, 2013 Filing 4109 OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Caryl A. Taylor. (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 3, 2013 Filing 4108 Plaintiff Certification by Earnestine Parker. (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 3, 2013 Filing 4107 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Betty Thurmond. (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 3, 2013 Filing 4106 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by John W. Wilhelm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Anderson, Jennifer)
May 3, 2013 Filing 4105 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual Case: Henderson v. Pfizer Inc. - 06-10956 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Armstrong, Katherine)
May 3, 2013 Filing 4104 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual Case: Montgomery v. Pfizer Inc. - 06-10110 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Armstrong, Katherine)
May 2, 2013 Filing 4103 STATUS REPORT by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
May 1, 2013 Filing 4102 OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Helen Wine. (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 1, 2013 Filing 4101 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Monica L. Saenz. (Anderson, Jennifer)
April 29, 2013 Filing 4100 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Lester C. Carr. (Anderson, Jennifer)
April 29, 2013 Filing 4099 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Sandra M. Logan. (Anderson, Jennifer)
April 29, 2013 Filing 4098 Plaintiff Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by George B. Lemacks. (Anderson, Jennifer)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4097 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4096 MOTION Application of Jack W. London and Archie Carl Pierce for Award of Expenses from Common Benefit Fund filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(London, Jack)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4096 MOTION Application of Jack W. London and Archie Carl Pierce for Award of Expenses from Common Benefit Fund by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(London, Jack) (Main Document 4096 replaced on 4/25/2013) (Anderson, Jennifer).
April 25, 2013 Filing 4095 DECLARATION re #4092 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4091 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jack w. London, Archie Carl Pierce, and Eugene Brooks for Award of Fees from Common Benefit Fund by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4094 DECLARATION re #4092 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4091 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jack w. London, Archie Carl Pierce, and Eugene Brooks for Award of Fees from Common Benefit Fund by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4093 DECLARATION re #4092 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4091 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jack w. London, Archie Carl Pierce, and Eugene Brooks for Award of Fees from Common Benefit Fund by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4092 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4091 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jack w. London, Archie Carl Pierce, and Eugene Brooks for Award of Fees from Common Benefit Fund filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4091 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jack w. London, Archie Carl Pierce, and Eugene Brooks for Award of Fees from Common Benefit Fund by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(London, Jack)
April 23, 2013 Filing 4090 Certification/OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Freddie B. Lytle. (Anderson, Jennifer)
April 22, 2013 Filing 4089 OBJECTION to #4077 Report and Recommendations filed by Earnestine Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Jennifer)
April 18, 2013 Filing 4088 USCA Judgment as to #3562 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #3634 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc.. The judgment of the district court is affirmed. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2013 Filing 4087 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC re #4077 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4068 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply with December 12, 2012 Order [Dkt. 4058] (Relates to Products Liability Cases) filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., [4050 [Dkt. # 4077 served upon fifty-eight plaintiffs as indicated]. (Wolosz, Justin)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4086 USCA Judgment as to #3529 Notice of Appeal filed by Carolyn Hollaway, Lorraine Kopa, Gerald Smith, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 68 Welfare Fund, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust (Paine, Matthew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4085 OPINION of USCA as to #3529 Notice of Appeal filed by Carolyn Hollaway, Lorraine Kopa, Gerald Smith, Harden Manufacturing Corporation, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 68 Welfare Fund, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust. The district court's grant of summary judgment in favor of Pfizer is reversed as to the Harden plaintiffs' RICO claims and vacated as to their NJCFA and state common law claims. The district court's denials of the Harden plaintiffs' renewed motion for class certification and motion for reconsideration are vacated, and the case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. So ordered. (Paine, Matthew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4084 USCA Judgment as to #3476 Notice of Appeal filed by Aetna, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4083 OPINION of USCA as to #3476 Notice of Appeal filed by Aetna, Inc.. The judgment of the district court is reversed as to Aetna's RICO claim, and vacated as to Aetna's PIFS claim. We remand for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. (Paine, Matthew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4082 USCA Judgment as to #3562 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #3634 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4081 OPINION of USCA as to #3562 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #3634 Notice of Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc.. The judgment of the district court is affirmed. (Paine, Matthew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4080 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re: Individual Case: Peterson v. Pfizer; Indiv. Case No. 10-10933 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
April 3, 2013 Filing 4079 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re Individual Case: Drinkwine v.Teva; Indiv. Case No. 09-10836 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
April 1, 2013 Filing 4078 STATUS REPORT as of April 1, 2013 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
April 1, 2013 Filing 4077 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on pending motions. For the foregoing reasons, I RECOMMEND that the Court DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE all claims brought by each of the individual Plaintiffs listed in Docket #4058 at pages 3-6, EXCEPT for those claims brought by Plaintiffs Brent and Jodie Young (06-11446) and Daniel and Susan Johnson (06-11882). It is ORDERED that the Defendant shall make reasonable efforts to serve this Report and Recommendation upon the non-certifying Plaintiffs who were not Finkelstein clients (listed in Docket # 4058 at 3-6) at thelast address known to them, if any. I FURTHER RECOMMEND that the Court ALLOW the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (#4068). I FURTHER RECOMMEND that the Court DENY the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Telles case (Docket # 4045), ALLOW Plaintiff Telles's Motion to Remand (Docket # 4050) and REMAND this case to the Western District of Texas with the recommendation that that Court determine the proper nature and scope of further written discovery (whether by new discovery, or by supplementation of existing requests) as well as provide the Parties with an opportunity to take depositions after theconclusion of any such written discovery. See attached Report and Recommendation. Objections to Report and Recommendation due by April 15, 2013. (Chernetsky, James)
March 13, 2013 Filing 4076 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #3529 Notice of Appeal #3562 Notice of Appeal #3476 Notice of Appeal #3634 Notice of Appeal Documents included: 1691 (EXHIBIT - A) 1785, and 1843 (Paine, Matthew)
March 12, 2013 Filing 4075 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #3529 Notice of Appeal, #3562 Notice of Appeal, #3476 Notice of Appeal, #3634 Notice of Appeal, #3446 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 1754, 1785, 1859, Sealed 1691, 1744 (Ramos, Jeanette)
March 6, 2013 Filing 4074 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4073 Motion for Extension of Time (Simeone, Maria)
March 5, 2013 Filing 4073 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2013 to to extend by 90 days the deadline imposed in this Court's settlement order of dismissal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 1, 2013 Filing 4072 STATUS REPORT as of March 1,2013 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
February 28, 2013 Filing 4071 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: individual case: Bentley v Pfizer Inc, 05-cv-11997 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Armstrong, Katherine)
February 14, 2013 Filing 4070 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: individual case: Henry v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-11995 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
February 13, 2013 Filing 4069 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4068 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply with December 12, 2012 Order [Dkt. 4058] (Relates to Products Liability Cases) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolosz, Justin)
February 13, 2013 Filing 4068 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply with December 12, 2012 Order [Dkt. 4058] (Relates to Products Liability Cases) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
February 6, 2013 Filing 4067 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER REGARDING JOHNSON & JOHNSON entered(Simeone, Maria)
February 1, 2013 Filing 4066 STATUS REPORT February 1, 2013 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
January 29, 2013 Filing 4065 NOTICE of PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATION by Brent David Young (Simeone, Maria)
January 22, 2013 Filing 4064 Plaintiff Certification to proceed as a pro-se litigant Brent D. Young. (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 3, 2013 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING Defendant Pfizer's Request For Extension of Deposition Deadline (Docket # 4061). The deadline to depose deponents Creighton and Biondo (in the Pastine case) and Downes (in the Taggart case) is extended to January 31, 2013. The Court anticipates no further extensions. (Chernetsky, James)
January 3, 2013 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING the Parties' Joint Motion (Docket # 4057) for a Ninety-Day Extension of the Court's Settlement Order of Dismissal (Docket # 3307). The deadline is extended to March 11, 2013. (Chernetsky, James)
January 2, 2013 Filing 4062 STATUS REPORT Relating to All Actions by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
December 27, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant Pfizer's Motion for Extension of Time (Docket # 4061) by the close of business on December 28, 2012.(Chernetsky, James)
December 26, 2012 Filing 4063 Plaintiffs Certification to proceed as a pro-se litigant by Daniel Johnson (Simeone, Maria)
December 26, 2012 Filing 4061 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2013 to Complete depositions (Relating to Girard et al. v. Pfizer Inc. et al. 1:06-cv-11023-PBS (Sherry Pastine) and Accettullo et al. v. Pfizer Inc. et al. 1:06-cv-10912-PBS (Jeffrey Taggart)) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
December 17, 2012 Filing 4060 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee re #4058 Order Certificate of Service of ECF doc # 4058 Scheduling Order Governing Pro Se Cases upon the former clients of former counsel, Finkelstein & Partners, LLP. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
December 12, 2012 Filing 4059 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered ALLOWING the Schwartz Firm's Motions to Withdraw as Attorney with respect to each of the forty-five plaintiffs delineated in Docket # 4048-2 (Docket #s 3821, 3887, 3891, 3894, 3897, 3900, 3903, 3906, 3909, 3912, 3915, 3919, 3924,3927, 3930, 3935, 3939, 3942, 3945, 3948, 3951, 3954, 3958, 3961, 3965 and 3994). Attorney Newton B. Schwartz, Sr. terminated. It is ORDERED that the Schwartz Firm and Mr. Harang shall serve a copy of this Order upon all affected plaintiffs. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James)
December 12, 2012 Filing 4058 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. The Court hereby establishes the following schedule governing those cases remaining in this MDL with unrepresented Plaintiffs. See attached Scheduling Order. (Chernetsky, James)
December 6, 2012 Filing 4057 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 90 days to extend the deadline imposed in this Court's settlement order of dismissal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
December 4, 2012 Filing 4056 Opposition re #4052 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #4045 Plaintiffs' Objection to the Defendant's Reply in Support of the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Gloria Telles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Boyaki, Walter)
December 3, 2012 Filing 4055 STATUS REPORT (Relates To All Actions) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 December Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
November 26, 2012 Filing 4054 REPLY to Response to #4045 MOTION to Dismiss Relates to Telles v. Pfizer Inc, No. 07-cv-11156-PBS filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 26, 2012 Filing 4053 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4052 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
November 21, 2012 Filing 4052 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #4045 by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Wolosz, Justin)
November 21, 2012 Filing 4051 RESPONSE to Motion re #4050 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 16, 2012 Filing 4050 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gloria Telles. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyaki, Walter)
November 16, 2012 Filing 4049 RESPONSE to Motion re #4045 MOTION to Dismiss Relates to Telles v. Pfizer Inc, No. 07-cv-11156-PBS filed by Gloria Telles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Boyaki, Walter)
November 15, 2012 Filing 4048 STATUS REPORT Joint Report on C. Taylor and J. Napoli by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Newton)
November 6, 2012 Filing 4047 AFFIDAVIT of Catherine B. Stevens in Support re #4045 MOTION to Dismiss Relates to Telles v. Pfizer Inc, No. 07-cv-11156-PBS filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit A, #2 SEALED Exhibit B, #3 SEALED Exhibit C, #4 SEALED Exhibit D, #5 SEALED Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wolosz, Justin) (Attachment 1, 2 , 3 , 4 , 5 replaced on 11/8/2012 with sealed versions) (Anderson, Jennifer).
November 6, 2012 Filing 4046 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4045 MOTION to Dismiss Relates to Telles v. Pfizer Inc, No. 07-cv-11156-PBS filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 6, 2012 Filing 4045 MOTION to Dismiss Relates to Telles v. Pfizer Inc, No. 07-cv-11156-PBS by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
November 6, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pending are numerous motions to withdraw by the Schwartz Law Firm.See Docket # 4043-1 (Joint Report listing such motions). The Court has received two Objections by Plaintiffs who received Notice of the Schwartz firms motion to withdraw, namely Plaintiff Caryl Taylor and Plaintiff Jennifer Napoli (See Docket #s 3982 and 3999, respectively). Neither plaintiff appears in the joint report. It is ordered that by the close of business on November 16, 2012, the Parties shall report jointly on the status of the cases of the two objecting plaintiffs (and of any motions to withdraw not listed in Docket #4043-1).
