Dunne v. Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that the Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners and the Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court have engaged in constitutionally invidious discrimination by including an inappropriate question on the Massachusetts Bar Examination compelling plaintiff to write an affirmative response explicitly and implicitly accepting, supporting and promoting homosexual marriage and homosexual parenting as a prerequisite to the practice of law in the State of Massachusetts.

Plaintiff: Stephen Dunne
Defendant: Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners, William F. Kennedy, Jr., Anthony G. Massimiano, Alice E. Richmond, Geoffrey R. Bok, Michael K. Callahan, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court, Margaret H. Marshall, Roderick Ireland, Judith A. Cowin and John M. Greaney
Case Number: 1:2007cv11166
Filed: June 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2007 Filing 11
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Nici, Richard)
September 7, 2007 Filing 10
RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Margaret H. Marshall, Roderick Ireland, Judiith A. Cowin, John M. Greaney, Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners, William F. Kennedy, Jr, Anthony Massimiano, Alice Richmond, Geoffrey R. Bok, Michael Callahan, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court. (Sterman, Anne)
August 15, 2007 Filing 7
RESPONSE to Motion re [6] MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF dEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Margaret H. Marshall, Roderick Ireland, Judiith A. Cowin, John M. Greaney, Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners, William F. Kennedy, Jr, Anthony Massimiano, Alice Richmond, Geoffrey R. Bok, Michael Callahan, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court. (Sterman, Anne)
August 10, 2007 Filing 6
MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Stephen Dunne.Exhibit not scanned due to personal identifiers.(Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2007 (Nici, Richard).
July 9, 2007 Filing 3
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Margaret H. Marshall, Roderick Ireland, Judiith A. Cowin, John M. Greaney, Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners, William F. Kennedy, Jr, Anthony Massimiano, Alice Richmond, Geoffrey R. Bok, Michael Callahan, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court, filed by Stephen Dunne.(Nici, Richard)
July 6, 2007 Filing 2
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Sterman on behalf of Margaret H. Marshall, Roderick Ireland, Judiith A. Cowin, John M. Greaney, Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners, William F. Kennedy, Jr, Anthony Massimiano, Alice Richmond, Geoffrey R. Bok, Michael Callahan, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court (Sterman, Anne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunne v. Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Board of Bar Examiners
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Kennedy, Jr.
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony G. Massimiano
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice E. Richmond
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey R. Bok
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Callahan
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret H. Marshall
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Ireland
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Cowin
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Greaney
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?