Rodrigues v. Menu Foods Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lidia Rodrigues
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund and Menu Foods Limited
Case Number: 1:2007cv10745
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Bristol
Presiding Judge: Edward F. Harrington
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2007 Filing 7
Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 1850 received from District of New Jersey requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
July 19, 2007 Filing 6
Copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 1850 received from the MDL Panel. (Jones, Sherry)
May 7, 2007 Filing 3
Copy of Notice of joinder filed with the MDL Panel, filed. (Folan, Karen)
April 30, 2007 Filing 2
Copy of motion to transfer filed with the MDL Panel, filed. (Folan, Karen)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigues v. Menu Foods Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Rodrigues
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?