November 1, 2012 Filing 4044 STATUS REPORT RELATES TO ALL MATTERS by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 November Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 26, 2012 Filing 4043 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
October 25, 2012 Filing 4042 Response by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC to #4038 Proposed Document(s) submitted in response to Defendants' Case Management Proposal for Unrepresented Plaintiffs #4033 . (Wolosz, Justin)
October 25, 2012 Filing 4041 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4040 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
October 23, 2012 Filing 4040 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Product Liability Plaintiffs' Proposal and Objections (Doc 4038) MOTION IS UNOPPOSED by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 22, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that by the close of business on October 29, 2012 the Defendant Pfizer and the Schwartz Law Firm shall make a joint filing listing each of the Motions to Withdraw by the Schhwartz firm that they believe to be pending (making reference therein both to the docket numbers of the motions and to the name(s) of the Plaintiffs concerned). (Chernetsky, James)
October 19, 2012 Filing 4039 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Document received: Supplement to Defendants' Case Management Proposal for Unrepresented Plaintiffs. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 19, 2012 Filing 4038 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. Document received: Product Liability Plaintiffs Case Management Proposal for Unrepresented Plaintiffs. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
October 18, 2012 Filing 4037 NOTICE by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of U. Gwyn Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Higgins, Chad)
October 17, 2012 Filing 4036 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; The Motion is ALLOWED. The October 15, 2012 deadline is EXTENDED IN THIS INDIVIDUAL CASE ONLY to November 15, 2012. Plaintiff shall respond to the outstanding discovery requests and shall produce the complete template discovery, to the extent it has not already done so, within fourteen days. If Plaintiff fails to comply with the Court's discovery orders, Plaintiff faces a possible dismissal of its action as a sanction for non-compliance with the discovery rules and/or for a failure to prosecute this action.granting #4035 Motion for Extension of Time (Simeone, Maria)
October 16, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that by the close of business on October 19, 2012, Defendants Pfizer Inc. and Warner-Lambert Company LLC shall file a list of all "cases pending in this MDL in which plaintiffs are no longer represented by counsel or a motion to withdraw as counsel is pending" addressed by their Case Management Proposal for Unrepresented Plaintiffs (Docket # 4033). (Chernetsky, James)
October 15, 2012 Filing 4035 MOTION for Extension of Time of the October 15, 2012 deadline in paragraph 5 of Final Scheduling Order by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
October 15, 2012 Filing 4034 DECLARATION re #4033 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 15, 2012 Filing 4033 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Document received: Defendants' Case Management Proposal for Unrepresented Plaintiffs. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 2, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: Joint Status Report on Outstanding Depositions in Taggart and Pastine Cases (Docket # 4032). It is ORDERED that the Parties shall complete the depositions of the witnesses listed in their Joint Status Report (Docket # 4032) by December 31, 2012. (Chernetsky, James)
October 1, 2012 Filing 4032 STATUS REPORT JOINT On Outstanding Depositions In Taggart And Pastine Cases. Relates to: Girard et al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al., 1:06-cv-11023-PBS (Sherry Pastine) and Accettullo et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al, 1:06-cv-10912-PBS (Jeffrey Taggart). by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 1, 2012 Filing 4031 STATUS REPORT October 1, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
September 28, 2012 Filing 4030 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Ilyas J Rona (Rona, Ilyas)
September 24, 2012 Filing 4029 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Final Scheduling Order entered on September 11, 2012 is AMENDED, as requested, to provide that the parties need not file a request regarding the Boone Law Firm cases. Regarding the Pastine and Taggart cases, the parties shall report, within seven days, the total number of depositions they anticipate taking as well as the categories into which these depositions divide, e.g. prescribers, sales representatives or plaintiff. re #4027 Joint statement of counsel, (Simeone, Maria)
September 21, 2012 Filing 4028 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Document received: Joint Proposed Schedule for Concluding Discovery. Relates to: Girard et al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al., 1:06-cv-11023-PBS (Sherry Pastine); Accettullo et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al, 1:06-cv-10912-PBS (Jeffrey Taggart).. (Wolosz, Justin)
September 21, 2012 Filing 4027 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel to Clarify the Final Scheduling Order [Relates to: Allen, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al., 1:07-cv-11795-PBS; Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al., 1:05-cv-10835-PBS; Cooper, et al. v. Pfizer Inc. et al., 1:05-cv-10834-PBS.]. (Wolosz, Justin)
September 11, 2012 Filing 4026 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. The Court hereby establishes the following schedule governing the remaining Products Liability cases in this MDL. See Attached Final Scheduling Order. (Chernetsky, James)
September 5, 2012 Filing 4025 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4021 Motion for Extension of Time to December 11, 2012 to to extend the Court's 2/17/11 Settlement Order of Dismissal doc # 3307 (Simeone, Maria)
September 4, 2012 Filing 4024 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual case: Brida v. Pfizer - 07-12129 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 4, 2012 Filing 4023 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual case: Dixon v. Pfizer - 05-11998 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 4, 2012 Filing 4022 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: Tilley v. Pfizer - 06-11773 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 4, 2012 Filing 4021 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 11, 2012 to to extend the Court's 2/17/11 Settlement Order of Dismissal doc # 3307 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 4, 2012 Filing 4020 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's May 16, 2005 Procedural Order by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
August 30, 2012 Filing 4019 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jack Harang regarding Joint Status Report. (Schwartz, Newton)
August 30, 2012 Filing 4018 STATUS REPORT Regarding Outstanding Fact Discovery in Remaining Harang Cases by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
August 24, 2012 Filing 4017 NOTICE by Parke-Davis, Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC of Withdrawal of Attorney Megan A. Jones (Jones, Megan)
August 10, 2012 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 10, 2012 Filing 4016 Transcript of Status Conference held on August 8, 2012, before Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through Karen Aveyard at 978-466-9383, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Karen Aveyard. Redaction Request due 8/31/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 8, 2012 Filing 4015 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Status Conference held on 8/8/2012; Counsel state the status of the cases; court requests a joint report by 8/30/12 as to what further discovery remains to be done; Motion to remand to be filed no later than 10/15/2012; (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Simeone, Maria)
August 8, 2012 Filing 4014 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
August 1, 2012 Filing 4013 STATUS REPORT for August 1, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report - August 1, 2012)(Wolosz, Justin)
July 31, 2012 Filing 4012 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
July 24, 2012 Filing 4011 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The request for time is ALLOWED. Counsel shall file his report regarding the last few cases identified in his report by July 31, 2012. re #4010 Status Report filed by Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Martha Accettullo, Charles D. Girard, Sr., ( Status Report due by 7/31/2012)(Simeone, Maria)
July 23, 2012 Filing 4010 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
July 17, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. Motions terminated: #2611 Amended MOTION Amended Motion for the Admission of Summary Evidence Under Federal Rules of Evidence 1006 and 611(a) re #2609 MOTION Kaiser's Motion for the Admission of Summary Evidence Under Federal Rules of Evidence 1006 and 611(a) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, #2860 MOTION Plaintiff Kaiser's Motion to Admit Tables Showing Damages with Interest into Evidence filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #3083 MOTION to Compel Schwartz Plaintiffs to Comply with the Court's June 9, 2010 Order filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc., #2699 MOTION Bench Memorandum Requesting Prejudgment Interest filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, #2643 MOTION to Amend Exhibit List filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2664 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration Of Limitation On The Testimony Of Dr. Anthony J. Rothschild filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #2340 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Charles Phillips M.D. As Irrelevant, Prejudicial and Inflammatory filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2586 MOTION to Strike The Testimony Of John Abramson filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #2609 MOTION Kaiser's Motion for the Admission of Summary Evidence Under Federal Rules of Evidence 1006 and 611(a) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2696 Emergency MOTION To Preclude Defendants' Use of Atul Pande and Tamela Martin Depositions filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2666 MOTION To Admit Wohlberg Document filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, #2745 MOTION Kaiser's Motion for Inclusion of Additional Language to Proposed Jury Instruction No. 16 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2334 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Dr. Arrowsmith-Lowe's Testimony on Foreign Regulatory Actions and Absence of U.S. Regulatory Actions filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #3052 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Comply with August 4, 2010 Order [Dkt 2897] re: Schwartz Product Liability Actions filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc., #2720 MOTION Curative Instruction filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2581 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena Directed To Lloyd E. Knapp filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #2298 MOTION in Limine To Exclude All Evidence of or References To Conduct Unrelated to Neurontin filed by Pfizer, Inc., #2708 MOTION For Jury Instruction Binding Kaiser To Its Litigation Positions filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #2350 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Pfizer's Non-Retained Experts filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2337 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Testimony of Drs. Field and Rothschild filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, #2748 MOTION For Curative Instruction filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., #2656 MOTION Kaiser's Second Amended Motion for the Admission of Summary Evidence Under Federal Rules of Evidence 1006 and 611(a) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.(Molloy, Maryellen)
July 16, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating #650 Motion for Order (Molloy, Maryellen)
July 10, 2012 Filing 4009 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Caryi Taylor re representation by Newton Schwartz firm. (Simeone, Maria)
July 9, 2012 Remark: Defendants' Exhibits (Binders I-V) as well as Defendants' marked Exhibits A and C from March 2010 Kaiser Trial returned to representative from Skadden, Arps this date. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 9, 2012 Filing 4008 Letter/request (non-motion) from Katherine Armstrong To Jennifer Anderson Regarding Defendants' Exhibits From 2010 Trial. (Armstrong, Katherine)
July 6, 2012 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 6, 2012 Filing 4007 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 29, 2012, before Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Catherine Handel at 617-261-0555 Redaction Request due 7/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 6, 2012 Remark: Plaintiffs' Exhibits Volumes I-VIII as well as Plaintiffs' Marked Exhibits D and E from March 2010 Kaiser Trial returned to Attorney Rona this date. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 6, 2012 Filing 4006 Letter/request (non-motion) from Ilyas J. Rona to Jennifer Anderson regarding Plaintiffs' exhibits from March 2010 Kaiser Trial . (Rona, Ilyas)
July 3, 2012 Filing 4005 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Newton B. Schwartz, Sr (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Newton)
July 2, 2012 Filing 4004 STATUS REPORT by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 4003 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4002 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Leisa Eaddy filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 4002 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Leisa Eaddy by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 4001 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4000 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Sheila Agee filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 4000 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Sheila Agee by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 3999 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Jennifer Napoli re; the motion to withdraw from Law offices of Newton Schwartz. (Simeone, Maria) (Simeone, Maria).
