Christine Varad v. Reed Elsevier Incorporated Featured Case

Plaintiff Christine Varad alleges that defendant Reed-Elsevier Incorporated d/b/a Lexis-Nexis Corporation and Lexis-Nexis Accurint violated her rights under the Fair Credit Reporting Act by failing to provide her with a complete copy of her file as held by Lexis Nexis Accurint, which was used by a third party in making employment decisions.

Plaintiff: Christine M. Varad
Defendant: Reed Elsevier Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2006cv11370
Filed: August 8, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Plymouth
Presiding Judge: Judith G. Dein
Presiding Judge: Mark L. Wolf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2009 Appeal Record Returned: 77 Notice of Appeal, (Gawlik, Cathy)
July 31, 2009 Filing 91 MANDATE of USCA as to 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Christine M. Varad. Appeal 77 Terminated (Gawlik, Cathy)
July 7, 2009 Filing 90 USCA Judgment as to 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Christine M. Varad, 82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Christine M. Varad. We grant the appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP), but deny it insofar as appellant asks this court to effectively seal her supporting affidavit. The appellant's request is conclusory. The judgment of the district court is summarily affirmed. The appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted as indicated herein and otherwise denied. (Ramos, Jeanette)
August 27, 2008 Filing 89 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 77 Notice of Appeal, 82 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 88 (Ramos, Jeanette)
August 26, 2008 Document No. 88, Memorandum and Order forwarded to the Court of Appeals (Boyce, Kathy)
August 26, 2008 Filing 88 Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The plaintiff's Motion to Appeal in forma pauperis (Docket No. 85) is DENIED. 2. The Clerk is directed to send the plaintiff a copy of the form financial affidavit used by the United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. 3. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the First Circuit. (O'Leary, Dennis)
August 4, 2008 Filing 87 Opposition re 85 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
July 30, 2008 Filing 86 Letter/request (non-motion) from Christine Varad to Clerk, FILED. (Attachments: # 1 Court of Appeals Order of Court entered 7/23/08)(Boyce, Kathy)
July 30, 2008 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
June 25, 2008 Filing 84 USCA Case Number 08-1734 for 77 Notice of Appeal, filed by Christine M. Varad. (Ramos, Jeanette)
June 9, 2008 Filing 83 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 77 Notice of Appeal, 82 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(Ramos, Jeanette)
May 28, 2008 Filing 82 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 80 Judgment by Christine M. Varad NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 6/17/2008. (Boyce, Kathy)
May 6, 2008 Filing 81 Remark - Corrected judgment added to entry no. 80 with the correct caption. (O'Leary, Dennis)
May 5, 2008 Filing 80 Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff(O'Leary, Dennis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2008: # 1 Corrected judgment) (O'Leary, Dennis).
May 3, 2008 Filing 79 Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The attached Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 76) is ADOPTED by the court and INCORPORATED in this Memorandum pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1). 2. For the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 69) is ALLOWED. 3. The defendant's Motion to Strike the Notice of Appeal (Docket No. 78) is DENIED. (Attachments: # 1 Report and Recommendation)(O'Leary, Dennis)
April 4, 2008 Filing 78 MOTION to Strike 77 Notice of Appeal, by Reed Elsevier Incorporated.(Cataldo, Kristin)
March 21, 2008 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEAL re 76 by Christine M. Varad NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 4/10/2008. (Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 4/3/2008 to link the notice of appeal to Document 76 (Boyce, Kathy).
