Abraham v. Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Abraham
Defendant: Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution and Mark E. Hahn
Case Number: 1:2007cv12237
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Reginald C. Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2009 Appeal Record Returned: 25 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
February 13, 2009 Filing 30 MANDATE of USCA as to 25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nathaniel Abraham. Mandate issued in the USCA 2/13/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette)
January 26, 2009 Filing 29 OPINION of USCA. Opinion issued in the USCA 1/22/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette)
January 26, 2009 Filing 28 USCA Judgment as to 25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nathaniel Abraham. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The judgment of the district court is affirmed. Judgment issued in the USCA 1/22/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette)
May 28, 2008 Filing 27 USCA Case Number 08-1655 for 25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nathaniel Abraham. (Gawlik, Cathy)
May 23, 2008 Filing 26 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 25 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(Ramos, Jeanette)
May 19, 2008 Filing 25 Plaintiff's NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 24 Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Nathaniel Abraham Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000001969890 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 6/9/2008. (Gibbs, David)
April 22, 2008 Filing 24 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff(Smith, Bonnie)
April 22, 2008 Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered granting 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings "Motion allowed for the reasons set forth in the defendants' memorandum." (Smith, Bonnie)
April 21, 2008 Judge Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re 20 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Nathaniel Abraham. Motion to amend is denied as futile. The second right to sue letter was not issued in conformity to EEOC regulations and confers no new rights. (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 11, 2008 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File (Renewed Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Reply, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Reply)(Hale, Robert)
April 10, 2008 Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: Electronic ORDER entered denying 22 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief without prejudice. A new motion may be filed with a reply brief of not more than 10 double-spaced pages with customary margins. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 25, 2008 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Hale, Robert)
March 25, 2008 Filing 21 Opposition re 20 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His Amended Complaint) filed by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Hale, Robert)
March 12, 2008 Motions terminated: 14 MOTION to Amend Verified Complaint filed by Nathaniel Abraham. (York, Steve)
March 11, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Nathaniel Abraham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1 to Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint, # 3 Exhibit A-2 to Motion For Leave to Amend)(Gibbs, David)
March 11, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Nathaniel Abraham re 14 MOTION to Amend Verified Complaint (Gibbs, David) Modified on 4/2/2008 (York, Steve).
March 3, 2008 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Attorney David C. Gibbs III by Nathaniel Abraham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A EEOC letter, # 2 Exhibit B EEOC Notice)(Gibbs, David)
February 28, 2008 Filing 17 Opposition re 14 MOTION to Amend Verified Complaint (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Hale, Robert)
February 25, 2008 Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: Electronic ORDER entered denying 16 Motion for Hearing at the scheduling conference. A hearing on the pending motions will be set in due course. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 25, 2008 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Cancelling Hearing. The scheduling conference set for 3/6/08 is hereby CANCELLED. A scheduling conference will be set once all pending motions have been ruled on. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 21, 2008 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Hearing by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution.(Hale, Robert)
February 14, 2008 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Nathaniel Abraham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Gibbs, David)
February 14, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Verified Complaint by Nathaniel Abraham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Gibbs, David)
January 31, 2008 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hale, Robert)
January 31, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn.(Hale, Robert)
January 31, 2008 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Attorney Denise Minor's record updated to permit electronic notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
January 31, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 30, 2008 Filing 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hale, Robert)
January 18, 2008 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution served on 12/26/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (York, Steve)
January 18, 2008 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark E. Hahn served on 12/26/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (York, Steve)
January 16, 2008 Judge Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT Approving re 7 Stipulation filed by Mark E. Hahn, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Nathaniel Abraham to extend time to answer to 1/31/08 (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 9, 2008 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order by Nathaniel Abraham, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. (Hale, Robert)
January 9, 2008 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Roth, Itia)
January 9, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Itia R.S. Roth on behalf of Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn (Roth, Itia)
January 9, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Hale on behalf of Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn (Hale, Robert)
December 6, 2007 Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David C Gibbs, lll for Nathaniel Abraham; Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (York, Steve)
December 6, 2007 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 000136 for 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David C. Gibbs, III (York, Steve)
December 6, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 000135 for 1 Complaint (York, Steve)
December 5, 2007 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Patch, Christine)
December 5, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Reginald C. Lindsay assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander (Patch, Christine)
December 3, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David C. Gibbs, III by Nathaniel Abraham. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Gibbs, III# 2 Exhibit Certification)(Patch, Christine)
December 3, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Mark E. Hahn, filed by Nathaniel Abraham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham v. Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Abraham
Represented By: Denise Gavaletz Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?