June 27, 2012 Filing 3998 NOTICE by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC re #3769 MOTION for Sanctions PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ONLY RELATING TO THE SCHWARTZ FIRM (Pfizer continues to pursue this Motion #3769 against any non-Schwartz firm counsel of record in the cases listed in that motion) (Wolosz, Justin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 3997 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE (re Blackwell 06-10420; Huff 06-11388; Grissom 06-11386; Poole 06-11389; Ehitten 06-11391). (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 26, 2012 Filing 3996 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE (re Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. et al Individual case no. 07-10327). (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 26, 2012 Filing 3995 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE (re Alsberge v. Pfizer Inc. Individual Case Nos. 06-10957 and 05-11699). (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 25, 2012 Filing 3994 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr.(Schwartz, Newton)
June 21, 2012 Filing 3993 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
June 21, 2012 Filing 3992 Response by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC to #3984 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Additional Designation of Contents of the Record (Relates to 05-11993). (Wolosz, Justin)
June 21, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #3779 MOTION for Sanctions : At the request of counsel the Motion Hearing has been reset for 6/29/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
June 20, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #3864 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. See #3989 Endorsed Order ADOPTING #3972 Report and Recommendations. (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3991 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ADOPTING #3971 Report and Recommendations and ALLOWING #3865 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. "I ADOPT the report and recommendation and dismiss the action. No objection was filed." (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3990 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ADOPTING #3938 Report and Recommendations and ALLOWING #3588 Motion to Dismiss: "I ADOPT the report and recommendations without objection." (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3989 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ADOPTING #3972 Report and Recommendations: "After a review of the objection, I ADOPT the report and recommendation and dismiss the action for failure to prosecute." (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3988 Letter/request (non-motion) from Newton B. Schwartz, Sr. . (Schwartz, Newton)
June 19, 2012 Filing 3987 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Megan A. Jones (Jones, Megan)
June 12, 2012 Filing 3986 Letter to Judge Sorokin from Debra Alsberg and OBJECTION to #3972 recommendation and request to dismiss, Requesting right of appeal be preserved, and appointment of counsel (Simeone, Maria) Modified docket relationship and text on 6/14/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
June 12, 2012 Filing 3985 NOTICE by Kelly R. Strickland Corrected Agreed Designations of the Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A. Corrected Agreed Designations of the Record)(Brooks, Eugene)
June 11, 2012 Filing 3984 NOTICE by Kelly R. Strickland Additional Designation of Contents of the Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brooks, Eugene)
June 11, 2012 Filing 3983 NOTICE by Kelly R. Strickland Agreed Contents of the Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brooks, Eugene)
June 7, 2012 Filing 3982 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Caryl Taylor regarding Atty Newton Schwartz request to withdraw. (Simeone, Maria)
June 7, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3981 Motion for Extension of Time (Simeone, Maria)
June 6, 2012 Filing 3981 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/11/12 to joint motion for another 90 day extension of the deadline imposed in this Court's settlement order of dismissal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
June 4, 2012 Filing 3980 Letter/request (non-motion) re #3974 Order from Newton B. Schwartz, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Anderson, Jennifer) Modified docket relationship on 6/4/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
June 4, 2012 Filing 3978 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr re #3973 Order,, . (Schwartz, Newton)
June 1, 2012 Filing 3979 Errata filed by Newton B. Schwartz, Sr. (Anderson, Jennifer)
June 1, 2012 Filing 3977 STATUS REPORT June 1, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
May 29, 2012 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 29, 2012 Filing 3976 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on May 23, 2012, before Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 6/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 29, 2012 Filing 3975 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. The Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund (Docket # 3762) is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is ORDERED that the Common Benefit Fund shall issue checks: (1) to Mr. London in the amount of $52,242.91; (2) to Mr. Brooks, in the amount of $5,016.53; and, (3) to Mr. Pierce in the amount of $1,382.84. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James)
May 29, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: It is ORDERED that a Status Conference with respect to the Schwartz Firm cases is set for August 8, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. See Docket # 3974. (Chernetsky, James)
May 29, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Further Hearing on Defendant Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions with respect to the Schwartz Firm Cases (Docekt # 3779). It is ORDERED that on June 28, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24, the Court shall hold a further hearing on Defendant Pfizers Motion for Sanctions. (Chernetsky, James)
May 29, 2012 Filing 3974 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re: Defendant Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions (Docket # 3779). It is ORDERED that on June 28, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24, the Court shall hold a further hearing on Pfizer's motion, which is HELD IN ABEYANCE in the interim. See attached Order for further rulings with respect to the Schwartz Firm cases. (Chernetsky, James)
May 29, 2012 Filing 3973 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that by June 4, 2012, the Schwartz Firm shall serve the attached Notice upon each Plaintiff in any of the previously-stayed cases (i.e., those listed in Docket # 3957-1) in which stipulations of dismissal have not been filed. It is further ordered that by the close of business on June 5, 2012, the Schwartz Firm shall file a certification of the completion of service upon all affected Plaintiffs. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James)
May 29, 2012 Filing 3972 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute, Alsberge v. Pfizer, Inc., 05-cv-11699, 06-cv-10957 (Docket# 3864). I RECOMMEND that the Court ALLOW the Defendants' motion. See attached Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by June 12, 2012.(Chernetsky, James)
May 29, 2012 Filing 3971 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute, Briggs v. Pfizer, Inc. et al. (Docket # 3865). I RECOMMEND that the Court ALLOW the Defendants' Motion. See attached Report and Recommendations. Objections due by June 12, 2012. (Chernetsky, James)
May 23, 2012 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Status Conference held on 5/23/2012. Court hears counsel on the status of the case. counsel discuss the pending motions to w/d (Simeone, Maria)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3968 NOTICE of Appearance by Newton B. Schwartz, Sr on behalf of Marlene K. McIntyre (Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3967 DECLARATION re #3966 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3965 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Marlene K. McIntyre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3966 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3965 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Marlene K. McIntyre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3965 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Marlene K. McIntyre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3964 NOTICE of Appearance by Newton B. Schwartz, Sr on behalf of Dexter K. Lee (Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3963 DECLARATION re #3962 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3961 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Dexter K. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3962 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3961 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Dexter K. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3961 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Dexter K. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3960 DECLARATION re #3959 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3958 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Tommy D. James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3959 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3958 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Tommy D. James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3958 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Tommy D. James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3957 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3956 DECLARATION re #3954 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3955 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Corrine M. Falk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3955 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3954 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Corrine M. Falk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3954 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Corrine M. Falk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3953 DECLARATION re #3951 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #3952 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Freddie B. Lytle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3952 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3951 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Freddie B. Lytle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3951 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Freddie B. Lytle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3950 DECLARATION re #3949 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3948 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Theresa A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3949 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3948 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Theresa A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3948 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Theresa A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3947 DECLARATION re #3945 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3946 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Tuwanda V. Shakoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3946 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3945 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Tuwanda V. Shakoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 23, 2012 Filing 3945 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Tuwanda V. Shakoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3944 DECLARATION re #3943 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3942 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Debra F. Leger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3943 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3942 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Debra F. Leger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3942 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Debra F. Leger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3941 DECLARATION re #3940 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3939 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Christine M. Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3940 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3939 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Christine M. Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3939 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Christine M. Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3938 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis LLP (Docket # 3588). I RECOMMEND that the Court ALLOW the motion to dismiss the claims of Plaintiffs Grissom, Poole, Whitten, Blackwell, and Huff as a sanction for their failure to respond to discovery and to obey orders of the Court, and for failure to prosecute their claims. See attached Report and Recommendation. Objections due by June 5, 2012. It is ORDERED that Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC shall serve a copy of this Report and Recommendation upon the affected Plaintiffs. (Chernetsky, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3937 DECLARATION re #3936 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3935 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Isiah E. Mitchell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3936 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3935 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Isiah E. Mitchell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3935 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Isiah E. Mitchell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3934 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Jessica Whitten (Docket # 3623) is ALLOWED. See attached Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC shall serve a copy of this Order upon Whitten. (Chernetsky, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3933 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Jacqueline Poole (Docket # 3621) is ALLOWED. See attached Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC shall serve a copy of this Order upon Poole. (Chernetsky, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3932 DECLARATION re #3931 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3930 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Earnestine Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3931 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3930 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Earnestine Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3930 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Earnestine Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3929 DECLARATION re #3927 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3928 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Mary J. Pickett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3928 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3927 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Mary J. Pickett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3927 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Mary J. Pickett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3926 DECLARATION re #3925 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3924 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Haron Y. Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3925 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3924 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Haron Y. Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3924 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Haron Y. Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3923 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Odessa Grissom (Docket # 3619) is ALLOWED. See attached Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC shall serve a copy of this Order upon Grissom. (Chernetsky, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3922 DECLARATION re #3919 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3921 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Wilbur C. Conyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3921 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3919 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Wilbur C. Conyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3920 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Leisa Eaddy (Docket # 3617) is ALLOWED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC shall serve a copy of this Order upon Eaddy. (Chernetsky, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3919 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Wilbur C. Conyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3918 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Sheila Agee (Docket # 3615) is ALLOWED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC shall serve a copy of this Order upon Agee. (Chernetsky, James) (Main Document 3918 replaced on 5/22/2012) (Chernetsky, James).
May 22, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating Motion for Leave to File Document (Docket # 3698), Motion to Continue (Docket # 3719) and Motion to Continue (Docket # 3836). (Chernetsky, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3917 DECLARATION re #3915 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3916 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Sharon K. Emmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3916 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3915 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Sharon K. Emmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 22, 2012 Filing 3915 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Sharon K. Emmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3914 DECLARATION re #3912 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #3913 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Leslie Luttrell. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3913 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3912 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Leslie Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3912 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Leslie Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3911 DECLARATION re #3909 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #3910 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Carla Jones. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3910 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3909 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Carla Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3909 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Carla Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3908 DECLARATION re #3906 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3907 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Dexter Williams. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3907 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3906 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Dexter Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3906 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Dexter Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3905 DECLARATION re #3903 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3904 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Betty Thurmond. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3904 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3903 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Betty Thurmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3903 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Betty Thurmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3902 DECLARATION re #3900 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3901 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Jana Stephens. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3901 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3900 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Jana Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3900 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Jana Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3899 DECLARATION of Newton B. Schwartz, Sr. by Doris J. Smith. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3898 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3897 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Doris J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3897 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Doris J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3896 DECLARATION re #3895 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3894 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Elroy L. Johnson. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3895 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3894 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Elroy L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3894 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Elroy L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3893 DECLARATION re #3892 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3891 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Kenneth Gross. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3892 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3891 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Kenneth Gross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3891 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Kenneth Gross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3890 MOTION for Order to Withdraw as Counsel by Carson Bunch.(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3889 DECLARATION re #3887 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel, #3888 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Carson Bunch. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3888 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3887 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Carson Bunch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3887 MOTION for Leave to File to Withdraw as Counsel by Carson Bunch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 21, 2012 Filing 3886 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Harold Sprinkle. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 18, 2012 Filing 3885 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Robert Small by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 18, 2012 Filing 3884 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Herman Segle by Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 18, 2012 Filing 3883 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Charles Northcutt by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 18, 2012 Filing 3882 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Allison Dukes by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 18, 2012 Filing 3881 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Attorney Newton B. Schwartz, Sr.'s Motion to Withdraw as Co-Lead Counsel (Docket #3872) is DENIED. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James)
May 17, 2012 Filing 3880 NOTICE of Appearance by Newton B. Schwartz, Sr on behalf of Charles D. Girard, Sr (Schwartz, Newton)
May 17, 2012 Filing 3879 NOTICE of Appearance by Newton B. Schwartz, Sr on behalf of Virgil L. Anderson (Schwartz, Newton)
May 17, 2012 Filing 3878 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Debra Alsberg regarding notice received by Skadden & Arps.. (Simeone, Maria)
May 16, 2012 Filing 3877 DECLARATION re #3876 Opposition to Motion by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolosz, Justin)
May 16, 2012 Filing 3876 Opposition re #3872 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Co-Lead Counsel) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
May 14, 2012 Filing 3970 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Debra Alsberg re sealed documents. (Simeone, Maria)
May 14, 2012 Filing 3875 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 14, 2012 Filing 3874 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Edgar Watson by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 14, 2012 Filing 3873 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Rajesh James with Certificate of Service (James, Rajesh)
May 14, 2012 Filing 3872 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Co-Lead Counsel) by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 10, 2012 Filing 3871 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re: Individual Case # 08-CV-12088 Spencer-Acker v. Pfizer, et al. by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
May 9, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court has reviewed the Status Report filed on May 8, 2012 by the Schwartz Law Firm (Docket #3870). Some of the entries are complete and sufficient. For example, the entries under the heading 'Action' in the Bunch case (Docket # 3870-1 at 2) adequately inform the Court of the dates when the various actions were taken. However, the entries for many of the cases lack the necessary details of when various actions were taken. The Jones and Lee cases are just two such cases. See Docket # 3870-1 at 3. It is ORDERED that by the close of business on May 14, 2012, the Schwartz Law Firm shall file a Revised Status Report, including therein the dates when relevant actions were taken. (Chernetsky, James)
May 8, 2012 Filing 3870 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr re #3834 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,, Filing Status of Stayed Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 8, 2012 Filing 3869 NOTICE by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #3865 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Relates to Briggs v. Pfizer Inc., 07-cv-10327) (Notice of Joinder) (Williams, U.)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3868 AFFIDAVIT of Catherine B. Stevens in Support re #3864 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Relates to Alsberge v. Pfizer Inc. 05-cv-58009) (CORRECTED DOCKET NOS. Alsberge v. Pfizer Inc. 05-cv-11699 and 06-cv-10957) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Wolosz, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/10/2012) (Anderson, Jennifer).