February 26, 2008 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
February 26, 2008 Filing 76 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 69 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Recommendation: that the Motion be allowed. Objections to R&R due by 3/11/2008.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
October 12, 2007 Filing 75 Judge Judith G. Dein : MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting 58 Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to "Thomas J. Quinn, Chairperson, Maine Board of Bar Examiners." (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
October 3, 2007 Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2007 re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. USMJ Dein hears arguments from Attorney Cataldo and Pro Se Varad and takes motion under advisement. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
September 13, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 69 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
September 13, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Defendant has complied with this court's order of 8/1/07. To the extent Plaintiff believes a motion to compel is appropriate, she must first consult with counsel as required by Local Rule 7.1(2). (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
September 12, 2007 Filing 74 Response by Christine M. Varad to 71 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 and Pltf's Statement of Material Facts, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
September 12, 2007 Filing 73 Opposition to 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Tab 1# 2 Tab 2# 3 Tab 3# 4 Tab 4# 5 Tab 5)(Boyce, Kathy)
September 10, 2007 Filing 72 Opposition re 68 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
September 4, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy of 71 Defendant's Statement of Material Facts. Counsel is requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document to Judge Dein by 9/14/07. The document must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 31, 2007 Filing 71 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 TAB 1# 2 TAB 2# 3 TAB 3# 4 TAB 4# 5 TAB 5# 6 TAB 6# 7 TAB 7# 8 TAB 8# 9 TAB 9# 10 TAB 10)(Cataldo, Kristin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Support re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Reed Elsevier Incorporated.(Cataldo, Kristin)
August 27, 2007 Filing 68 MOTION for Sanctions against the defendant for failure to comply with court order to respond to plaintiff's Interrogatories. by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(York, Steve)
August 15, 2007 Filing 67 Opposition re 58 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued to "Thomas J. Quinn, Chairperson, Maine Board of Bar Examiners" filed by Christine M. Varad., FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Boyce, Kathy)
August 14, 2007 Filing 66 Response by Reed Elsevier Incorporated to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories. (Cataldo, Kristin)
August 3, 2007 Filing 65 Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Join the Maine Board of Bar Examiners as a Defendant. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 2, 2007 Filing 64 SUR-REPLY to Motion re 56 MOTION to Join the "Main Board of Bar Examiners" as a Deft filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
August 2, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting 63 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. Counsel should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 1, 2007 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cataldo, Kristin)
August 1, 2007 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Join the "Main Board of Bar Examiners" as a Deft filed by Christine M. Varad, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
August 1, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Any objection that the discovery filed on 7/1/07 was untimely is overruled. Defendant shall file responses to the discovery requests, including any other objections, within 14 days of the date of this order. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 1, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 1, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
July 30, 2007 Filing 61 MOTION to Compel, FILED, c/s. by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Boyce, Kathy)
July 30, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boyce, Kathy)
July 30, 2007 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time for Submission of Motions for Summary Judgment for an additional 30 days from 8/31/07 to a later date of 9/30/07, by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
July 30, 2007 Filing 58 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued to "Thomas J. Quinn, Chairperson, Maine Board of Bar Examiners" by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cataldo, Kristin)
July 18, 2007 Filing 57 Opposition re 56 MOTION to Join the "Main Board of Bar Examiners" as a Deft filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cataldo, Kristin)
July 5, 2007 Filing 56 Fed. R.Civ.P.21 MOTION to Join the "Maine Board of Bar Examiners" as a Deft by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Boyce, Kathy)
June 27, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered regarding 54 Thomas Quinn's Motion to Quash, and 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Subpoena. As agreed by the plaintiff, the subpoena commanding third-party, Thomas J. Quinn, to appear at a deposition, to produce documents and to answer written questions to be posed at the deposition in Maine should have been issued by the United States District Court for the District of Maine. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(a)(2). Accordingly, Mr. Quinns motion to quash the subpoena is ALLOWED. The plaintiffs request to amend the subpoena is DENIED. In order to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, the subpoena must be issued by the District Court for the District of Maine, not just state the name of the appropriate court. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 25, 2007 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Subpoena and Pltf's Opposition to Motion to Quash by Christine M. Varad, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Boyce, Kathy)
June 21, 2007 Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2007 re 46 MOTION to Compel filed by Christine M. Varad.; USMJ Dein hears arguments from Pro Se Varad and Attorney Cataldo and denied motion and will issue order. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
June 21, 2007 Filing 54 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued by Pltffiled by Thomas J. Quinn, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Boyce, Kathy)
June 21, 2007 Filing 53 Letter/request to the Clerk (non-motion) from Christopher Taub, Assistant Attorney General stating that he is in the process of ECF registration and at this time it is necessary to file the motion to quash in paper form, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
June 21, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered regarding 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. After hearing, the Motion is denied. Defendant is to produce any written policies relating to how long Seisint and/orLexisNexis Risk maintain reports of the type sent to Gall & Gall or confirm that no such policies exist by 7/13/07. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 21, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 20, 2007 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B), FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
June 18, 2007 Filing 51 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Thomas J. Quinn, Chairperson, Maine Board of Bar Examiners with service on June 7, 2007, FILED. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments to Executed Subpoena)(Boyce, Kathy)
June 12, 2007 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) by Reed Elsevier Incorporated.(Cataldo, Kristin)
June 8, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 46 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 4, 2007 Filing 49 Opposition re 46 MOTION to Compel Producton of Documents filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
June 4, 2007 Filing 48 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reed Elsevier Incorporated, filed by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
May 30, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered regarding 45 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Amend Complaint. There being no opposition, the Motion is allowed. Plaintiff should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Plaintiff must include - Leave to File Granted on [date of order] - in the caption of the document. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) Modified on 5/30/2007 (Dambrosio, Jolyne).
