Skyline Software Systems, Inc. v. Keyhole, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Skyline Software Systems, Inc. sued defendant Keyhole, Inc. for patent infringement. Plaintiff alleges that Google Earth and other products provided by defendants infringe on U.S. Patent No. 6,496,189 entitled "Remote landscape display and pilot training."

Plaintiff: Skyline Software Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Keyhole, Inc and Google, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Keyhole, Inc, GOOGLE, INC. and Google, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Skyline Software Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006cv10980
Filed: June 5, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2007 Filing 87
NOTICE of Docketing (Nici, Richard)
May 18, 2007 Filing 86
Certified and Transmitted Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet & Memorandum and Orders No. 5, 77, from case 06-10980 Order No. 96, 140 from 04-11129 on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 84 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
April 26, 2007 Filing 84
Plaintiff's NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Skyline Software Systems, Inc. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1498004 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 5/16/2007. (Haight, Geri) Modified on 5/17/2007 (Nici, Richard).
April 11, 2007 Filing 83
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiff.(Rynne, Michelle)
April 6, 2007 Filing 82
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Keyhole, Inc, GOOGLE, INC., Keyhole, Inc, Google, Inc., Keyhole, Inc, Google, Inc.. Document received: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ASSENTED MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF FEBRUARY 23, 2007 SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING TRANSCRIPT. (Mewes, Heather)
March 7, 2007 Filing 77
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting [47] Sealed Motion, denying [47] Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. No later than April 20, 2007, the parties shall file a joint status report outlining what further steps are necessary to reduce this case to judgment. The trial date in this matter set for June 4, 2007 and related pre-trial orders are vacated. (Woodlock, Douglas)
February 23, 2007 Filing 75
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Ibrahim M. Hallaj (Hallaj, Ibrahim)
February 22, 2007 Filing 76
Letter/request (non-motion) from Geri L. Haight. DVD forwarded with letter. (Nici, Richard)
February 21, 2007 Filing 74
JOINT STATEMENT of counsel re Agenda for Summary Judgment Hearing. (Woo, Darryl)
February 12, 2007 Filing 72
REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of the Patent-In-Suit filed by Skyline Software Systems, Inc.. (Haight, Geri)
February 9, 2007 Filing 71
REPLY to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Anticipation Based on the Public Use of TerraVision filed by Keyhole, Inc, Google, Inc.. (Woo, Darryl)
February 5, 2007 Filing 63
NOTICE of Change of Address by Saundra M. Riley Of Attorneys of Record for Defendants Keyhole, Inc. and Google Inc. (Riley, Saundra)
February 2, 2007 Filing 62
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of the Patent-in-Suit filed by Keyhole, Inc, Google, Inc.. (Woo, Darryl)
November 27, 2006 Filing 7
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER consolidating cases. Civil Action No. 04-11129-DPW will be administratively closed and any further filings in these cases shall indicate the lead docket as Civil Action No. 06-10980-DPW.(Rynne, Michelle)
November 22, 2006 Filing 6
Defendants Keyhole, Inc.'s and Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint to First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM to the First Amended Complaint against Skyline Software Systems, Inc. by Keyhole, Inc, Google, Inc..(Riley, Saundra)
November 16, 2006 Filing 5
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered construing additional terms in the '189 patent. (Woodlock, Douglas)
July 27, 2006 Filing 2
Defendants Keyhole, Inc.'s And Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Skyline Software Systems, Inc. by Keyhole, Inc, GOOGLE, INC..(Riley, Saundra)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skyline Software Systems, Inc. v. Keyhole, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyline Software Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Flavio M. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyhole, Inc
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Keyhole, Inc
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Skyline Software Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?