May 7, 2012 Filing 3867 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3864 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Relates to Alsberge v. Pfizer Inc. 05-cv-58009) (CORRECTED DOCKET NOS. Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-cv-11699 and 06-cv-10957) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3866 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3865 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Relates to Briggs v. Pfizer Inc., 07-cv-10327) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3865 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Relates to Briggs v. Pfizer Inc., 07-cv-10327) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3864 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Relates to Alsberge v. Pfizer Inc. 05-cv-58009) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3863 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Monica Gann by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3862 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Kathy Young by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3861 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Dorothy Smith by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3860 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Damon Carter by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3859 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Connie Cook by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3858 Opposition Response by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC to #3855 Letter/request (non-motion) Requesting Appointment of Counsel (Relates to Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-cv-10327). (Wolosz, Justin)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3857 Response by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee to #3853 Response to Plaintiff's Additional Designation of Contents of the Record (3845). (London, Jack)
May 5, 2012 Filing 3856 STATUS REPORT May 5, 2012 by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
May 1, 2012 Filing 3969 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Debra Alsberg re counsel. (Simeone, Maria)
May 1, 2012 Filing 3855 Letter/request re counsel from Robin Briggs. (Anderson, Jennifer)
May 1, 2012 Filing 3854 STATUS REPORT May 1, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
May 1, 2012 Filing 3853 Opposition Response by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC to #3845 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiff Barlow (05-cv-11501) for Additional Designation of Contents of the Record. (Wolosz, Justin)
April 30, 2012 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-10981-PBS, 1:04-cv-10739-PBS(Scalfani, Deborah)
April 30, 2012 Filing 3852 Transcript of Charge Conference held on March 22, 2010, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2012. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-10981-PBS, 1:04-cv-10739-PBS(Scalfani, Deborah)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3851 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tosha R. Best. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3850 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Robert G. Devore. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3849 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Richard A. Crosby, Jr. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 24, 2012 Filing 3848 STATUS REPORT filed jointly with the Law Offices of Newton B. Schwartz by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depositions Remaining in Cases of Non-Stayed Plaintiffs Represented by the Law Offices of Newton B. Schwartz)(Wolosz, Justin)
April 24, 2012 Filing 3847 REPLY to Response to #3831 Cross MOTION for Sanctions and Expenses and Fees filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
April 24, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3846 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
April 23, 2012 Filing 3846 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Sanctions and Expenses and Fees by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolosz, Justin)
April 20, 2012 Filing 3845 Irene Barlow's Additional Designation of Contents of the Record submitted by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(London, Jack) Modified docket text on 4/23/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
April 20, 2012 Filing 3844 Agreed Designation of Contents of the Record regarding Irene Barlow submitted by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(London, Jack) Modified docket text on 4/23/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
April 20, 2012 Filing 3843 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Leotis Williams by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 20, 2012 Filing 3842 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Wanda Nichols by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 20, 2012 Filing 3841 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Shanna Ericsson-Harkness by Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 20, 2012 Filing 3840 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Kimberly Campbell-Dean by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 18, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion; The Motion Hearing has been reset for 5/23/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
April 17, 2012 Filing 3839 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, This Document Relates to: Andria Renee Blackwell v. Pfizer Inc., et al. Case No. 06-10420 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Wolosz, Justin)
April 17, 2012 Filing 3838 DECLARATION re #3837 Reply to Response to Motion by Tommy D. James. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 17, 2012 Filing 3837 REPLY to Response to #3831 Cross MOTION for Sanctions and Expenses and Fees filed by Tommy D. James. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 17, 2012 Set Deadlines as to #3779 MOTION for Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (re Notice issued on 4/10/12). (Anderson, Jennifer)
April 13, 2012 Filing 3836 MOTION to Continue Status Conference Hearing Scheduled For May 18, 2012 to May 21, 2012, May 22, 2012 or May 23, 2012 by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr.(Schwartz, Newton)
April 13, 2012 Filing 3835 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on April 9, 2012, before Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Catherine Handel at 617-261-0555 Redaction Request due 5/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 10, 2012 Notice of Further Hearing on Motion. The Court will conduct a further hearing on Defendant Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions (Docket # 3779) on May 18, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24. It is ORDERED that Mr. Schwartz and Mr. Harang shall each appear at this hearing. (Chernetsky, James)
April 10, 2012 Filing 3834 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDERS entered re: pending motions in Schwartz Firm cases. Defendant Pfizer's Motion For Sanctions (Docket # 3779) is HELD IN ABEYANCE; The Court will hold a further hearing on Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions on May 18, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24. Mr. Schwartz and Mr. Harang shall appear personally at this hearing; It is ORDERED that the Schwartz Firm shall pay to the law firm of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP the amount of $6,809.39 in fees and costs in connection with Mr. Cheffo's preparation for, and attendance at, the March 30, 2012 hearing; Mr. Schwartz and Mr. Harang's Motion to Withdraw with respect to Plaintiff Tommy James (Docket # 3821) is DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Schwartz Firm's Motion to Stay (Docket # 3822) is ALLOWED, subject to compliance with the attached Order. See the attached Order for further filing requirements imposed in the Schwartz Firm's cases. (Chernetsky, James)
April 9, 2012 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2012; Court hears counsel on the issues re pending stayed cases and sanctions; #3769 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (Court Reporter: Catherine Handel. For a transcript, contact Catherine Handel at 617-261-0555. (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 4/10/2012 (Scalfani, Deborah).
April 9, 2012 Filing 3833 DECLARATION re #3831 Cross MOTION for Sanctions and Expenses and Fees, #3832 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw as Lead Counsel of Mark S. Cheffo by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wolosz, Justin)
April 9, 2012 Filing 3832 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3821 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #3831 Cross MOTION for Sanctions and Expenses and Fees filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
April 9, 2012 Filing 3831 Cross MOTION for Sanctions and Expenses and Fees by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
April 8, 2012 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 8, 2012 Filing 3830 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on March 30, 2012, before Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Helana Kline at helanakline@aol.com Redaction Request due 4/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 6, 2012 Filing 3829 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Brady Williams by Martha Accettullo. (Schwartz, Newton)
April 6, 2012 Filing 3828 DECLARATION re #3827 Brief of Mark S. Cheffo by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wolosz, Justin)
April 6, 2012 Filing 3827 BRIEF by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC on Submission of Bill of Fees and Costs Related to Attendance at March 30, 2012 Hearing on Motion for Sanctions. (Wolosz, Justin)
April 3, 2012 Filing 3826 STATUS REPORT by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
April 3, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion; The Motion to Continue is ALLOWED. The hearing is reset to April 9, 2012. #3779 MOTION for Sanctions, #3769 MOTION for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Simeone, Maria).
April 2, 2012 Filing 3825 MOTION to Continue Hearing date of April 5, 2012 to April 9, 10 or 12, 2012 by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
April 2, 2012 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #3822 Motion to Stay Discovery corrected because: Memorandum in Support was incorrectly filed as an attachment to the motion. The memorandum and supporting documents were separated from the motion to stay discovery, and re-docketed as separate entry #3824 in accordance with CM/ECF policy. (Anderson, Jennifer)
March 30, 2012 Filing 3824 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3822 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Martha Accettullo (re-docketed in accordance with CM/ECF policy). (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Jennifer)
March 30, 2012 Filing 3823 NOTICE Further Hearing on Motion. On this date, the Court held a hearing on Defendant Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions (Docket # 3769). It is ORDERED that the Court shall hold a further hearing on April 5, 2012, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24. It is further ORDERED that Mr. Schwartz and Mr. Harang shall appear at the hearing in person. It is further ORDERED that Mr. Cheffo shall submit a bill of fees and costs related to his attendance at todays hearing. (Chernetsky, James)
March 30, 2012 Filing 3822 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Martha Accettullo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of NBS, #4 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Newton)
March 30, 2012 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2012; Court addresses plaintiffs counsel re #3779 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc; Court hears the oral argument of counsel and will take the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Simeone, Maria)
March 30, 2012 Filing 3821 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Martha Accettullo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Newton)
March 29, 2012 Filing 3820 STATUS REPORT by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
March 29, 2012 Filing 3819 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Karen J. Greer. (Schwartz, Newton)
March 27, 2012 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #3817 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply corrected because: Document was original filed as a Sur-Reply instead of a Motion for Leave to File. Entry was edited to create a pending motion. (Anderson, Jennifer)
March 26, 2012 Filing 3818 REPLY to Response to #3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(London, Jack)
March 26, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Jack W. London et al.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply to Pfizer's Response to Their Joint Application for Reimbursement (Docket # 3816) is ALLOWED. (Chernetsky, James)
March 23, 2012 Filing 3817 MOTION for leave to file SUR-REPLY to Motion re #3805 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions filed by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Schwartz, Newton) Modified event on 3/27/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
March 23, 2012 Filing 3816 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Pfizer's Response to Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions #3814 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(London, Jack)
March 23, 2012 Filing 3815 REPLY to Response to #3769 MOTION for Sanctions by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Schwartz, Newton) Modified docket relationship on 3/27/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
March 22, 2012 Filing 3814 RESPONSE to Motion re #3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
March 20, 2012 Filing 3813 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee re Order on Motion to Unseal Document,,,, re Magistrate Judge Sorokin Electronic Order of March 14, 2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(London, Jack)
March 20, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion; A motion hearing has been set for 3/30/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin re #3769 MOTION for Sanctions : (Simeone, Maria)
March 20, 2012 Filing 3812 SEALED Excerpt Transcript of Motion Hearing (Biggs v Pfizer, Inc. only) held on December 1, 2011, before Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 19, 2012 Filing 3811 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee re Order, #3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions and Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Electronic Order dated March 12, 2012. (London, Jack)
March 14, 2012 Filing 3810 REPLY to Response to #3791 MOTION to Unseal Document #3764 Declaration filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3763 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3765 Exhi filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
March 14, 2012 Filing 3809 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs' Motion For Extension of Time To Secure Counsel (Docket # 3796) is ALLOWED, with a new deadline of April 30, 2012. The Court anticipates no further extensions of this deadline. (Chernetsky, James)