May 23, 2007 Filing 47 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL re 46 MOTION to Compel and Deadline for Opposition by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cataldo, Kristin)
May 18, 2007 Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 34 and 37(a) by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boyce, Kathy) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
May 10, 2007 Filing 45 Second MOTION to Amend 39 Amended Complaint by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Boyce, Kathy)
May 8, 2007 Filing 44 Fed. R. Civ. P. WRITTEN STATEMENT of Review Deposition by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A), FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
May 3, 2007 Filing 43 Judge Judith G. Dein : SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER entered denying without prejudice 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
May 2, 2007 Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 5/2/2007, Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2007 re 40 MOTION to Compel filed by Christine M. Varad,. Pro Se Varad and Attorney Cataldo report status of discovery to date; Attorney Cataldo will resend documents and Pro Se Varad may file supplemental motion to compel; discovery shall be completed on 7/13/07; summary judgment motions due 8/31/07; (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
May 1, 2007 Filing 42 Opposition re 40 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a) filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
May 1, 2007 Filing 41 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Reed Elsevier Incorporated.(Cataldo, Kristin)
April 25, 2007 Filing 38 Pltf's JOINT STATEMENT of counsel, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
April 25, 2007 Filing 37 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Defendant Pursuant to Court's January 18, 2007 Order by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
April 23, 2007 Filing 40 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(a) by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C), FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2007 (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 4/27/2007 to attach correct document to docket entry (Boyce, Kathy).
April 23, 2007 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christine M. Varad , filed by Christine M. Varad, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
April 4, 2007 Filing 36 Judge Judith G. Dein : MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, and denying 4 Defendant's Motion for Substitution. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
March 20, 2007 Filing 34 Opposition re 33 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
March 15, 2007 Filing 35 Pltf's First Request for Production of Documents, FILED, c/s (Boyce, Kathy)
March 5, 2007 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Boyce, Kathy)
January 18, 2007 Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2007 re 31 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Christine M. Varad,, 4 MOTION substitution of Seisent, Inc. for Feft Reed Elsevier, Inc. and to dismisss the complaint against Reed Elsevier, Inc. re 1 Complaint filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated,, 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine M. Varad,, 23 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated,, 28 MOTION to Strike 24 Affidavit in Support, 20 Affidavit in Support, 22 Affidavit in Support filed by Christine M. Varad,, 13 MOTION to Stay Filing of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated,.; USMJ Dein hears arguments from Pro Se Varad and Attorney Cataldo, makes rulings and will issue order. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
January 18, 2007 Filing 32 Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered taking under advisement 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution, withdrawing without prejudice 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, finding as moot 13 Defendant's Motion to Stay, and granting 23 Defendant's Motion for Discovery. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 18, 2007 Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Exhibits. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 17, 2007 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Christine M. Varad.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 27, 2006 Filing 30 Opposition re 28 MOTION to Strike 24 Affidavit in Support, 20 Affidavit in Support, 22 Affidavit in Support filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
December 26, 2006 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: All pending motions will be heard on 1/18/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 19, 2006 Filing 29 Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Full pretrial purposes including any necessary report and recommendation.(O'Leary, Dennis)
December 18, 2006 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike 24 Affidavit in Support, 20 Affidavit in Support, 22 Affidavit in Support by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - pages 1-6), FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
December 18, 2006 Filing 26 Opposition re 23 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) filed by Christine M. Varad., FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - pages 1-4)(Boyce, Kathy)
December 15, 2006 Filing 27 Response by Christine M. Varad to 18 Order, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
December 15, 2006 Filing 25 Response by Reed Elsevier Incorporated to 18 Order,. (Cataldo, Kristin)
December 13, 2006 Memorandum and Order dated 11/30/06 re-mailed to pltf at her new address (Boyce, Kathy)
December 13, 2006 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christine Varad returned - forwarding order expired - retutn to sender (Boyce, Kathy)