March 14, 2012 Filing 3808 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Plaintiff Debra Johnson Alsberges Motion For Extension of Time To Secure Counsel (Docket # 3795) is ALLOWED, with a new deadline of April 30, 2012. The Court anticipates no further extensions of this deadline. (Chernetsky, James)
March 14, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: Defendant Pfizer's Motion To Unseal Documents (Docket# 3791). The Motion to Unseal is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART in that Attorney London shall, within seven days, file an unsealed, redacted copy of all of the sealed materials he submitted in support of his application for reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund. Attorney London may redact the information protected by the attorney-client privilege or by work product doctrine. See Docket # 2512. However, the Court notes that a substantial portion of the submission appears to be unprotected by such considerations (e.g., bills from court reporters for transcribing depositions, or the fees charged by experts for appearing at depositions). In addition, the revised filings shall not redact the final total number representing the amount of money sought by Attorney London as reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund, unless Attorney London files a motion to seal offering good cause supporting the sealing of that piece of information. (Chernetsky, James)
March 14, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3807 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Pfizer's Motion to Unseal Documents ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
March 13, 2012 Filing 3807 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Pfizer's Motion to Unseal Documents by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolosz, Justin)
March 12, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. By March 19, 2012, Attorney London, or the Products Liability Steering Committee, shall make a further submission explaining the basis for the amount of the airfare for which the expert received reimbursement from Attorney London and now counsel submits for reimbursement to the Common Benefit Fund.(Simeone, Maria)
March 9, 2012 Filing 3806 REPLY to Response to #3779 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
March 9, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3805 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
March 8, 2012 Filing 3805 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Pfizer's Motion for Sanctions by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolosz, Justin)
March 8, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3803 Motion for Extension of Time to 06/11/12 to to extend the deadline imposed in this Court's February 17, 2011 Settlement Order of Dismissal (Simeone, Maria)
March 8, 2012 Filing 3804 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3791 MOTION to Unseal Document #3764 Declaration filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3763 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3765 Exhi filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3803 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/11/12 to to extend the deadline imposed in this Court's February 17, 2011 Settlement Order of Dismissal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3802 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: Hamiliton vs Pfizer 10-CV-11023 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3801 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: Libby vs Pfizer 06-CV-11482 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3800 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: Owens vs Pfizer 05-CV-11017 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3799 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: O'Sullivan vs. Pfizer 08-CV-11256 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3798 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: McGee v. Pfizer 05-CV-12593 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 7, 2012 Filing 3797 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Individual Case: Woolum v. Pfizer 07-CV-10853 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
March 5, 2012 Filing 3794 NOTICE of conditional Remand. (Jones, Sherry)
March 3, 2012 Filing 3793 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Current by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
March 2, 2012 Filing 3796 MOTION in letter form to Judge Sorokin for Extension of Time to secure counsel by Robin Stern Briggs.(Simeone, Maria)
March 2, 2012 Filing 3792 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3791 MOTION to Unseal Document #3764 Declaration filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3763 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3765 Exhi filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
March 2, 2012 Filing 3791 MOTION to Unseal Document #3764 Declaration filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3763 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3765 Exhibit filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
March 2, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3789 Motion for Extension of Time to May 30, 2012 to the deadline imposed by this Court's August 4, 2011 Order of Dismissal by Pfizer, Inc (Simeone, Maria)
March 1, 2012 Filing 3795 MOTION in letter form to Judge Sorokin for Extension of Time to secure counsel by Debra Johnson Alsberge.(Simeone, Maria)
March 1, 2012 Filing 3790 STATUS REPORT March 1, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wolosz, Justin)
March 1, 2012 Filing 3789 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 30, 2012 to the deadline imposed by this Court's August 4, 2011 Order of Dismissal by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company.(Wolosz, Justin)
February 24, 2012 Filing 3788 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kimm J. Davis. (Schwartz, Newton)
February 23, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #3735 Motion for Summary Judgment (re Santos v. Pfizer, Inc. 10-cv-11205-PBS): "After reviewing the motion and opposition, I have decided not to resolve the statute of limitations issue which involves Connecticut state law and a rare disease which was not litigated in the MDL. Accordingly, this Court's expertise as an MDL Judge will not be helpful. The parties shall inform the Court whether an Order of Remand to the transferor court is appropriate now." (Anderson, Jennifer)
February 23, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that the Schwartz firm shall supplement its response to the pending Motion for Sanctions (Docket #3769) by filing a list of all pending cases it has in this MDL and by listing for each case its current status and (if applicable) both the date a stay was requested and what further activity, if any, it is awaiting regarding the stay. (Chernetsky, James)
February 22, 2012 Filing 3787 Judge Patti B. Saris: SUGGESTION OF REMAND ORDER entered re #3766 MOTION to Remand filed by Deidre R. Rodriguez, Jack C. Reeves, Jr., Kelly Strickland, Kelly R. Strickland. (Re 05-cv-11993). (Anderson, Jennifer)
February 22, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3766 Motion to Remand. "ALLOWED without opposition." (Re 05-cv-11993) (Anderson, Jennifer)
February 21, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING MOTION #3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee to Chief Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Anderson, Jennifer) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin.
February 17, 2012 Filing 3786 SEALED REPLY to Response to #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Anderson, Jennifer)
February 16, 2012 Filing 3785 DECLARATION re #3784 Response to Motion, by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
February 16, 2012 Filing 3784 RESPONSE to Motion re #3769 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3a, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 5a (under seal), #8 Exhibit 5b, #9 Exhibit 5c, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 6a, #12 Exhibit 7)(Schwartz, Newton) (Attachment 7 replaced on 2/21/2012) (Anderson, Jennifer).
February 16, 2012 Filing 3783 REPLY to Response to #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED (Related to Santos v. Pfizer 10-11205-PBS) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
February 10, 2012 Filing 3782 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER re recusal entered. Objections due by 2/17/2012.(Anderson, Jennifer)
February 8, 2012 Filing 3781 Supporting documentation of request for ext of time to obtain counsel sent from Robin Briggs. (Simeone, Maria)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3780 STATUS REPORT February 2, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wolosz, Justin)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3779 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Anderson, Jennifer)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3778 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. On this date, the Court lifted the stay in Plaintiff Robin Sterns Briggs case. See Docket # 3773. The Courts Order crossed with the paper receipt of Briggss motion for an extension of time to locate counsel. Docket # 3774. Accordingly, the Court VACATES its Order of this date (Docket # 3773) and ALLOWS Briggss motion. The stay to permit Briggs to attempt to locate successor counsel is extended to March 2, 2012. (Chernetsky, James)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3777 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. On this date, the Court lifted the stay in Plaintiff Debra Johnson Alsberges case. See Docket # 3772. The Courts Order crossed with the paper receipt of Alsberges motion for an extension of time to locate counsel. Docket # 3775. Accordingly, the Court VACATES its Order of this date (Docket # 3772) and ALLOWS Alsberges motion. The stay to permit Alsberge to attempt to locate successor counsel is extended to March 2, 2012. (Chernetsky, James)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3776 RESPONSE to Motion re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ann Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Trantham, Patty)
February 2, 2012 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that Finkelstein & Partners, LLP shall mail to Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs a copy of Docket # 3773 and shall mail to the Amici Curiae, Mr. Reinert, copies of both Docket #s 3772 and 3773. (Chernetsky, James)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3773 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. On December 6, 2011, the Court permitted counsel for Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs to withdraw. Docket # 3729. At that time, the Court stayed her case until February 1, 2012, so that Briggs would have ample opportunity to obtain successor counsel. To date, no attorney has filed a Notice of Appearance on Briggss behalf, nor has Briggs made a request to extend the stay. Accordingly, the Court hereby LIFTS the stay of this case. (Chernetsky, James)
February 2, 2012 Filing 3772 Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. On December 6, 2011, the Court permitted counsel for Plaintiff Debra Johnson Alsberge to withdraw. Docket # 3730. At that time, the Court stayed her case until February 1, 2012, so that Alsberge would have ample opportunity to obtain successor counsel. To date, no attorney has filed a Notice of Appearance on Alsberges behalf, nor has Alsberge made a request to extend the stay. Accordingly, the Court hereby LIFTS the stay of this case. (Chernetsky, James)
February 1, 2012 Filing 3775 MOTION in letter form to Judge Sorokin by Debra Johnson Alsberge for Extension of Time to find new counsel and/or to Appoint Counsel; Responses due by 2/15/2012.(Simeone, Maria) (Main Document 3775 replaced on 2/6/2012) (Simeone, Maria).
January 31, 2012 Filing 3774 MOTION in letter form to Judge Sorokin by Robin Stern Briggs requesting to extend time to find new counsel and/or to Appoint Counsel. Responses due by 2/16/2012(Simeone, Maria) Modified on 2/2/2012 to reflect proper filing date 1/31/12 (Simeone, Maria). (Main Document 3774 replaced on 2/6/2012) (Simeone, Maria).
January 31, 2012 Filing 3771 DECLARATION re #3769 MOTION for Sanctions of Catherine B. Stevens by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolosz, Justin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 3770 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3769 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 3769 MOTION for Sanctions by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
January 26, 2012 Filing 3768 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Declaration, #2 SEALED Exhibit A, #3 SEALED Exhibit B, #4 SEALED Exhibit C, #5 SEALED Exhibit D)(Anderson, Jennifer)
January 26, 2012 Filing 3767 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3766 MOTION to Remand filed by Jack C. Reeves, Jr, Deidre R. Rodriguez, Kelly Strickland, Kelly R. Strickland (Re 1:05-cv-11993-PBS Strickland et al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Jennifer)
January 26, 2012 Filing 3766 MOTION to Remand by Jack C. Reeves, Jr, Deidre R. Rodriguez, Kelly Strickland, Kelly R. Strickland (Re 1:05-cv-11993-PBS Strickland et al v. Pfizer, Inc., et al). (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 25, 2012 Filing 3765 SEALED EXHIBITS A, B, C, and D, Filed Under Seal regarding #3763 Filed Under Seal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack) Modified docket text on 1/30/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
January 25, 2012 Filing 3764 SEALED DECLARATION re #3763 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3762 Filed Under Seal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack) Modified docket text on 1/30/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
January 25, 2012 Filing 3763 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack) Modified docket text on 1/30/2012 (Anderson, Jennifer).
January 25, 2012 Filing 3762 MOTION Joint Application of Jack W. London, Eugene Brooks, and Archie Carl Pierce for Reimbursement from the Common Benefit Fund for Expenses Incurred in Connection with Preservation Depositions by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(London, Jack)
January 25, 2012 Filing 3761 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Jack W. London for Cross, Poole &Smith, LLC (London, Jack)
January 24, 2012 Filing 3760 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER of Dismissal and Final Judgment entered (re Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc., et al No 06-11024-PBS, Plaintiffs David Weatherford and Janice Lee). (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 24, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3753 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). "ALLOWED without opposition." (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 23, 2012 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING #3757 Motion to Strike #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment . "DENIED." (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 18, 2012 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Michael Leu (Docket # 3640) is ALLOWED, without opposition. (Chernetsky, James).
January 17, 2012 Filing 3759 Opposition re #3757 MOTION to Strike #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Relates to Santos v. Pfizer, Inc - No. 10-11205-PBS) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
January 9, 2012 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #3757 Motion to Strike corrected because: Memorandum in Support was filed as an attachment instead of a separate entry. Document was re-docketed as #3758 Memorandum in Support. (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 9, 2012 Filing 3758 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3757 MOTION to Strike #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ann Santos. (Re-docketed as separate entry) (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 6, 2012 Filing 3757 MOTION to Strike #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann Santos. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of)(Trantham, Patty)
January 4, 2012 Filing 3756 STATUS REPORT January 4, 2012 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
January 3, 2012 Filing 3755 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Relates to: Smith v. Pfizer Inc, 05-cv-12386-PBS) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
January 3, 2012 Filing 3754 Plaintiff Teresa Drinkwine's ANSWER to #3751 Intervenor Complaint Re: individual case # 09-CV-10836 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
December 28, 2011 Filing 3753 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Re: Anderson, et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al 06cv11024 (Plaintiffs David Weatherford and Janice Lee) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolosz, Justin)
December 28, 2011 Filing 3752 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara E. Lynch on behalf of American Home Assurance Company (Lynch, Tara)
December 28, 2011 Filing 3751 First Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by American Home Assurance Company.(Rainville, Paul)
December 28, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING the unopposed Motion to Intervene of the American Home Assurance Company (Docket # 3732). (Chernetsky, James)
December 23, 2011 Filing 3750 BILL OF COSTS (re Anderson, et al v. Pfizer Inc, et al 06-cv-11024 David Weatherford). (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 23, 2011 Filing 3749 BILL OF COSTS (re Anderson et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al 06-cv-11024 Janice Lee). (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 22, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3748 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 2/2/2012. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 21, 2011 Filing 3748 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann Santos.(Trantham, Patty)
December 21, 2011 Filing 3747 NOTICE of Appearance by Patty Ann Trantham on behalf of Ann Santos (Trantham, Patty)
December 16, 2011 Filing 3746 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #3744 Affidavit by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 16, 2011 Filing 3745 NOTICE from the MDL Panel REMANDING CASE 05CV11501 BACK TO THEIR RESPECTIVE COURT. (Jones, Sherry)
December 15, 2011 Filing 3744 AFFIDAVIT of Catherine B. Stevens re #3743 Bill of Costs Against Janice Lee (Re Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer et. al. 06cv11024-PBS) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolosz, Justin)
December 15, 2011 Filing 3743 BILL OF COSTS Against Janice Lee (Re Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer et. al. 06cv11024-PBS) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Wolosz, Justin)
December 15, 2011 Filing 3742 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court entered (re Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Alabama, et al., v. Pfizer, Inc., et al., 1:06-cv-12295-PBS). (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 14, 2011 Filing 3741 SEALED DECLARATION of Catherine B. Stevens in Support re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment (re Santos v. Pfizer, Inc. No. 10-11205) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T) (Anderson, Jennifer) Modified docket text on 12/16/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
December 14, 2011 Filing 3740 SEALED Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment (re Santos v. Pfizer, Inc. 10-11205) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 14, 2011 Filing 3739 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment (re Santos v. Pfizer, Inc. No. 10-11205) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 13, 2011 Filing 3738 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Catherine B. Stevens REDACTED (Santos v. Pfizer, Inc, No. 10-11205-PBS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit C (REDACTED), #4 Exhibit D (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit E (REDACTED), #6 Exhibit F (REDACTED), #7 Exhibit G (REDACTED), #8 Exhibit H (REDACTED), #9 Exhibit I (REDACTED), #10 Exhibit J (REDACTED), #11 Exhibit K (REDACTED), #12 Exhibit L (REDACTED), #13 Exhibit M (REDACTED), #14 Exhibit N (REDACTED), #15 Exhibit O (REDACTED), #16 Exhibit P (REDACTED), #17 Exhibit Q (REDACTED), #18 Exhibit R (REDACTED), #19 Exhibit S (REDACTED), #20 Exhibit T (REDACTED))(Wolosz, Justin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 3737 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED (Santos v. Pfizer, Inc, No. 10-11205-PBS) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 3736 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED (Santos v. Pfizer, Inc, No. 10-11205-PBS) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 3735 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
December 8, 2011 Filing 3734 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ADOPTING #3711 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING #650 Motion to Remand. "I ADOPT the Report and Recommendations and ALLOW the Motion to Remand." (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 8, 2011 Filing 3733 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3732 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Rainville, Paul)
December 8, 2011 Filing 3732 MOTION to Intervene by American Home Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Intervening Complaint)(Rainville, Paul)
December 8, 2011 Filing 3731 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul S. Rainville on behalf of American Home Assurance Company (Rainville, Paul)
December 7, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING the Boone Law Firm and Pfizer's Joint Motion Motion for Extension of Time (Docket # 3727). (Chernetsky, James)
December 6, 2011 Filing 3730 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re: Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Debra Johnson Alsberge (Docket # 3409). The Motion is ALLOWED and the Plaintiff's case is STAYED until February 1, 2012, to allow the Plaintiff a reasonable additional period of time in which to obtain successor counsel. The Court notifies Alsberge that she may not be able to appear for the estate of her deceased husband and that if that is the case, then (absent successor counsel appearing on her behalf and prosecuting the case), the case could become subject to dismissal. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James).
December 6, 2011 Filing 3729 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re: Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs (Docket # 3574). The Motion is ALLOWED and the Plaintiff's case is STAYED until February 1, 2012, to allow the Plaintiff a reasonable additional period of time in which to obtain successor counsel. The Court notifies Briggs that she may not be able to appear for the estate of her deceased husband and that if that is the case, then (absent successor counsel appearing on her behalf and prosecuting the case), the case could become subject to dismissal. See attached Order. (Chernetsky, James).
December 2, 2011 Filing 3728 STATUS REPORT December 2, 2011 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Wolosz, Justin)
December 2, 2011 Filing 3727 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/1/2012 of the Deadline Imposed in this Court's August 4, 2011 Order of Dismissal (ECF Doc. # 3560) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
December 1, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2011; Court hears from counsel and each plaintiff separately on the motions to withdraws; re #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee, #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Simeone, Maria)
December 1, 2011 Filing 3726 Memorandum of Law in Response to #3700 Order, by Alexander A. Reinert. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 1, 2011 Filing 3725 OBJECTION to #3711 Report and Recommendations on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Magistrate Judge filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 30, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3723 Motion for Extension of Time (Simeone, Maria)
November 29, 2011 Filing 3723 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/12 to to extend the deadline imposed in this Court's settlement order of dismissal by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 29, 2011 Filing 3722 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual Case: Wampole v. Pfizer CV # 07-11072 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 29, 2011 Filing 3721 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual Case: Bennett v. Pfizer CV # 08-10678 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 29, 2011 Filing 3720 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual Case: Feyer v. Pfizer CV # 05-11035 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 28, 2011 Filing 3724 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 filed by Debra Johnson Alsberge. (Simeone, Maria)
November 28, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #3713 Motion to Continue. The Motion to Continue the hearing until January 31, 2012 is DENIED as that is too long a delay. (Simeone, Maria)
November 23, 2011 Filing 3718 Judge Patti B. Saris: SUGGESTION OF REMAND ORDER entered re Irene Barlow (case no. 05-cv-11501). (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 23, 2011 Filing 3717 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re #3712 Proposed Document(s) submitted filed by Irene Barlow: "I APPROVE the Order of Remand." (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 22, 2011 Filing 3715 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3714 Bill of Costs of Catherine B. Stevens (re Individual Case Weatherford v Pfizer 06cv11024). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolosz, Justin)
November 22, 2011 Filing 3714 BILL OF COSTS (re Individual Case Weatherford v Pfizer 06cv11024) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 21, 2011 Filing 3713 Letter MOTION to Judge Sorokin to Continue the hearing scheduled for December 1, 2011 to January 31, 2012 by Robin Stern Briggs.(Simeone, Maria)
November 18, 2011 Filing 3719 MOTION in Letter form to Judge Sorokin to Continue the 12/1/11 hearing to 1/31/12 by Debra Johnson Alsberge.(Simeone, Maria)
November 17, 2011 Filing 3712 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Irene Barlow. Document received: Proposed Suggestion of Remand Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(London, Jack)
November 17, 2011 Filing 3711 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: the Motion to Remand of Plaintiffs Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama and Municipal Workers Compensation Fund. For the following reasons, I RECOMMEND that the Court ALLOW the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to state court (Docket # 650-2). Objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by December 1, 2011. (Chernetsky, James).
November 17, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #3696 re #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957. Response to #3696 Memorandum due by 11/29/2011. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 16, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Alsberge (Docket # 3709) is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff Alsberge shall file her response to the memorandum of Finkelstein and Partners by the close of business on Tuesday, November 29, 2011. At the conclusion of the December 1, 2011, hearing on the Motion to Withdraw (Docket # 3409), the Court will consider whether additional post-hearing filings will be permitted. (Chernetsky, James)
November 15, 2011 Filing 3710 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered GRANTING #3701 Motion to Remand. "ALLOWED without opposition. Counsel shall prepare on Order of Remand." (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 15, 2011 Filing 3709 MOTION for Extension of Time by 4 weeks to file a response to Finkelsteins memorandum of law by Debra Johnson Alsberge.(Simeone, Maria)
November 14, 2011 Filing 3708 SEALED DECLARATION re #3707 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Kenneth B. Fromson in Reply and in further support of Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs, filed under seal and for in camera review by the Court by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 14, 2011 Filing 3707 SEALED REPLY to Response to #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 Memorandum in Reply and in further support of Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs, filed under seal and for in camera review by the Court filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
November 11, 2011 Filing 3702 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3701 MOTION to Remand filed by Irene Barlow. (London, Jack)
November 11, 2011 Filing 3701 MOTION to Remand by Irene Barlow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Suggestion of Remand Order)(London, Jack)
November 10, 2011 Filing 3706 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENYING #3651 Motion for Summary Judgment: "DENIED AS MOOT because Plaintiff filed a motion for voluntary dismissal, which the Court allowed." (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 10, 2011 Filing 3705 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENYING #3647 Motion for Summary Judgment: "DENIED AS MOOT because plaintiff filed a motion for voluntary dismissal which the Court allowed." (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 10, 2011 Filing 3704 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered GRANTING #3673 Motion to Dismiss: "ALLOWED with costs." (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 10, 2011 Filing 3703 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered GRANTING #3672 Motion to Dismiss as to Janice Lee. "ALLOWED with costs." (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 9, 2011 Filing 3700 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER REGARDING DISPUTE MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW...A Motion Hearing has been set for 12/1/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. re #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. (Simeone, Maria)
November 7, 2011 Filing 3699 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3698 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae filed by Debra Johnson Alsberge. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 7, 2011 Filing 3698 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by Debra Johnson Alsberge. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 4, 2011 Filing 3697 SEALED DECLARATION re #3696 Reply to Response to Motion, of Marshall P. Richer in reply and in further support of Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Debra Alsberge filed UNDER SEAL and for in camera review by the Court by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor) Modified docket text on 11/8/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
November 4, 2011 Filing 3696 SEALED REPLY to Response to #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 Memorandum in reply and in further support of Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Debra Alsberge, filed UNDER SEAL and for in camera review by the Court filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor) Modified docket text on 11/8/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
November 3, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3690 Motion for Leave to File Document; GRANTING #3691 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 2, 2011 Filing 3695 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mehmet Kilie. (Schwartz, Newton)
November 1, 2011 Filing 3694 STATUS REPORT November 1, 2011 (Relates to All Actions) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status report)(Wolosz, Justin)
November 1, 2011 Filing 3693 RESPONSE to Motion re #3672 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Janice Lee (06-11024) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 1, 2011 Filing 3692 RESPONSE to Motion re #3673 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Plaintiff David Weatherford (06-11024) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
November 1, 2011 Filing 3691 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (06-11024) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolosz, Justin)
November 1, 2011 Filing 3690 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (06-11024) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 24, 2011 Filing 3689 RESPONSE to Motion re #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 filed by Debra Johnson Alsberge. (Simeone, Maria)