December 13, 2006 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 19 Opposition to Motion, 24 Affidavit in Support, 20 Affidavit in Support, 23 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f), 22 Affidavit in Support, 21 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 12/20/2006. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (O'Leary, Dennis)
December 12, 2006 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 23 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) of T. Christopher Donnelly. (Cataldo, Kristin)
December 12, 2006 Filing 23 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) by Reed Elsevier Incorporated.(Cataldo, Kristin)
December 12, 2006 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 19 Opposition to Motion of Henry Z. Horbaczewski. (Cataldo, Kristin)
December 12, 2006 Filing 21 Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, and Defendant's Concise Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
December 12, 2006 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 19 Opposition to Motion (Second Affidavit) of John M. Byrne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Cataldo, Kristin)
December 12, 2006 Filing 19 Opposition re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
November 30, 2006 Filing 18 Judge Mark L. Wolf : MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The parties are being ordered to inform the court by December 15, 2006 whether they consent to a transfer of this case to Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Attachments: # 1)(O'Leary, Dennis)
November 28, 2006 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION to Stay Filing of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Cataldo, Kristin)
November 28, 2006 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION substitution of Seisent, Inc. for Feft Reed Elsevier, Inc. and to dismisss the complaint against Reed Elsevier, Inc. re 1 Complaint filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cataldo, Kristin)
November 28, 2006 Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document., granting 15 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (O'Leary, Dennis)
November 22, 2006 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Stay the Filing of an Opposition to Summary Judgment by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Reply Brief))(Cataldo, Kristin)
November 17, 2006 Filing 14 Opposition re 13 MOTION to Stay Filing of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
November 7, 2006 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Filing of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Reed Elsevier Incorporated.(Cataldo, Kristin)
October 31, 2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 11, Motion for Summary Judgment corrected because: to correct the pdf document as the Memorandum of Law was incorrectly scanned and attached to the Motion for Summary judgment as one document (Boyce, Kathy)
October 30, 2006 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine M. Varad, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhbits 1-9# 2 Exhibit 10-15)(Boyce, Kathy)
October 30, 2006 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christine M. Varad, FILED, c/s. Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2006 (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 10/31/2006 to attach a corrected pdf document (Boyce, Kathy).
October 27, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition))(Cataldo, Kristin)
October 18, 2006 Filing 9 Opposition re 4 MOTION substitution of Seisent, Inc. for Feft Reed Elsevier, Inc. and to dismisss the complaint against Reed Elsevier, Inc. re 1 Complaint filed by Christine M. Varad., FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Boyce, Kathy)
October 13, 2006 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Christopher Donnelly on behalf of Reed Elsevier Incorporated (Donnelly, T.)
October 13, 2006 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Cataldo on behalf of Reed Elsevier Incorporated (Cataldo, Kristin)
October 10, 2006 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of John M. Byrne in Support re 4 MOTION substitution of Seisent, Inc. for Feft Reed Elsevier, Inc. and to dismisss the complaint against Reed Elsevier, Inc. re 1 Complaint filed by Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Boyce, Kathy)
October 10, 2006 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Reed Elsevier Incorporated, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
October 10, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION for substitution of Seisent, Inc. for Feft Reed Elsevier, Inc. and to dismisss the complaint against Reed Elsevier, Inc. re 1 Complaint by Reed Elsevier Incorporated, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
October 10, 2006 Filing 3 Letter/request (non-motion) from Kristin M. Cataldo to Ms. Boyce enclosing hard copies of documents and re the technical problem with her firm's office server,preventing her from filing the documents electronically, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
September 12, 2006 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Reed Elsevier Incorporated waiver sent on 9/11/2006, answer due 11/10/2006, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
August 8, 2006 Summons Issued as to Reed Elsevier Incorporated. (Boyce, Kathy)
August 8, 2006 If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein (Boyce, Kathy)
August 8, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reed Elsevier Incorporated Filing fee: $350, receipt number 74270, filed by Christine M. Varad. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Complaint# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyce, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine Varad v. Reed Elsevier Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M. Varad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier Incorporated
Represented By: T. Christopher Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?