October 20, 2011 Filing 3688 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by David D. Weatherford. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 20, 2011 Filing 3687 SEALED Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by David D. Weatherford. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 20, 2011 Filing 3686 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Janice W. Lee. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 20, 2011 Filing 3685 SEALED Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 In Support of Plaintiff's Response re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Janice W. Lee. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 20, 2011 Filing 3684 SEALED EXHIBITS 6-8 re #3675 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by David D. Weatherford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8) (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 20, 2011 Filing 3683 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #3674 Response to Motion by Janice W. Lee. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3682 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3681 DECLARATION re #3680 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3680 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (under seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (under seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (under seal))(Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3679 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3678 RESPONSE to Motion re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3677 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3676 DECLARATION re #3674 Response to Motion by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3675 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (under seal))(Schwartz, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Filing 3674 RESPONSE to Motion re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Virgil L. Anderson. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 18, 2011 Filing 3673 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by David D. Weatherford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
October 18, 2011 Filing 3672 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by Janice W. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
October 18, 2011 Filing 3671 REPLY to Response to #3665 Emergency MOTION to Quash the Trial Preservation Deposition of David Franklin and Modify the Court's October 8, 2010 Order ; Leave Granted on October 18, 2011 filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957. Responses due by 10/28/2011 Sur-replies due by 11/4/2011. (Simeone, Maria)
October 18, 2011 Reopen Document #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 further response due 10/28/11 (Simeone, Maria)
October 18, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On April 14, 2011 the Finkelstein Firm sought leave to withdraw from their representation of Plaintiff Alsberge (#3409). The Court allowed the Motion, without opposition, on May 9, 2011 (#3455). Subsequently, Ms. Alsberge requested reconsideration in a letter to the Court (#3662). The Finkelstein Firm concedes reconsideration is appropriate (#3664). Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES that portion of its May 9, 2011 Order allowing the motion to withdraw as to Plaintiff Alsberge and REINSTATES the Motion. Plaintiff Alsberge shall have until October 28, 2011 to file any further opposition or response to the motion (the Court will consider the letter already on file as an initial opposition). The Finkelstein Firm may file a reply by November 4, 2011 and is granted leave to file the reply under seal and in camera (subject to providing an unredacted copy to Aslberge). Counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of its filing to Magistrate Judge Sorokin's chambers. re #3409 MOTION to Withdraw #3662 Letter/request; #3455 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #3664 Response, filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee (Simeone, Maria)
October 18, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #3665 Motion to Quash; granting #3670 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Sorokin, Leo)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3670 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion to Quash the Trial Preservation Deposition of David Franklin and Modify the Court's October 8, 2010 Order by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3669 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #650 Joint MOTION for Order to For Leave to Proceed With Motion Practice, for Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Filed in the Transferor Court, and For Hearing at the March 13, 2007 Motion Hearing filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Municipal Workers Compensation Fund, Inc filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3668 DECLARATION re #3667 Response to Motion, re #3665 Emergency MOTION to Quash the Trial Preservation Deposition of David Franklin and Modify the Court's October 8, 2010 Order and Request for Expedited Decision by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3667 RESPONSE to Motion re #3665 Emergency MOTION to Quash the Trial Preservation Deposition of David Franklin and Modify the Court's October 8, 2010 Order and Request for Expedited Decision filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(London, Jack)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3666 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3665 Emergency MOTION to Quash the Trial Preservation Deposition of David Franklin and Modify the Court's October 8, 2010 Order filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3665 Emergency MOTION to Quash the Trial Preservation Deposition of David Franklin and Modify the Court's October 8, 2010 Order by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company.(Wolosz, Justin)
October 17, 2011 Filing 3664 Response by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee to #3409 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Individual Case: Alsberge v. Pfizer 05-CV-11699 and 06-CV-10957 Response to Debra Alsberge's Request to Reconsider Finkelstein & Partners, LLP's Motion to WIthdraw, and Counsel's Request for Leave to File a Reply Under Seal and In Camera. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
October 11, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Counsel shall file a response to this request by 10/25/11. re #3662 Letter/request for reconsideration by Debra Alsberg (Simeone, Maria)
October 11, 2011 Filing 3663 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Glenmark Generics Inc., USA. (Wotring, Earnest)
October 11, 2011 Filing 3662 Letter/request to Judge Sorokin from Debra Alsberge. (Simeone, Maria)
October 11, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #3661 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 10/14/2011. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 7, 2011 Filing 3661 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #650 Joint MOTION for Order to For Leave to Proceed With Motion Practice, for Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Filed in the Transferor Court, and For Hearing at the March 13, 2007 Motion Hearing filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Municipal Workers Compensation Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Slate, Pamela)
October 7, 2011 Filing 3660 NOTICE by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee of Amended Notice of Videotaped Preservation Deposition of Dr. David Franklin, Ph.D. (London, Jack)
October 6, 2011 Filing 3659 SEALED EXHIBITS A-B re #3649 Declaration by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2011 Filing 3658 SEALED Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2011 Filing 3657 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2011 Filing 3656 SEALED Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2011 Filing 3655 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3654 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3653 DECLARATION re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) of Mark S. Cheffo by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3652 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3651 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff David Weatherford (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al. v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al.) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3650 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3649 DECLARATION re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) of Mark S. Cheffo by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3648 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3647 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Janice Lee (Relates to 06cv11024 Anderson et. al v. Pfizer et. al.) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Wolosz, Justin)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3646 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jason M. Mitchell. (Schwartz, Newton)
October 4, 2011 Filing 3645 NOTICE by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC Certificate Of Compliance With Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) And Appellants' Amended Statement Of Issues On Appeal Re Amended Notice Of Appeal #3634 (Cheffo, Mark)
October 3, 2011 Filing 3644 STATUS REPORT October 3, 2011 (Relates to All Actions) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Report)(Wolosz, Justin)
October 3, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered entered #3640 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. If Plaintiff wishes to oppose or respond to this motion he must do so within fourteen days. (Simeone, Maria)
September 28, 2011 Filing 3643 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. On May 20, 2011, the Parties filed a joint report concerning management of Case No. 06-12295, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al. v. Pfizer, Inc., et al. (Docket # 3479). The Court intends to proceed to a ruling on the Plaintiffs' pending Motion to Remand and sets the following schedule for supplemental briefing: the Plaintiffs shall file any supplemental briefing by the close of business on October 7, 2011; the Defendants shall file any supplemental briefing by the close of business on October 17, 2011. Neither Partys supplemental briefing shall exceed seven pages in length. (Chernetsky, James).
September 28, 2011 Filing 3642 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3640 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael Leu re: Individual Case No.: 09-Cv-10422 filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 28, 2011 Filing 3641 DECLARATION re #3640 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael Leu re: Individual Case No.: 09-Cv-10422 of Kenneth B. Fromson, Esq. by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 28, 2011 Filing 3640 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael Leu re: Individual Case No.: 09-Cv-10422 by Members of the Class Plaintiffs Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 27, 2011 Filing 3639 NOTICE by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee of Videotaped Preservation Deposition of Dr. David Franklin, Ph.D. (London, Jack)
September 23, 2011 Filing 3638 NOTICE by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company of Partial Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Relates to: Agee et. al. v. Pfizer, et. al. 06cv11381-PBS and Blackwell v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al. 06cv10420-PBS) (Wolosz, Justin)
September 22, 2011 USCA Case Number 11-2096 for #3634 Notice of Appeal, filed by Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc. (Ramos, Jeanette)
September 22, 2011 Filing 3637 MOTION for Leave to File on behalf of Finkelstein & Partners, LLP, motion for leave to file a reply, under seal, for in camera review by the Court, to Plaintiff's response to the firm's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Robin Stern Briggs by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
September 22, 2011 Filing 3636 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #3634 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Page 2, #2 Page 3, #3 Page 4, #4 Page 5, #5 Page 6, #6 Page 7, #7 Page 8, #8 Page 9, #9 Page 10, #10 Page 11, #11 Page 12, #12 Page 13, #13 Page 14, #14 Page 15, #15 Page 16, #16 Page 17)(Ramos, Jeanette)
September 22, 2011 Filing 3635 Letter from Robin Briggs To Judge Sorokin re withdrawal of counsel. (Simeone, Maria)
September 21, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #3634 Notice of Appeal,,,,, for $455.00 paid on 09/20/2011, receipt number 0101-3589703. (Adam, Lucien)
September 21, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #3634 Notice of Appeal,,,,, for $455.00 paid on 09/20/2011, receipt number 0101-3589701. (Adam, Lucien)
September 20, 2011 Filing 3634 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3326 Judgment, #3601 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #3630 Order, #3551 Order on Motion for New Trial, #3602 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, Electronic Order of 2/18/2010; Electronic Order of 7/7/2011 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-3589704 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/11/2011. (Cheffo, Mark) Modified to add document relationships on 9/21/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
September 20, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing: Status Conference re Assurant Cases scheduled for 10/20/11 cancelled. (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 20, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3633 Motion to Cancel Hearing. (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 15, 2011 Filing 3633 STATUS REPORT and Unopposed MOTION to Cancel Hearing Regarding Assurant Health, Inc., et al. v. Pfizer Inc, et al. (No. 05-10535) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolosz, Justin) Modified event on 9/16/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
September 14, 2011 Filing 3632 REPLY to Response to #3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) (Response/Opp at Dkt. # 3599) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Wolosz, Justin)
September 14, 2011 Filing 3631 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MATTERS; The Fourth Motion to Stay by Schwartz Law Firm (#3626) is ALLOWED. The Heninger law firm has filed five motions to withdraw (#3623 Whitten, #3621 Poole, #3619 Grissom, #3617 Eaddy and #3615 Agee). If the Court receives neither responses nor objections to these motions then the individual plaintiffs shall have until October 7, 2011 either (1) to arrange for successor counsel and for successor counsel to file a notice of appearance with the Court or (2) to file a notice with the Court stating the plaintiff intends to proceed pro se. Counsel shall serve a copy of this Order upon each plaintiff named in these motions. Defendants move (#3580) for monetary sanctions..The Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Defendants first filing motion(s) for summary judgment. Defendants move to dismiss seven plaintiffs represented by the Heninger Garrison law firm for failure to comply with court orders (#3588)In light of the motions to withdraw and the Courts Order on those motions, the remaining Plaintiffs (Grissom, Poole, Whitten, Blackwell and Huff) shall have until October 7, 2011 to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss. The Motion for Leave to File a Reply (#3614) is ALLOWED (Simeone, Maria)
September 13, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 10/20/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris re Assurant Cases. (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 9, 2011 Filing 3630 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re #3603 Notice (Other) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. "I ORDER that the Kaiser regional subsidaries be joined as plaintiffs." (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 9, 2011 Filing 3629 SEALED EXHIBIT A re #3628 Declaration by Martha Accettullo, Mary J. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 9, 2011 Reopen Document #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3628 DECLARATION re #3626 Fourth MOTION to Stay Discovery of Newton Schwartz by Martha Accettullo, Mary J. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3627 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3626 Fourth MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Martha Accettullo, Mary J. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3626 Fourth MOTION to Stay Discovery by Martha Accettullo, Mary J. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr.(Schwartz, Newton)
September 8, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; The Motion to Vacate (#3604) that portion of the August 16, 2011 Electronic Order allowing the Motion to Withdraw (#3574 ) is ALLOWED. The Motion to Withdraw (#3574) shall be restore to an active motion. Ms. Briggs shall have until September 20, 2011 to arrange replacement counsel and/or file any further response to the motion. The request of amici in their letter dated August 29, 2011 to file their amici letter is ALLOWED. In the future, in the event amici wish to make further filings with the court, they shall do so in the form of a pleading rather rather than a letter to the Court. re #3604 Motion for Reconsideration re #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee (Simeone, Maria)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3625 SEALED EXHIBIT re #3614 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3624 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3623 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jessica Whitten. (Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3623 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jessica Whitten.(Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3622 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3621 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jacqueline Poole. (Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3621 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jacqueline Poole.(Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3620 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3619 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Odessa Grissom. (Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3619 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Odessa Grissom.(Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3618 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3617 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Leisa Eaddy. (Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3617 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Leisa Eaddy.(Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3616 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3615 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Shelia Agee. (Bross, William)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3615 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shelia Agee.(Bross, William)
September 7, 2011 Filing 3614 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted))(Wolosz, Justin)
September 2, 2011 Filing 3613 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Ana M. Francisco (Francisco, Ana)
September 2, 2011 Filing 3612 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Wolosz on behalf of Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company (Wolosz, Justin)
September 2, 2011 Filing 3611 STIPULATION of Dismissal Relates to: Baker v. Pfizer, Inc. et. al. 06cv11382 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Francisco, Ana)
September 2, 2011 Filing 3610 STIPULATION of Dismissal Relates to: Reach v Pfizer, Inc. et. al. 06cv11390 by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Francisco, Ana)
September 1, 2011 Filing 3609 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Thomas M. Greene (Greene, Thomas)
September 1, 2011 Filing 3608 STATUS REPORT RELATES TO ALL ACTIONS (Pursuant to the Court's May 16, 2005, Procedural Order) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attached Status Report)(Francisco, Ana)
September 1, 2011 Filing 3603 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #3601 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Concerning Kaiser Regional Subsidiaries' Non-Objection to Joinder (Nussbaum, Linda)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3607 SEALED EXHIBIT II re #3599 REDACTED OPPOSITION, #3606 UNREDACTED Opposition to #3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit III, #2 Exhibit IV, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit V-A, #5 Exhibit V-B, #6 Exhibit V-C, #7 Exhibit V-D, #8 Exhibit VI, #9 Exhibit VI-A, #10 Exhibit VII, #11 Exhibit VII-A, #12 Exhibit VII-B, #13 Exhibit VII-C, #14 Exhibit VII-D)(Anderson, Jennifer)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3606 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) filed by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3605 RESPONSE to Letter Motion re #3604 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327. (Simeone, Maria)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3604 Letter MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 by Robin Stern Briggs.(Simeone, Maria)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3602 Judge Patti B. Saris: AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW entered. "ORDER: The Court finds the defendants liable under the California Unfair Competition Law for conduct related to the following off-label conditions: (1) bipolar disorder; (2) neuropathic pain; (3) migraine; and (4) doses greater than 1800 mg/day. The Court orders defendants to pay restitution to the Kaiser Foundation Health Plan in the amount of $95,286,518." (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3601 Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #3364 Motion for Amended and Additional Findings. "ORDER: Based on the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES IN PART defendants' motion for amended and additional findings (Docket No. 3364), and ALLOWS IN PART as to those alterations included in the accompanying amended findings of fact and conclusions of law." (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 31, 2011 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #3599 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Response to #3580 Motion for Sanctions corrected because: Document was originally filed as a motion instead of a memorandum. As such, the pending motion was terminated and the docket text was modified to reflect the correct event. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 30, 2011 Filing 3600 DECLARATION re #3599 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION AND RESPONSE TO #3580 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (DECLARATION OF MABEL LEE LO) by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton) Modified docket text on 8/31/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
August 30, 2011 Filing 3599 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION AND RESPONSE TO #3580 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I-A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit I-B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit I-C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit II Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit III Under Seal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit IV Under Seal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit V Under Seal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit V-A Under Seal, #10 Exhibit Exhibit V-B Under Seal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit V-C Under Seal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit V-D Under Seal, #13 Exhibit Exhibit VI Under Seal, #14 Exhibit Exhibit VI-A Under Seal, #15 Exhibit Exhibit VII Under Seal, #16 Exhibit Exhibit VII-A Under Seal, #17 Exhibit Exhibit VII-B Under Seal, #18 Exhibit Exhibit VII-C Under Seal, #19 Exhibit Exhibit VII-D Under Seal)(Schwartz, Newton) Modified docket text to reflect event on 8/31/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer). Modified on 8/31/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
August 30, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered FINDING AS MOOT #3252 Motion to Include Third Party Defendant; FINDING AS MOOT #3253 Motion for Subpoena of Records. These Motions are MOOT as the case has been remanded to Southern District of Ohio; Case Number 2:05-cv-00657. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 29, 2011 Filing 3598 STATUS REPORT REGARDING COMPLETION OF INITIAL FACT DISCOVERY (Relates to Products Liability Actions) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Francisco, Ana)
August 29, 2011 Filing 3597 STATUS REPORT for Plaintiffs Represented by the Schwartz firm by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schwartz, Newton) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/1/2011) (Anderson, Jennifer).
August 29, 2011 Filing 3596 STATUS REPORT August 29, 2011 Products Liability Cases Other Than Cases Represented by the Schwartz Firm, the Boone Firm, and Finkelstein and Partners, by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (London, Jack)
August 29, 2011 Filing 3595 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Scott L. Walker (Walker, Scott)
August 29, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3591 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to 12/12/11 to extend by 90 days the settlement deadline. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 29, 2011 Filing 3594 STATUS REPORT on Finkelstein & Partners, LLP cases remaining in the MDL by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 25, 2011 Filing 3593 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Relates to: Garcia v. Pfizer Inc, et al. 06-11775) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Francisco, Ana)
August 23, 2011 Filing 3592 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Relates to: Minervino v. Pfizer Inc, et al. 05-cv-11513) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Francisco, Ana)
August 22, 2011 Filing 3591 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/12/11 to to extend by 90 days the deadline imposed in the Court's Settlement Order of Dismissal (doc # 3307) by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 22, 2011 Filing 3590 STIPULATION of Dismissal re: Individual Case: Sizemore v. Pfizer 06-10111 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 19, 2011 Filing 3589 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3588 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC (Relates to: Agee 06-11381; Blackwell 06-10420) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Francisco, Ana)
August 19, 2011 Filing 3588 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC (Relates to: Agee 06-11381; Blackwell 06-10420) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Francisco, Ana)
August 19, 2011 Filing 3587 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Adam M. Slater (Slater, Adam)
August 19, 2011 Filing 3585 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC before Judge Patti B. Saris, (Cheffo, Mark)
August 19, 2011 Filing 3584 NOTICE by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee Notice in reponse to Judge Saris's August 12, 2011 Order (doc # 3625) that Plaintiffs intend to pursue cases against the generic defendants in: Drinkwine v. Pfizer 09-10836; Leu v. Pfizer 09-10422; Peterson v. Pfizer 10-10933; Hamilton v. Pfizer 10-11023 (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 18, 2011 Filing 3586 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER Granting Continued Stay of Execution without Supersedeas Bond Pending Appeal entered re #3567 Assented to MOTION to Stay Execution Without Supersedeas Bond Pending Appeal filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc. (re Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., et al., v. Pfizer Inc, et al. 04-cv-10739). (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 18, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3567 Motion for Continued Stay of Execution without Supersedeas Bond Pending Appeal (re Kaiser case 04-cv-10739). (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 17, 2011 Filing 3583 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 16, 2011 Filing 3582 DECLARATION re #3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) [CATHERINE B. STEVENS] by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 SEALED Exhibit B, #3 SEALED Exhibit C, #4 SEALED Exhibit D, #5 SEALED Exhibit E, #6 SEALED Exhibit F, #7 SEALED Exhibit G, #8 SEALED Exhibit H, #9 SEALED Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 SEALED Exhibit K, #12 SEALED Exhibit L)(Francisco, Ana) (Sealed Exhibits Attached on 8/17/2011) (Anderson, Jennifer).
August 16, 2011 Filing 3581 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) (REDACTED VERSION) filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Francisco, Ana)
August 16, 2011 Filing 3580 MOTION for Sanctions (Relates to Anderson, et al. v. Pfizer, Inc, et al. 06-11024-PBS) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC.(Francisco, Ana)
August 16, 2011 Filing 3579 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re: Individual case: Campbell v. Pfizer 06-CV-11483 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 16, 2011 Filing 3578 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re: Individual case: George v. Pfizer 06-CV-10112 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 16, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #3571 Motion to Stay; The Motion to Stay is ALLOWED with the same status report date as established in response to the second motion to stay. re #3574 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is ALLOWED. The plaintiff shall file a status report on August 29, 2011 regarding the hiring of new counsel. Attorney Eleanor Louise Polimeni terminated (Simeone, Maria)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3577 NOTICE by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee of Amended Notice of Videotaped Preservation Deposition of Cheryl Blume, Ph.D. (Address Correction) (London, Jack)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3576 DECLARATION re #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 of Kenneth B. Fromson, Esq. by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3575 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 filed by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee. (Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3574 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Individual Case: Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 05-CV-1170; Briggs v. Pfizer Inc. 07-CV-10327 by Members of the Plaintiffs Product Liability Steering Committee.(Polimeni, Eleanor)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3573 DECLARATION re #3571 Third MOTION to Stay Discovery of Newton Schwartz by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Newton)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3572 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3571 Third MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr. (Schwartz, Newton)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3571 Third MOTION to Stay Discovery by Martha Accettullo, Virgil L. Anderson, Kamaliha Brewster, Charles D. Girard, Sr.(Schwartz, Newton)
August 12, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "The Court previously allowed a Motion to Stay all Proceedings Involving Generic Defendants (Docket No. #3265 ). In light of new Supreme Court precedent, PLIVA, Inc. v. Mensing, 131 S. Ct. 2567 (2011), those plaintiffs bringing cases against generic defendants shall notify the Court on or before August 19, 2011 regarding whether or not they intend to pursue these cases." (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 12, 2011 Filing 3570 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Relates to Gaudio, et al. v Pfizer Inc, et al. 06-11580) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Francisco, Ana)
August 11, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. By August 29, 2011, the parties shall file a report with the Court explaining the status of each group of products liability cases (e.g. Schwartz cases, pro se cases etc) as well as the status of each individual products liability case. The report should include information regarding what, if anything, remains before this Court transfers the case back to the district in which it was filed as well as any pertinent information regarding either a possible settlement, a dismissal or a withdrawal by counsel.( Status Report due by 8/29/2011)(Simeone, Maria)
August 11, 2011 Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; The Motion to Stay (#3542) is ALLOWED. The Court further Orders that the Schwartz Law Firm shall inform the Court of the status of the discontinuation process it has begun, as to each case subject to this STAY, by August 29, 2011. re #3542 Motion to Stay (Simeone, Maria)
August 10, 2011 Filing 3569 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen DeValerio on behalf of Aetna, Inc. (DeValerio, Glen)
August 10, 2011 Filing 3568 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3567 Assented to MOTION to Stay Execution Without Supersedeas Bond Pending Appeal filed by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
August 10, 2011 Filing 3567 Assented to MOTION to Stay Execution Without Supersedeas Bond Pending Appeal by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheffo, Mark)
August 10, 2011 Filing 3566 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Relates to Wilson v. Pfizer Inc 05-cv-11502) by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Francisco, Ana)
August 8, 2011 USCA Case Number 11-1904 for #3562 Notice of Appeal, filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc. (Ramos, Jeanette)
August 8, 2011 Filing 3565 Surreply Response by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC To Plaintiffs Brief #3561 Regarding Their Purported Standing To Recover On Behalf Of Non-Party Subsidiaries. (Cheffo, Mark)
August 8, 2011 Filing 3564 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #3562 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2011: # 1 Corrected Cover Sheet) (Ramos, Jeanette). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2011: #2 Page 1, #3 Page 2, #4 Page 3, #5 Page 4, #6 Page 5, #7 Page 6, #8 Page 7, #9 Page 8, #10 Page 9, #11 Page 10, #12 Page 11, #13 Page 12, #14 Page 13, #15 Page 14, #16 Page 15, #17 Page 16) (Ramos, Jeanette). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2011: #18 Page 17) (Ramos, Jeanette).
August 8, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3563 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 5, 2011 Filing 3563 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply To Plaintiffs Brief Regarding Their Purported Standing To Recover On Behalf Of Non-Party Subsidiaries by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cheffo, Mark)
August 5, 2011 Filing 3562 Defendants' NOTICE OF APPEAL re #3326 Judgment; Electronic Order of 2/18/2010; Electronic Order of 7/7/2011; #3551 Memorandum and Order by Pfizer, Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-3530708 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/25/2011. (Cheffo, Mark) Modified docket relationships on 8/8/2011 (Anderson, Jennifer).
August 5, 2011 Filing 3561 Reply Brief Concerning Kaiser Foundation Health Plan's Standing to Recover on Behalf of Its Regional Subsidiaries Response by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals to #3554 Response filed by Pfizer, Inc. and Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Nussbaum, Linda)
August 5, 2011 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3559 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 4, 2011